This case was last updated from PACER on 06/15/2019 at 06:06:35 (UTC).

Aldo Wilson v. USA

Case Summary

On 04/16/2019 Aldo Wilson filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11460

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALDO RAY WILSON

Respondent

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Richard Michael Summa

Attorney at Federal Public Defender's Office

227 N Bronough St Ste 4200

Tallahassee, FL 32301-1300

Randolph Patterson Murrell

Attorney at Federal Public Defender's Office

227 N Bronough St Ste 4200

Tallahassee, FL 32301-1300

Respondent Attorneys

Jordane E. Learn

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

111 N Adams St Fl 4

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Karen E. Rhew-Miller

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

111 N Adams St Fl 4

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Robert G. Davies

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

21 E Garden St Ste 400

Pensacola, FL 32502

U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Florida

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

21 E Garden St Ste 400

Pensacola, FL 32502

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Status report filed as to Attorney Jordane E. Learn for Appellant USA. Status of case is unchanged [19-11460] (ECF: Jordane Learn) [Entered: 06/14/2019 03:54 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Richard Michael Summa for Appellee Aldo Ray Wilson. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11460] (ECF: Richard Summa) [Entered: 05/15/2019 02:13 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Jordane E. Learn for Appellant USA. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 05/14/2019 10:10 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Jordane E. Learn for Appellant USA. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [19-11460] (ECF: Jordane Learn) [Entered: 05/13/2019 04:44 PM]

Open Document #2

Court Order Filed

Open Document #1

MOT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

Reply to response filed by Appellant USA. [19-11460] (ECF: Jordane Learn) [Entered: 05/02/2019 10:07 AM]

Open Document

RESPONSE to Motion to stay briefing filed by Appellant USA [ # 8758807-2 ] filed by Attorney Richard Michael Summa for Appellee Aldo Ray Wilson. [19-11460] (ECF: Richard Summa) [Entered: 05/01/2019 10:59 AM]

Open Document

MOTION to stay the briefing schedule filed by USA. Motion is Opposed. [8758807-1] [19-11460] (ECF: Jordane Learn) [Entered: 04/29/2019 05:09 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jordane E. Learn for Appellant USA. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11460] (ECF: Jordane Learn) [Entered: 04/25/2019 04:47 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard Summa/Aldo Wilson Robert G. Davies for USA, Jordane E. Learn for USA, Karen E. Rhew-Miller for USA, U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Florida for USA and Randolph Patterson Murrell for Aldo Ray Wilson and Richard Michael Summa for Aldo Ray Wilson. [19-11460] (ECF: Richard Summa) [Entered: 04/18/2019 11:15 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Karen Rhew-Miller for USA U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Florida for USA. [19-11460] (ECF: Karen Rhew-Miller) [Entered: 04/17/2019 12:38 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert G. Davies for USA U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Florida for USA. [19-11460] (ECF: Robert Davies) [Entered: 04/17/2019 12:32 PM]

Open Document #3

USDC Order- Doc #104

Open Document #2

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Status report filed as to Attorney Jordane E. Learn for Appellant USA. Status of case is unchanged [19-11460] (ECF: Jordane Learn) [Entered: 06/14/2019 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Richard Michael Summa for Appellee Aldo Ray Wilson. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11460] (ECF: Richard Summa) [Entered: 05/15/2019 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Public Communication: Attorneys Richard Michael Summa and Randolph Patterson Murrell for Appellee Aldo Ray Wilson - This appeal is currently still stayed per order dated 05/06/2019; however, please file the Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement and complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate. [Entered: 05/15/2019 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Jordane E. Learn for Appellant USA. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 05/14/2019 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Jordane E. Learn for Appellant USA. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [19-11460] (ECF: Jordane Learn) [Entered: 05/13/2019 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Appellants motion to stay this appeal and all associated briefing deadlines pending the petition for rehearing in Moss, No. 17-10473 and the Courts decision in Young, No. 18-13840 is GRANTED. Appellant shall file written status reports every thirty (30) days indicating the status of Moss and Young and whether the stay in this case should continue. Appellants brief is due forty (40) days from the resolution of Moss, No. 17-10473 and Young, No. 18-13840, with the appendix due seven (7) days from the filing of the brief. [ # 8758807-2 ] CRW [Entered: 05/06/2019 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply to response filed by Appellant USA. [19-11460] (ECF: Jordane Learn) [Entered: 05/02/2019 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE to Motion to stay briefing filed by Appellant USA [ # 8758807-2 ] filed by Attorney Richard Michael Summa for Appellee Aldo Ray Wilson. [19-11460] (ECF: Richard Summa) [Entered: 05/01/2019 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to stay the briefing schedule filed by USA. Motion is Opposed. [8758807-1] [19-11460] (ECF: Jordane Learn) [Entered: 04/29/2019 05:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jordane E. Learn for Appellant USA. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11460] (ECF: Jordane Learn) [Entered: 04/25/2019 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard Summa/Aldo Wilson Robert G. Davies for USA, Jordane E. Learn for USA, Karen E. Rhew-Miller for USA, U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Florida for USA and Randolph Patterson Murrell for Aldo Ray Wilson and Richard Michael Summa for Aldo Ray Wilson. [19-11460] (ECF: Richard Summa) [Entered: 04/18/2019 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Karen Rhew-Miller for USA U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Florida for USA. [19-11460] (ECF: Karen Rhew-Miller) [Entered: 04/17/2019 12:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert G. Davies for USA U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Florida for USA. [19-11460] (ECF: Robert Davies) [Entered: 04/17/2019 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant USA on 04/15/2019 04/16/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Required. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 04/17/2019 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.