This case was last updated from PACER on 06/25/2021 at 15:47:47 (UTC).

Albert Parks, et al v. BitConnect Ltd., et al

Case Summary

On 05/01/2020 Albert Parks filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against BitConnect Ltd . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-11675

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

GLENN ARCARO, an individual

TREVON BROWN, an individual

Myrtle Beach, SC 29575

BITCONNECT LTD., a foreign corporation

BITCONNECT TRADING LTC., a foreign corporation

BITCONNECT INTERNATIONAL PLC, a foreign corporation

YOUTUBE, LLC

Plaintiff / Appellants

FARAMARZ SHEMIRANI

MIJA YOO

MARYANN MARRYSHOW

ALBERT PARKS

NELSON ARIAS

CORY STRUZAN

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Carl E. Volz

Attorney at Pontem Law, LLC

125 S Clark St 17Th Fl

Chicago, IL 60603

Nicole Claire Mueller

Attorney at K&L Gates

70 W Madison St Ste 3100

Chicago, IL 60602-4244

Kenn Brotman

Attorney at K&L Gates

70 W Madison St Ste 3100

Chicago, IL 60602-4244

Desiree Moore

Attorney at K&L Gates

70 W Madison St Ste 3100

Chicago, IL 60602-4244

Nathan M. Berman

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder, LLP

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1200

Tampa, FL 33602

Ross Adam Appel

Attorney at Komlossy Law, PA

4700 Sheridan St Ste J

Hollywood, FL 33021

Abigale R. Green

Attorney at Thomas Law Office, PLLC

239 S Fifth St Ste 1800

Louisville, KY 40202

Ryan Massen

6528 101St St #D1

Tulsa, OK 74133

Alex C. Davis

Attorney at Jones Ward, PLC

1205 E Washington St Ste 111

Louisville, KY 40206

Michael James Pascucci

Attorney at Eggnatz Pascucci, PA

7450 Griffin Rd Ste 230

Davie, FL 33328

Emily C. Komlossy

Attorney at Komlossy Law, PA

4700 Sheridan St Ste J

Hollywood, FL 33021

Eli B. Richlin

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati

1301 Avenue Of The Americas Ste 4000

New York, NY 10019

Jason Stuart Miller

Attorney at Silver Miller

11780 W Sample Rd

Coral Springs, FL 33065

Ryan Hildreth

30211 Avenida De Las Banderas Ste 200

Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688

John A. Yanchunis

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, PA

201 N Franklin St Fl 7

Tampa, FL 33602

Steven William Teppler

Attorney at Mandelbaum Salsburg, PC

3 Becker Farm Rd Ste 105

Roseland, NJ 07068

Donald J. Enright

Attorney at Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

1101 30Th St Nw Ste 115

Washington, DC 20016

Rebecca A. Peterson

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen, PLLP

100 Washington Ave S Ste 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55401-2159

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

David Chad Silver

Attorney at Silver Miller

11780 W Sample Rd

Coral Springs, FL 33065

Daniel A. Bushell

Attorney at Bushell Appellate Law, PA

6400 N Andrews Ave Ste 505

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Calendar Issued

Open Document #1

CAL-1

Open Document

Assigned to tentative calendar number 24 in Atlanta during the week of August 9, 2021. [Entered: 05/06/2021 04:13 PM]

Open Document

Reply Brief filed by Appellants Nelson Arias, Maryann Marryshow, Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani, Cory Struzan and Mija Yoo. [20-11675] (ECF: Daniel Bushell) [Entered: 12/18/2020 11:33 PM]

Open Document

Supplemental Appendix [1 VOLUMES] filed by Appellee Glenn Arcaro. [20-11675] (ECF: Julianna McCabe) [Entered: 11/06/2020 06:00 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Daniel A. Bushell for Appellants Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani, Cory Struzan, Maryann Marryshow, Mija Yoo and Nelson Arias. No hearings. [Entered: 05/18/2020 04:47 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Daniel A. Bushell for Appellants Nelson Arias, Maryann Marryshow, Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani, Cory Struzan and Mija Yoo. No hearings. [20-11675] (ECF: Daniel Bushell) [Entered: 05/15/2020 06:23 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-11675] (ECF: Daniel Bushell) [Entered: 05/15/2020 06:19 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Daniel A. Bushell for Nelson Arias, Maryann Marryshow, Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani, Cory Struzan and Mija Yoo. [20-11675] (ECF: Daniel Bushell) [Entered: 05/15/2020 06:13 PM]

Open Document #9

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #8

DC Order DE #147

Open Document #7

DC Order DE #146

Open Document #6

DC Order DE #141

Open Document #5

DC Order DE #140

Open Document #4

DC Order DE #134

Open Document #3

DC Order DE #133

Open Document #2

DC Order DE #115

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketAttorney Daniel A. Bushell for Appellants Nelson Arias, Maryann Marryshow, Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani, Cory Struzan and Mija Yoo hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 08/11/2021. Daniel A. Bushell - 954-666-0220 will present argument. [20-11675] (ECF: Daniel Bushell) [Entered: 06/10/2021 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCalendar issued as to cases to be orally argued the week of 08/09/2021 in Atlanta, Georgia. Counsel are directed to electronically acknowledge receipt of this calendar by docketing the Calendar Receipt Acknowledged event in ECF (a document upload is not required). [Entered: 06/10/2021 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketOral argument scheduled. Argument Date: Wednesday, 08/11/2021 Argument Location: Atlanta. [Entered: 06/10/2021 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssigned to tentative calendar number 24 in Atlanta during the week of August 9, 2021. [Entered: 05/06/2021 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketReceived reply paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellants Nelson Arias, Maryann Marryshow, Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani, Cory Struzan and Mija Yoo. [Entered: 12/29/2020 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply Brief filed by Appellants Nelson Arias, Maryann Marryshow, Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani, Cory Struzan and Mija Yoo. [20-11675] (ECF: Daniel Bushell) [Entered: 12/18/2020 11:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketOver the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Daniel A. Bushell for Appellants Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani, Cory Struzan, Maryann Marryshow, Mija Yoo and Nelson Arias. Updated Reply Brief. Due on 12/18/2020 as to Appellant Mija Yoo. [Entered: 11/13/2020 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketReceived paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellee Glenn Arcaro. 1 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 11/13/2020 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSupplemental Appendix [1 VOLUMES] filed by Appellee Glenn Arcaro. [20-11675] (ECF: Julianna McCabe) [Entered: 11/06/2020 06:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketReceived paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellee Glenn Arcaro. [Entered: 11/06/2020 08:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Nathan M. Berman for Not Party Service and Appellee YouTube, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-11675] (ECF: Nathan Berman) [Entered: 05/29/2020 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Julianna Thomas McCabe for Appellee Glenn Arcaro [20-11675] (ECF: Julianna McCabe) [Entered: 05/28/2020 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Nathan M. Berman for Service. [20-11675] (ECF: Nathan Berman) [Entered: 05/20/2020 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Daniel A. Bushell for Appellants Nelson Arias, Maryann Marryshow, Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani, Cory Struzan and Mija Yoo. [20-11675] (ECF: Daniel Bushell) [Entered: 05/19/2020 06:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellants Nelson Arias, Maryann Marryshow, Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani and Cory Struzan. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/10/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 05/19/2020 09:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Daniel A. Bushell for Appellants Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani, Cory Struzan, Maryann Marryshow, Mija Yoo and Nelson Arias. No hearings. [Entered: 05/18/2020 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Daniel A. Bushell for Appellants Nelson Arias, Maryann Marryshow, Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani, Cory Struzan and Mija Yoo. No hearings. [20-11675] (ECF: Daniel Bushell) [Entered: 05/15/2020 06:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-11675] (ECF: Daniel Bushell) [Entered: 05/15/2020 06:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Daniel A. Bushell for Nelson Arias, Maryann Marryshow, Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani, Cory Struzan and Mija Yoo. [20-11675] (ECF: Daniel Bushell) [Entered: 05/15/2020 06:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Nelson Arias, Maryann Marryshow, Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani, Cory Struzan and Mija Yoo on 04/30/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/15/2020 as to Appellant Nelson Arias. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/29/2020 as to Appellee Glenn Arcaro [Entered: 05/05/2020 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bitconnect International, PLC is a litigant

Latest cases where YOUTUBE is a litigant