This case was last updated from PACER on 09/28/2019 at 06:05:41 (UTC).

Akube Ndoromo v. William Barr, et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2019 Akube Ndoromo filed an Other lawsuit against William Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5211

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

William Pelham Barr, U.S. Attorney General

Jessie Kong Liu, U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia

Plaintiff / Appellant

Akube Wuromoni Ndoromo, also known as Akiuber Ndoromo James

Washington, DC 20010

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

R. Craig Lawrence

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Scott Leeson Sroka

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Akube Wuromoni Ndoromo

1525 Newton Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20010

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1808378] filed granting motion to extend time [ # 1806468-2 ]; directing response to motion for summary reversal [ # 1805507-2 ] Response due on 10/28/2019, combined with APPELLEE dispositive motion, if any, due 10/28/2019 [19-5211] [Entered: 09/27/2019 12:32 PM]

Open Document

MOTION [1806468] to extend time to file motion to 10/28/2019 filed by Jessie Kong Liu and William Pelham Barr (Service Date: 09/13/2019 by US Mail) Length Certification: 320 Words. [19-5211] (Sroka, Scott) [Entered: 09/13/2019 02:14 PM]

Open Document

MOTION [1805507] for summary reversal (Response to Motion served by mail due on 09/19/2019) filed by Akube Wuromoni Ndoromo (Service Date: 09/04/2019 by US Mail) Length Certification: 16 pages. [19-5211] [Entered: 09/09/2019 10:39 AM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1804150] filed by William Pelham Barr and Jessie Kong Liu [Service Date: 08/29/2019 ] [19-5211] (Sroka, Scott) [Entered: 08/29/2019 09:06 AM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1804149] filed by Scott Sroka on behalf of Appellees William Pelham Barr and Jessie Kong Liu. [19-5211] (Sroka, Scott) [Entered: 08/29/2019 09:05 AM]

Open Document

APPENDIX [1803684] filed by Akube Wuromoni Ndoromo. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 08/21/2019 ] [19-5211] [Entered: 08/26/2019 03:13 PM]

Open Document

APPELLANT BRIEF [1803683] filed by Akube Wuromoni Ndoromo [Service Date: 08/21/2019 ] Length of Brief: 35 pages. [19-5211] [Entered: 08/26/2019 03:11 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, DOCKETING STATEMENT, TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT, CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS, AND RELATED CASES [1803493] filed by Akube Wuromoni Ndoromo. [19-5211] [Entered: 08/23/2019 04:01 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1801245] received from Illegible [signed for on 08/02/2019] for order [1799755-2] sent to Appellant Akube Wuromoni Ndoromo [19-5211] [Entered: 08/08/2019 01:26 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1799754] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 08/29/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 08/29/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 08/29/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 08/29/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 08/29/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 08/29/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 08/29/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 08/29/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 09/13/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 08/29/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 08/29/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 08/29/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 09/13/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5211] [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:37 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1799743] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-02339-CKK filed by Akube Wuromoni Ndoromo. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5211. [19-5211] [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:28 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1808378] filed granting motion to extend time [ # 1806468-2 ]; directing response to motion for summary reversal [ # 1805507-2 ] Response due on 10/28/2019, combined with APPELLEE dispositive motion, if any, due 10/28/2019 [19-5211] [Entered: 09/27/2019 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1806468] to extend time to file motion to 10/28/2019 filed by Jessie Kong Liu and William Pelham Barr (Service Date: 09/13/2019 by US Mail) Length Certification: 320 Words. [19-5211] (Sroka, Scott) [Entered: 09/13/2019 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1805507] for summary reversal (Response to Motion served by mail due on 09/19/2019) filed by Akube Wuromoni Ndoromo (Service Date: 09/04/2019 by US Mail) Length Certification: 16 pages. [19-5211] [Entered: 09/09/2019 10:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1804150] filed by William Pelham Barr and Jessie Kong Liu [Service Date: 08/29/2019 ] [19-5211] (Sroka, Scott) [Entered: 08/29/2019 09:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1804149] filed by Scott Sroka on behalf of Appellees William Pelham Barr and Jessie Kong Liu. [19-5211] (Sroka, Scott) [Entered: 08/29/2019 09:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPENDIX [1803684] filed by Akube Wuromoni Ndoromo. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 08/21/2019 ] [19-5211] [Entered: 08/26/2019 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT BRIEF [1803683] filed by Akube Wuromoni Ndoromo [Service Date: 08/21/2019 ] Length of Brief: 35 pages. [19-5211] [Entered: 08/26/2019 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, DOCKETING STATEMENT, TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT, CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS, AND RELATED CASES [1803493] filed by Akube Wuromoni Ndoromo. [19-5211] [Entered: 08/23/2019 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1801245] received from Illegible [signed for on 08/02/2019] for order [1799755-2] sent to Appellant Akube Wuromoni Ndoromo [19-5211] [Entered: 08/08/2019 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • CERTIFIED MAIL and FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1799755] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7019 0700 0000 5269 1034] of order [ # 1799754-2 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 08/29/2019 from Akube Wuromoni Ndoromo. [19-5211] [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1799754] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 08/29/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 08/29/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 08/29/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 08/29/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 08/29/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 08/29/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 08/29/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 08/29/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 09/13/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 08/29/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 08/29/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 08/29/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 09/13/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5211] [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1799743] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-02339-CKK filed by Akube Wuromoni Ndoromo. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5211. [19-5211] [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5211] [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less