This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/12/2021 at 06:17:13 (UTC).

Aldaress Carter v. The City of Montgomery, et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 Aldaress Carter filed an Other lawsuit against The City of Montgomery,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-90015

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALDARESS CARTER, individually, and for a class of similarly situated persons or entities

Respondents

BRANCH D. KLOESS

THE CITY OF MONTGOMERY

JUDICIAL CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

George Daniel Evans

Attorney at The Evans Law Firm, PC

1736 Oxmoor Rd Ste 101

Birmingham, AL 35209

Alexandra Brodsky

Attorney at Public Justice, PC

1620 L St Nw Ste 630

Washington, DC 20036

Alexandria Parrish

Attorney at The Evans Law Firm, PC

1736 Oxmoor Rd Ste 101

Birmingham, AL 35209

Maurine C. Evans

Attorney at The Evans Law Firm, PC

1736 Oxmoor Rd Ste 101

Birmingham, AL 35209

John He

Attorney at Public Justice, PC

475 14Th St Ste 610

Oakland, CA 94612-1928

Brian Hardingham

Attorney at Public Justice, PC

475 14Th St Ste 610

Oakland, CA 94612-1928

Toby James Marshall

Attorney at Terrell Marshall & Daudt, PLLC

936 N 34Th St Ste 400

Seattle, WA 98103-8869

Leslie Andrea Bailey

Attorney at Public Justice, PC

475 14Th St Ste 610

Oakland, CA 94612-1928

Respondent Attorneys

Micheal Stewart Jackson

Attorney at Webster Henry Lyons Bradwell Cohan & Black, PC

Po Box 239, 105 Tallapossa St Ste 101

Montgomery, AL 36101

Kimberly Owen Fehl

Attorney at City of Montgomery, Legal Department

103 N Perry St

Montgomery, AL 36104

Robert D. Segall

Attorney at Copeland Franco Screws & Gill, PA

444 S Perry St

Montgomery, AL 36104

Richard Hamilton Gill

Attorney at Copeland Franco Screws & Gill, PA

444 S Perry St

Montgomery, AL 36104

Michael David Brymer

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

103 N Perry St

Montgomery, AL 36104

Shannon L. Holliday

Attorney at Copeland Franco Screws & Gill, PA

444 S Perry St

Montgomery, AL 36104

Jonathan Griffith

Attorney at Wallace Jordan Ratliff & Brandt, LLC

Po Box 530910

Birmingham, AL 35253

Wilson Franklin Green

Attorney at Wilson F. Green, LLC

2620 6Th St Ste 200, Po Box 2536

Tuscaloosa, AL 35403

Wesley Kyle Winborn

Attorney at Wallace Jordan Ratliff & Brandt, LLC

Po Box 530910

Birmingham, AL 35253

Larry Logsdon

Attorney at Wallace Jordan Ratliff & Brandt, LLC

Po Box 530910

Birmingham, AL 35253

Michael Leon Jackson

Attorney at Wallace Jordan Ratliff & Brandt, LLC

Po Box 530910

Birmingham, AL 35253

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

MOT-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Miscellaneous Petition Docketed - Petition

Open Document #3

Exhibit 1

Open Document #4

Exhibit 2

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by The Southern Poverty Law Center, Civil Rights Corps, Public Good Law Center, and Law Professors. [9409496-1] [21-90015] (ECF: Antony Ryan) [Entered: 06/11/2021 07:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • Docket2nd *** Notice of deficient Appearance of Counsel filed by Wilson Franklin Green for Judicial Correctional Services, Inc. Document contains address and contact information not found in CM/ECF. Counsel must file a corrected Appearance of Counsel form and update information via Pacer. [Entered: 06/11/2021 12:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Wilson F. Green for Judicial Correction Services Wilson Franklin Green for Judicial Correctional Services, Inc.. [21-90015] (ECF: Wilson Green) [Entered: 06/10/2021 01:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by George Daniel Evans for Aldaress Carter. [21-90015] (ECF: George Evans) [Entered: 06/09/2021 03:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of deficient Appearance of Counsel filed by Wilson Franklin Green for Judicial Correctional Services, Inc.. Document contains address and contact information not found in CM/ECF. Counsel must file a corrected Appearance of Counsel form and update information in Pacer. [Entered: 06/09/2021 02:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert D. Segall for The City of Montgomery. [21-90015] (ECF: Robert Segall) [Entered: 06/09/2021 11:28 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard Hamilton Gill for The City of Montgomery. [21-90015] (ECF: Richard Gill) [Entered: 06/09/2021 11:25 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Shannon L. Holliday for The City of Montgomery. [21-90015] (ECF: Shannon Holliday) [Entered: 06/09/2021 11:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Wilson F. Green for Judicial Correction Services Wilson Franklin Green for Judicial Correctional Services, Inc.. [21-90015] (ECF: Wilson Green) [Entered: 06/08/2021 03:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Larry Logsdon for Judicial Correctional Services, Inc.. [21-90015] (ECF: Larry Logsdon) [Entered: 06/08/2021 03:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael Leon Jackson for Judicial Correctional Services, Inc.. [21-90015] (ECF: Michael Jackson) [Entered: 06/08/2021 03:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISCELLANEOUS CASE DOCKETED. Petition for permission to appeal pursuant to 23(f) filed by Petitioner Aldaress Carter. Served 06/04/2021 email - Attorney for Respondents: Brymer, Fehl, Gill, Green, Holliday, Jackson, Jackson, Logsdon, Segall, Winborn; US mail - Attorney for Respondent: Griffith. [Entered: 06/07/2021 04:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Judicial Correction Services, Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexandria Parrish(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Maurine C Evans(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer G Daniel Evans(Designation Retained)