This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/29/2019 at 06:00:45 (UTC).

Aldridge Nolan v. USA

Case Summary

On 05/30/2019 Aldridge Nolan filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2038

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

ALDRIDGE NOLAN

Pekin, IL 61555-0000

Respondent / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Aldridge Nolan

Attorney at FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION

P.O. Box 5000

Pekin, IL 61555-0000

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Greggory R. Walters

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

211 Fulton Street, One Technology Plaza

Peoria, IL 61602-0000

 

Court Documents

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

#8

7 #2

C.R. 3(b) Fee Notice

7 #1

D.C. notice denying IFP filed

#6

5 #2

Order filed

5 #1

Order to Transfer IFP Motion

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

1 #4

Fee Notice

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Federal Habeas Corpus Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Filed prisoner trust fund account statement by Appellant Aldridge Nolan. [11] [7016478] [19-2038] (VG) [Entered: 07/10/2019 02:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Prose motion filed by Appellant Aldridge Nolan to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [10] [7016477] [19-2038] (VG) [Entered: 07/10/2019 02:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed Memorandum by Appellant Aldridge Nolan. [9] [7016475] [19-2038] (VG) [Entered: 07/10/2019 02:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Check in the amount of $5.00. The clerk of this court shall send the CHECK to the clerk of the district court. [8] [7012206] CC [19-2038] (MAN) [Entered: 06/19/2019 10:17 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Aldridge Nolan leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 06/12/2019. Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 30 day notice for failure to pay the docketing fee. Fee or IFP forms due on 07/12/2019 for Appellant Aldridge Nolan [7010747] [7] [7010747] [19-2038] (CAG) [Entered: 06/12/2019 11:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Appellant Aldridge Nolan shall have thirty days from the date at the top of this order to file a memorandum explaining why this court should not summarily affirm the district court's judgment. Briefing in this case is otherwise suspended pending further order of the court.. MPB [6] [7010478] [19-2038] (FP) [Entered: 06/11/2019 11:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order issued TRANSFERRING the motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis on appeal to the clerk of the District Court for ruling in the first instance. JR [5] [7010397] [19-2038] (CAG) [Entered: 06/11/2019 09:35 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed prisoner trust fund account statement by Appellant Aldridge Nolan. [4] [7010370] [19-2038] (ER) [Entered: 06/11/2019 08:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Prose affidavit accompanying motion filed by Appellant Aldridge Nolan to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [3] [7010367] [19-2038] (ER) [Entered: 06/11/2019 08:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Aldridge Nolan. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [2] [7010362] [19-2038] (ER) [Entered: 06/11/2019 08:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Federal prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Aldridge Nolan by 06/06/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 06/13/2019. Fee or IFP forms due on 06/13/2019 for Appellant Aldridge Nolan. [1] [7008164] [19-2038] (PS) [Entered: 05/30/2019 04:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Greggory R Walters