This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/04/2022 at 16:52:20 (UTC).

Akira Technologies, Inc. v. Conceptant, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/11/2018 Akira Technologies, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Conceptant, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    18-1655

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Defendants

CHIRON SOLUTIONS, INC.

DAVID WOOD

SHANNON MUNLEY

Plaintiff / Appellee

AKIRA TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

Defendant / Appellants

CONCEPTANT, INC.

NUCOGNITION, INC.

JOSHUA PHIPPS

ANDREY MIKHALCHUK

LISA HOULE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Christopher Shiplett

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Peter Charles Cohen

 

Court Documents

#39

(#39) UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00412-LO-IDD. Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [1000508415]. [18-1655] EB [Entered: 05/08/2019 08:08 AM]

#41

(#41) Mandate issued. Referencing: [ # 39 ] unpublished per curiam opinion, [ # 40 ] Judgment order. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00412-LO-IDD. [18-1655] EB [Entered: 05/30/2019 08:45 AM]

40 #2

Judgment order filed

40 #1

Notice of Judgment

#37

(#37) ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Akira Technologies, Inc.. Counsel arguing: Christopher Shiplett Opening argument time: 15 Answering argument time: 20 Rebuttal argument time: 5 . [1000454219] [18-1655] Christopher Shiplett [Entered: 02/08/2019 09:07 AM]

#36

(#36) ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Conceptant, Inc., Lisa Houle, Andrey Mikhalchuk, NuCognition, Inc. and Joshua Phipps. Counsel arguing: Peter C. Cohen Opening argument time: 15 minutes Rebuttal argument time: 5 minutes . [1000448610] [18-1655] Peter Cohen [Entered: 01/30/2019 05:00 PM]

#35

(#35) CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 03/19/2019. Registration Time: 8:45 - 9:00. Daily Arguments Begin: 9:30. Oral argument acknowledgment form due within 10 days. [18-1655] JLC [Entered: 01/29/2019 10:49 AM]

#32

(#32) CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 3/19/19 - 3/21/19 argument session. Additional copies due: 01/09/2019. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 01/14/2019. [18-1655] JLC [Entered: 01/04/2019 01:01 PM]

#28

No Description Available

#26

No Description Available

#25

No Description Available

#23

No Description Available

21 #5

volume 5

21 #4

volume4

21 #3

volume 3

21 #2

volume 2

21 #1

volume 1

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Mandate issued. Referencing: [ # 39 ] unpublished per curiam opinion, [ # 40 ] Judgment order. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00412-LO-IDD. [18-1655] EB [Entered: 05/30/2019 08:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Decision: Affirmed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00412-LO-IDD. Entered on Docket Date: 05/08/2019. [1000508419] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [18-1655] EB [Entered: 05/08/2019 08:10 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00412-LO-IDD. Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [1000508415]. [18-1655] EB [Entered: 05/08/2019 08:08 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Docket(#38) ORAL ARGUMENT heard before the Honorable Roger L. Gregory, Albert Diaz and Pamela A. Harris. Attorneys arguing case: Mr. Peter Charles Cohen for Appellants Conceptant, Inc., NuCognition, Inc., Joshua Phipps, Andrey Mikhalchuk and Lisa Houle and Christopher Shiplett for Appellee Akira Technologies, Inc.. Courtroom Deputy: Tarika Scott. [1000478218] [18-1655] TS [Entered: 03/19/2019 01:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Akira Technologies, Inc.. Counsel arguing: Christopher Shiplett Opening argument time: 15 Answering argument time: 20 Rebuttal argument time: 5 . [1000454219] [18-1655] Christopher Shiplett [Entered: 02/08/2019 09:07 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Conceptant, Inc., Lisa Houle, Andrey Mikhalchuk, NuCognition, Inc. and Joshua Phipps. Counsel arguing: Peter C. Cohen Opening argument time: 15 minutes Rebuttal argument time: 5 minutes . [1000448610] [18-1655] Peter Cohen [Entered: 01/30/2019 05:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 03/19/2019. Registration Time: 8:45 - 9:00. Daily Arguments Begin: 9:30. Oral argument acknowledgment form due within 10 days. [18-1655] JLC [Entered: 01/29/2019 10:49 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Docket(#34) 3 Additional copies of the OPENING BRIEF, REPLY BRIEF, and JOINT APPENDIX Volumes 1-6 (Volume 6 Sealed) received from Conceptant, Inc., Lisa Houle, Andrey Mikhalchuk, NuCognition, Inc. and Joshua Phipps. [18-1655] TB [Entered: 01/09/2019 09:25 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Docket(#33) 3 Additional copies of the RESPONSE BRIEF received from Akira Technologies, Inc. [18-1655] TB [Entered: 01/08/2019 03:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 3/19/19 - 3/21/19 argument session. Additional copies due: 01/09/2019. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 01/14/2019. [18-1655] JLC [Entered: 01/04/2019 01:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants Conceptant, Inc., Lisa Houle, Andrey Mikhalchuk, NuCognition, Inc. and Joshua Phipps. [18-1655] Peter Cohen [Entered: 06/25/2018 11:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Appellee Akira Technologies, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000311999] [18-1655] Christopher Shiplett [Entered: 06/13/2018 06:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Christopher Shiplett for Akira Technologies, Inc..[1000311998] [18-1655] Christopher Shiplett [Entered: 06/13/2018 05:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Peter C. Cohen for Conceptant, Inc., Lisa Houle, Andrey Mikhalchuk, NuCognition, Inc. and Joshua Phipps.[1000311705] [18-1655] Peter Cohen [Entered: 06/13/2018 12:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER filed [1000311667] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 5 ]. Number of days granted: 21. Opening brief and appendix due 08/13/2018. Response brief due 09/10/2018. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Nishat Azam; David Eric Murphy. [18-1655] EB [Entered: 06/13/2018 12:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION by Appellants Conceptant, Inc., Lisa Houle, Andrey Mikhalchuk, NuCognition, Inc. and Joshua Phipps to extend filing time for opening brief, appendix, response brief, reply brief until Opening brief and appendix: August 13, 2018. Response brief: September 10, 2018. Reply brief: within 14 days of service of response brief... Date and method of service: 06/13/2018 ecf. [1000311654] [18-1655] Peter Cohen [Entered: 06/13/2018 11:51 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Appellants Conceptant, Inc., Lisa Houle, Andrey Mikhalchuk, NuCognition, Inc. and Joshua Phipps. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000311649] [18-1655] Peter Cohen [Entered: 06/13/2018 11:36 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Nishat Azam; David Eric Murphy. Opening Brief and Appendix due 07/23/2018. Response Brief due 08/20/2018. [18-1655] EB [Entered: 06/11/2018 11:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] Case. Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00412-LO-IDD. Mailed to: Nishat Azam; David Eric Murphy. [18-1655] EB [Entered: 06/11/2018 11:41 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00412-LO-IDD. Case manager: EBorneisen. [18-1655] EB [Entered: 06/11/2018 11:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less