This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/16/2021 at 05:22:33 (UTC).

Aldaress Carter v. The City of Montgomery, et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2021 Aldaress Carter filed an Other lawsuit against The City of Montgomery,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-90002

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALDARESS CARTER

Respondents

BRANCH D. KLOESS

JUDICIAL CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC.

THE CITY OF MONTGOMERY

Not Classified By Court

PUBLIC GOOD LAW CENTER

SUZETTE MALVEAUX

MYRIAM GILLES

DEBORAH ARCHER

HEATHER ELLIOTT

SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER

CIVIL RIGHTS CORPS

ADAM N. STEINMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

George Daniel Evans

Attorney at The Evans Law Firm, PC

1736 Oxmoor Rd Ste 101

Birmingham, AL 35209

Alexandra Brodsky

Attorney at Public Justice, PC

1620 L St Nw Ste 630

Washington, DC 20036

Toby James Marshall

Attorney at Terrell Marshall & Daudt, PLLC

936 N 34Th St Ste 400

Seattle, WA 98103-8869

Leslie Andrea Bailey

Attorney at Public Justice, PC

475 14Th St Ste 610

Oakland, CA 94612-1928

Respondent Attorneys

Micheal Stewart Jackson

Attorney at Webster Henry Lyons Bradwell Cohan & Black, PC

Po Box 239, 105 Tallapossa St Ste 101

Montgomery, AL 36101

Jonathan Griffith

Attorney at Wallace Jordan Ratliff & Brandt, LLC

Po Box 530910

Birmingham, AL 35253

Wilson Franklin Green

Attorney at Fleenor & Green, LLP

1657 Mcfarland Blvd N Ste G2A

Tuscaloosa, AL 35406

Wesley Kyle Winborn

Attorney at Wallace Jordan Ratliff & Brandt, LLC

Po Box 530910

Birmingham, AL 35253

Larry Logsdon

Attorney at Wallace Jordan Ratliff & Brandt, LLC

Po Box 530910

Birmingham, AL 35253

Michael Leon Jackson

Attorney at Wallace Jordan Ratliff & Brandt, LLC

Po Box 530910

Birmingham, AL 35253

Michael David Brymer

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

103 N Perry St

Montgomery, AL 36104

Kimberly Owen Fehl

Attorney at City of Montgomery, Legal Department

103 N Perry St

Montgomery, AL 36104

Robert D. Segall

Attorney at Copeland Franco Screws & Gill, PA

444 S Perry St

Montgomery, AL 36104

Richard Hamilton Gill

Attorney at Copeland Franco Screws & Gill, PA

444 S Perry St

Montgomery, AL 36104

Shannon L. Holliday

Attorney at Copeland Franco Screws & Gill, PA

444 S Perry St

Montgomery, AL 36104

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Alexandra Marie Jordan

Attorney at Southern Poverty Law Center

400 Washington Ave

Montgomery, AL 36104

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Miscellaneous Petition Docketed - Petition

Open Document #2

Exhibits

Open Document #3

MOT-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief

Open Document #2

Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by Alexandra Jordan for Amici Curiae the Southern Poverty Law Center, Civil Rights Corps, Public Good Law Center, Deborah Archer, Myriam Gilles, Heather Elliott, Suzette Malveaux, and Adam N. Steinman. [9282952-1] [21-90002] (ECF: Alexandra Jordan) [Entered: 01/13/2021 08:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Alexandra Jordan for Amici Curiae the Southern Poverty Law Center, Civil Rights Corps, Public Good Law Center, Deborah Archer, Myriam Gilles, Heather Elliott, Suzette Malveaux, and Adam N. Steinman [21-90002] (ECF: Alexandra Jordan) [Entered: 01/13/2021 08:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Shannon Holliday for The City of Montgomery Shannon L. Holliday for The City of Montgomery. [21-90002] (ECF: Shannon Holliday) [Entered: 01/12/2021 03:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard Gill for The City of Montgomery Richard Hamilton Gill for The City of Montgomery. [21-90002] (ECF: Richard Gill) [Entered: 01/12/2021 03:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert D. Segall for The City of Montgomery. [21-90002] (ECF: Robert Segall) [Entered: 01/12/2021 01:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Leslie Andrea Bailey for Aldaress Carter. [21-90002] (ECF: Leslie Bailey) [Entered: 01/11/2021 03:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Larry Logsdon for Judicial Correction Services Larry Logsdon for Judicial Correctional Services, Inc.. [21-90002] (ECF: Larry Logsdon) [Entered: 01/11/2021 11:57 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael L. Jackson for Judicial Correction Services Michael Leon Jackson for Judicial Correctional Services, Inc.. [21-90002] (ECF: Michael Jackson) [Entered: 01/11/2021 11:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Wilson Franklin Green for Judicial Correction Services Wilson Franklin Green for Judicial Correctional Services, Inc.. [21-90002] (ECF: Wilson Green) [Entered: 01/10/2021 06:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of inability to comply with the paper copy requirement due to COVID-19 filed by Attorney George Daniel Evans for Petitioner Aldaress Carter. Paper copies will be submitted at a future date established by the Court. [21-90002] (ECF: George Evans) [Entered: 01/09/2021 05:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by George Daniel Evans for Aldaress Carter. [21-90002] (ECF: George Evans) [Entered: 01/08/2021 05:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISCELLANEOUS CASE DOCKETED. Petition for permission to appeal pursuant to 23(f) filed by Petitioner Aldaress Carter. Served 01/06/2021 email - Attorney for Respondents: Brymer, Fehl, Gill, Green, Holliday, Jackson, Logsdon, Segall; US mail - Attorney for Respondents: Griffith, Jackson, Winborn. [Entered: 01/08/2021 12:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Judicial Correction Services, Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer G Daniel Evans(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Toby J. Marshall