This case was last updated from PACER on 03/29/2020 at 06:00:13 (UTC).

Alasaad, et al v. Wolf, et al

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 Alasaad filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Wolf. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1081

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TECHFREEDOM

Interested Parties

REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS

CONSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNTABILITY CENTER

R STREET INSTITUTE

KNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY

BRENNAN CENTER FOR JUSTICE AT NEW YORK UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW

CENTER FOR DEMOCRACY & TECHNOLOGY

Plaintiff / Appellants and Plaintiff / Appellees

JEREMIE DUPIN

AARON GACH

NADIA ALASAAD

SIDD BIKKANNAVAR

ZAINAB MERCHANT

DIANE MAYE ZORRI

ISMAIL ABDEL-RASOUL, a/k/a Isma'il Kushkush

MATTHEW WRIGHT

MOHAMMED AKRAM SHIBLY

GHASSAN ALASAAD

Defendant / Appellees and Defendant / Appellants

MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, in his official capacity

CHAD WOLF, Acting Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security, in his official capacity

MARK A. MORGAN, Acting Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection, in his official capacity

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party and Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew S. Shapanka

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

One Citycenter, 850 10Th St, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-4956

Saira Hussain

Attorney at Electronic Frontier Foundation

815 Eddy St

San Francisco, CA 94109

David J. Nathanson

Attorney at Wood & Nathanson LLP

50 Congress St, Ste 600

Boston, MA 02109

Plaintiff / Appellant, Plaintiff / Appellee and Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathan Wessler

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts

211 Congress St, 3Rd Flr

Boston, MA 02110-2485

Matthew R. Segal

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts

211 Congress St, 3Rd Flr

Boston, MA 02110-2485

Aaron Mackey

Attorney at Electronic Frontier Foundation

815 Eddy St

San Francisco, CA 94109

Hugh Handeyside

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

125 Broad St, 18Th Flr

New York, NY 10004-0000

Jessie J. Rossman

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts

211 Congress St, 3Rd Flr

Boston, MA 02110-2485

Adam Schwartz

Attorney at Electronic Frontier Foundation

815 Eddy St

San Francisco, CA 94109

Esha Bhandari

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

125 Broad St, 18Th Flr

New York, NY 10004-0000

Sophia Sabrina Cope

Attorney at Electronic Frontier Foundation

815 Eddy St

San Francisco, CA 94109

Saira Hussain

Attorney at Electronic Frontier Foundation

815 Eddy St

San Francisco, CA 94109

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Donald Campbell Lockhart

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

1 Courthouse Way, Ste 9200

Boston, MA 02210

Marsha S. Edney

Attorney at US Dept of Justice

1100 L St Nw

Washington, DC 20530-0000

Annapurna Balakrishna

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

1 Courthouse Way, Ste 9200

Boston, MA 02210

Joshua Paul Waldman

Attorney at US Dept of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20530-0001

Michael Drezner

Attorney at US Dept of Justice

1100 L St Nw

Washington, DC 20530-0000

Scott R. McIntosh

Attorney at US Dept of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20530-0001

 

Court Documents

Open Document

NOTICE issued. After 03/12/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Michael Drezner for Matthew T. Albence, Chad Wolf and Mark A. Morgan and Marsha S. Edney for Matthew T. Albence, Chad Wolf and Mark A. Morgan. [20-1081] (CMP) [Entered: 02/27/2020 10:38 AM]

Open Document

ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Matthew T. Albence, Chad Wolf and Mark A. Morgan in 20-1077. Brief and appendix due 05/11/2020 for appellant Matthew T. Albence, Mark A. Morgan and Chad Wolf. [20-1077, 20-1081] (GAK) [Entered: 03/18/2020 04:19 PM]

Open Document

ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Matthew T. Albence, Mark A. Morgan and Chad Wolf in 20-1077, 20-1081. Certificate of service dated 03/05/2020. [20-1077, 20-1081] (JPW) [Entered: 03/05/2020 12:01 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorneys has been removed from the service list for this case: Aaron Mackey for Ghassan Alasaad, Suhaib Allababidi, Sidd Bikkannavar, Jeremie Dupin, Aaron Gach, Ismail Abdel-Rasoul, Diane Maye Zorri, Zainab Merchant, Mohammed Akram Shibly, Matthew Wright and Nadia Alasaad. [20-1081] (CMP) [Entered: 02/27/2020 10:28 AM]

Open Document

ORDER granting motion to amend caption filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Ghassan Alasaad, Suhaib Allababidi, Sidd Bikkannavar, Jeremie Dupin, Aaron Gach, Ismail Abdel-Rasoul, Diane Maye Zorri, Zainab Merchant, Mohammed Akram Shibly, Matthew Wright and Nadia Alasaad. [20-1077, 20-1081] (CMP) [Entered: 02/19/2020 09:54 AM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Information Sheet

Open Document #1

Briefing Order

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants/Cross-Appellees Matthew T. Albence, Mark A. Morgan and Chad Wolf in 20-1077, 20-1081 filed by Attorney Scott R. McIntosh. Certificate of service dated 02/13/2020. [20-1077, 20-1081] (SRM) [Entered: 02/13/2020 03:58 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Ismail Abdel-Rasoul, Ghassan Alasaad, Nadia Alasaad, Suhaib Allabadidi, Sidd Bikkannavar, Jeremie Dupin, Aaron Gach, Zainab Merchant, Mohammed Akram Shibly, Matthew Wright and Diane Maye Zorri filed by Attorney Saira Hussain. Certificate of service dated 01/30/2020. [20-1081] (SH) [Entered: 01/30/2020 07:20 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Ismail Abdel-Rasoul, Ghassan Alasaad, Nadia Alasaad, Suhaib Allabadidi, Sidd Bikkannavar, Jeremie Dupin, Aaron Gach, Zainab Merchant, Mohammed Akram Shibly, Matthew Wright and Diane Maye Zorri filed by Attorney Adam Schwartz. Certificate of service dated 01/30/2020. [20-1081] (AS) [Entered: 01/30/2020 07:15 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Ismail Abdel-Rasoul, Ghassan Alasaad, Nadia Alasaad, Suhaib Allabadidi, Sidd Bikkannavar, Jeremie Dupin, Aaron Gach, Zainab Merchant, Mohammed Akram Shibly, Matthew Wright and Diane Maye Zorri filed by Attorney Hugh Handeyside. Certificate of service dated 01/30/2020. [20-1081] (HH) [Entered: 01/30/2020 05:46 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Matthew T. Albence, Mark A. Morgan and Chad Wolf filed by Attorney Joshua Waldman. Certificate of service dated 01/30/2020. [20-1081] (JPW) [Entered: 01/30/2020 04:30 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Ismail Abdel-Rasoul, Ghassan Alasaad, Nadia Alasaad, Suhaib Allabadidi, Sidd Bikkannavar, Jeremie Dupin, Aaron Gach, Zainab Merchant, Mohammed Akram Shibly, Matthew Wright and Diane Maye Zorri filed by Attorney Esha Bhandari. Certificate of service dated 01/30/2020. [20-1081] (EB) [Entered: 01/30/2020 02:35 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Ismail Abdel-Rasoul, Ghassan Alasaad, Nadia Alasaad, Suhaib Allabadidi, Sidd Bikkannavar, Jeremie Dupin, Aaron Gach, Zainab Merchant, Mohammed Akram Shibly, Matthew Wright and Diane Maye Zorri filed by Attorney Nathan Freed Wessler. Certificate of service dated 01/30/2020. [20-1081] (NW) [Entered: 01/30/2020 01:51 PM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Matthew T. Albence, Chad Wolf and Mark A. Morgan in 20-1077. Brief and appendix due 05/11/2020 for appellant Matthew T. Albence, Mark A. Morgan and Chad Wolf. [20-1077, 20-1081] (GAK) [Entered: 03/18/2020 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Matthew T. Albence, Mark A. Morgan and Chad Wolf in 20-1077, 20-1081. Certificate of service dated 03/05/2020. [20-1077, 20-1081] (JPW) [Entered: 03/05/2020 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 03/12/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Michael Drezner for Matthew T. Albence, Chad Wolf and Mark A. Morgan and Marsha S. Edney for Matthew T. Albence, Chad Wolf and Mark A. Morgan. [20-1081] (CMP) [Entered: 02/27/2020 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorneys has been removed from the service list for this case: Aaron Mackey for Ghassan Alasaad, Suhaib Allababidi, Sidd Bikkannavar, Jeremie Dupin, Aaron Gach, Ismail Abdel-Rasoul, Diane Maye Zorri, Zainab Merchant, Mohammed Akram Shibly, Matthew Wright and Nadia Alasaad. [20-1081] (CMP) [Entered: 02/27/2020 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting motion to amend caption filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Ghassan Alasaad, Suhaib Allababidi, Sidd Bikkannavar, Jeremie Dupin, Aaron Gach, Ismail Abdel-Rasoul, Diane Maye Zorri, Zainab Merchant, Mohammed Akram Shibly, Matthew Wright and Nadia Alasaad. [20-1077, 20-1081] (CMP) [Entered: 02/19/2020 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS-APPEAL briefing schedule set pursuant to F.R.A.P. 28.1. Brief and Appendix due 03/25/2020 for appellants Matthew T. Albence, Mark A. Morgan and Chad Wolf. [20-1077, 20-1081] (RMK) [Entered: 02/14/2020 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants/Cross-Appellees Matthew T. Albence, Mark A. Morgan and Chad Wolf in 20-1077, 20-1081 filed by Attorney Scott R. McIntosh. Certificate of service dated 02/13/2020. [20-1077, 20-1081] (SRM) [Entered: 02/13/2020 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER directing the parties to proceed under F.R.A.P 28.1. [20-1077, 20-1081] (RMK) [Entered: 02/12/2020 12:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to amend caption filed by Appellees Ismail Abdel-Rasoul, Ghassan Alasaad, Nadia Alasaad, Suhaib Allabadidi, Sidd Bikkannavar, Jeremie Dupin, Aaron Gach, Zainab Merchant, Mohammed Akram Shibly, Matthew Wright and Diane Maye Zorri in 20-1077, Appellants Ismail Abdel-Rasoul, Ghassan Alasaad, Nadia Alasaad, Suhaib Allabadidi, Sidd Bikkannavar, Jeremie Dupin, Aaron Gach, Zainab Merchant, Mohammed Akram Shibly, Matthew Wright and Diane Maye Zorri in 20-1081. Certificate of service dated 02/07/2020. [20-1077, 20-1081] (NW) [Entered: 02/07/2020 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Aaron Mackey for Appellants Ghassan Alasaad, Suhaib Allabadidi, Sidd Bikkannavar, Jeremie Dupin, Aaron Gach, Ismail Abdel-Rasoul, Diane Maye Zorri, Zainab Merchant, Mohammed Akram Shibly, Matthew Wright and Nadia Alasaad. Certificate of service was not included. [20-1081] (CMP) [Entered: 02/10/2020 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Ghassan Alasaad, Nadia Alasaad, Suhaib Allabadidi, Sidd Bikkannavar, Jeremie Dupin, Aaron Gach, Ismail Abdel-Rasoul, Diane Maye Zorri, Zainab Merchant, Mohammed Akram Shibly and Matthew Wright filed by Attorney Jessie J. Rossman. Certificate of service dated 01/31/2020. [20-1081] (JJR) [Entered: 01/31/2020 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Ismail Abdel-Rasoul, Ghassan Alasaad, Nadia Alasaad, Suhaib Allabadidi, Sidd Bikkannavar, Jeremie Dupin, Aaron Gach, Zainab Merchant, Mohammed Akram Shibly, Matthew Wright and Diane Maye Zorri filed by Attorney Sophia Cope. Certificate of service dated 01/30/2020. [20-1081] (SSC) [Entered: 01/30/2020 07:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Ismail Abdel-Rasoul, Ghassan Alasaad, Nadia Alasaad, Suhaib Allabadidi, Sidd Bikkannavar, Jeremie Dupin, Aaron Gach, Zainab Merchant, Mohammed Akram Shibly, Matthew Wright and Diane Maye Zorri filed by Attorney Saira Hussain. Certificate of service dated 01/30/2020. [20-1081] (SH) [Entered: 01/30/2020 07:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Ismail Abdel-Rasoul, Ghassan Alasaad, Nadia Alasaad, Suhaib Allabadidi, Sidd Bikkannavar, Jeremie Dupin, Aaron Gach, Zainab Merchant, Mohammed Akram Shibly, Matthew Wright and Diane Maye Zorri filed by Attorney Adam Schwartz. Certificate of service dated 01/30/2020. [20-1081] (AS) [Entered: 01/30/2020 07:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Ismail Abdel-Rasoul, Ghassan Alasaad, Nadia Alasaad, Suhaib Allabadidi, Sidd Bikkannavar, Jeremie Dupin, Aaron Gach, Zainab Merchant, Mohammed Akram Shibly, Matthew Wright and Diane Maye Zorri filed by Attorney Hugh Handeyside. Certificate of service dated 01/30/2020. [20-1081] (HH) [Entered: 01/30/2020 05:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Matthew T. Albence, Mark A. Morgan and Chad Wolf filed by Attorney Joshua Waldman. Certificate of service dated 01/30/2020. [20-1081] (JPW) [Entered: 01/30/2020 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Ismail Abdel-Rasoul, Ghassan Alasaad, Nadia Alasaad, Suhaib Allabadidi, Sidd Bikkannavar, Jeremie Dupin, Aaron Gach, Zainab Merchant, Mohammed Akram Shibly, Matthew Wright and Diane Maye Zorri filed by Attorney Esha Bhandari. Certificate of service dated 01/30/2020. [20-1081] (EB) [Entered: 01/30/2020 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Ismail Abdel-Rasoul, Ghassan Alasaad, Nadia Alasaad, Suhaib Allabadidi, Sidd Bikkannavar, Jeremie Dupin, Aaron Gach, Zainab Merchant, Mohammed Akram Shibly, Matthew Wright and Diane Maye Zorri filed by Attorney Nathan Freed Wessler. Certificate of service dated 01/30/2020. [20-1081] (NW) [Entered: 01/30/2020 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketPublic docket note: Chad Wolf was sworn in as Secretary of Homeland Security on November 13, 2019. We have substituted him for Acting Secretary Elaine Duke, as the appellee. Mark A. Morgan was sworn in as Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection on July 5, 2019. We have substituted him for Acting Commissioner Kevin McAleenan, as the appellee. Matthew Albence was sworn in as Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement on July 5, 2019. We have substituted him for Acting Director Thomas Homan, as the appellee. [20-1081] (RMK) [Entered: 01/29/2020 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #117) filed by Appellants Ismail Abdel-Rasoul, Ghassan Alasaad, Nadia Alasaad, Suhaib Allabadidi, Sidd Bikkannavar, Jeremie Dupin, Aaron Gach, Zainab Merchant, Mohammed Akram Shibly, Matthew Wright and Diane Maye Zorri. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 02/12/2020. [20-1081] (RMK) [Entered: 01/29/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY is a litigant