This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/21/2021 at 06:13:02 (UTC).

Aldaress Carter v. The City of Montgomery, et al

Case Summary

On 07/23/2021 Aldaress Carter filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against The City of Montgomery,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-12468

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ALDARESS CARTER, individually, and for a class of similarly situated persons or entities

Defendant / Appellees

THE CITY OF MONTGOMERY

BRANCH D. KLOESS

JUDICIAL CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Leslie Andrea Bailey

Attorney at Public Justice, PC

475 14Th St Ste 610

Oakland, CA 94612-1928

Toby J. Marshall

Attorney at Terrell Marshall Law Group, PLLC

936 N 34Th St Ste 300

Seattle, WA 98103

Alexandra Brodsky

Attorney at Public Justice, PC

1620 L St Nw Ste 630

Washington, DC 20036

George Daniel Evans

Attorney at The Evans Law Firm, PC

1736 Oxmoor Rd Ste 101

Birmingham, AL 35209

Maurine C. Evans

Attorney at The Evans Law Firm, PC

1736 Oxmoor Rd Ste 101

Birmingham, AL 35209

Brian Hardingham

Attorney at Public Justice, PC

475 14Th St Ste 610

Oakland, CA 94612-1928

John He

Attorney at Public Justice, PC

475 14Th St Ste 610

Oakland, CA 94612-1928

Alexandria Parrish

Attorney at The Evans Law Firm, PC

1736 Oxmoor Rd Ste 101

Birmingham, AL 35209

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Richard Hamilton Gill

Attorney at Copeland Franco Screws & Gill, PA

444 S Perry St

Montgomery, AL 36104

Shannon L. Holliday

Attorney at Copeland Franco Screws & Gill, PA

444 S Perry St

Montgomery, AL 36104

Michael David Brymer

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

103 N Perry St

Montgomery, AL 36104

Kimberly Owen Fehl

Attorney at City of Montgomery, Legal Department

103 N Perry St

Montgomery, AL 36104

Robert D. Segall

Attorney at Copeland Franco Screws & Gill, PA

444 S Perry St

Montgomery, AL 36104

Micheal Stewart Jackson

Attorney at Webster Henry Lyons Bradwell Cohan & Black, PC

Po Box 239, 105 Tallapossa St Ste 101

Montgomery, AL 36101

Wilson Franklin Green

Attorney at Wilson F. Green, LLC

2620 6Th St Ste 200, Po Box 2536

Tuscaloosa, AL 35403

Jonathan Griffith

Attorney at Wallace Jordan Ratliff & Brandt, LLC

Po Box 530910

Birmingham, AL 35253

Michael Leon Jackson

Attorney at Wallace Jordan Ratliff & Brandt, LLC

Po Box 530910

Birmingham, AL 35253

Larry Logsdon

Attorney at Wallace Jordan Ratliff & Brandt, LLC

Po Box 530910

Birmingham, AL 35253

Wesley Kyle Winborn

Attorney at Wallace Jordan Ratliff & Brandt, LLC

Po Box 530910

Birmingham, AL 35253

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #4

21-90015-G Petition for Permission to Appeal

Open Document #3

21-90015-G DKT 10 Letter

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

Corrected*DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [21-12468, 21-12469] [Entered: 09/07/2021 10:51 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellant Aldaress Carter in 21-12468 and Appellant Levon Agee in 21-12469. The appellants' briefs are due on or before 10/12/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellants' briefs. [21-12468, 21-12469] [Entered: 08/31/2021 10:32 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCase numbers 21-12468 and 21-12469 have been clerically consolidated. [21-12468, 21-12469] [Entered: 08/30/2021 04:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Shannon L. Holliday for Appellee The City of Montgomery. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12468] (ECF: Shannon Holliday) [Entered: 08/11/2021 05:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPTS FILED - All necessary transcript on file (per court reporter Patricia Starkie) [Entered: 08/11/2021 11:32 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Reporter Acknowledgment filed by Patricia Starkie. ALL TRANSCRIPTS ON FILE at DE# 389 and 390. [Entered: 08/11/2021 10:59 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Leslie Andrea Bailey for Appellant Aldaress Carter. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 08/11/2021 10:51 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Michael Leon Jackson for Appellee Judicial Correctional Services, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12468] (ECF: Michael Jackson) [Entered: 08/11/2021 09:59 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Toby J. Marshall for Aldaress Carter. [21-12468] (ECF: Toby Marshall) [Entered: 08/10/2021 12:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Toby J. Marshall is GRANTED by clerk. [9455906-2] [Entered: 08/09/2021 03:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Larry Logsdon for Judicial Correctional Services, Inc.. [21-12468] (ECF: Larry Logsdon) [Entered: 08/05/2021 04:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Maurine C. Evans for Aldaress Carter. [21-12468] (ECF: Maurine Evans) [Entered: 08/05/2021 03:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate fee was paid on 07/30/2021 as to Appellant Aldaress Carter. [Entered: 08/05/2021 10:24 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Leslie Andrea Bailey for Aldaress Carter. [21-12468] (ECF: Leslie Bailey) [Entered: 08/04/2021 06:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12468] (ECF: George Evans) [Entered: 08/04/2021 06:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by George Daniel Evans for Aldaress Carter. [21-12468] (ECF: George Evans) [Entered: 08/04/2021 05:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert D. Segall for The City of Montgomery. [21-12468] (ECF: Shannon Holliday) [Entered: 08/04/2021 04:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard Hamilton Gill for The City of Montgomery. [21-12468] (ECF: Shannon Holliday) [Entered: 08/04/2021 04:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Shannon L. Holliday for The City of Montgomery. [21-12468] (ECF: Shannon Holliday) [Entered: 08/04/2021 04:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Aldaress Carter on 07/23/2021. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/06/2021 as to Appellant Aldaress Carter. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/20/2021 as to Appellees Judicial Correctional Services, Inc., et al. [Entered: 07/23/2021 02:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Judicial Correction Services, Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael D. Brymer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan L. Griffith

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Micheal Stewart Jackson