This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/15/2022 at 06:04:27 (UTC).

Akeem Fuller, et al v. Warren County, OH Educational Service Center, et al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 Akeem Fuller filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Warren County, OH Educational Service Center. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-3228

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

AKEEM FULLER

NICK EVANS

MARK LINQUIST

Defendant / Appellants

WARREN COUNTY, OH EDUCATIONAL SERVICE CENTER

TOM ISAACS, Superintendent of the Warren County, OH Educational Service Center

PAT PARE, Senior Executive Director of the Warren County, OH Educational Service Center

ALISHA DEAN, Program Supervisor of the Warren County, OH Educational Service Center

WILEY COLLETT, Program Supervisor of the Warren County, OH Educational Service Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Marc D. Mezibov

Attorney at Mezibov Butler

615 Elsinore Place, Suite 105

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Brian Joseph Butler

Attorney at Mezibov Butler

615 Elsinore Place, Suite 105

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Bernard William Wharton

Attorney at McCaslin, Imbus & McCaslin

632 Vine Street, Suite 900

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Wiley Collett, Alisha Dean, Tom Isaacs, Pat Pare and Warren County, OH Educational Service Center. Transcript needed: y. (RLB) [Entered: 03/16/2022 09:53 AM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Nick Evans, Akeem Fuller and Mark Linquist by Marc D. Mezibov. Certificate of Service: 03/16/2022. [22-3228] (MDM) [Entered: 03/16/2022 11:18 AM]

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Marc D. Mezibov for Appellees Nick Evans, Akeem Fuller and Mark Linquist Certificate of Service: 03/16/2022. [22-3228] (MDM) [Entered: 03/16/2022 11:19 AM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Nick Evans, Akeem Fuller and Mark Linquist by Brian J. Butler. Certificate of Service: 03/16/2022. [22-3228] (BJB) [Entered: 03/16/2022 11:21 AM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 04/12/2022 at 9:30 AM (ET) with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 03/17/2022 12:22 PM]

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Bernard William Wharton for Appellants Wiley Collett, Alisha Dean, Tom Isaacs, Pat Pare and Warren County, OH Educational Service Center.. Certificate of Service: 03/22/2022. [22-3228] (BWW) [Entered: 03/22/2022 12:22 PM]

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Bernard William Wharton for Appellants Wiley Collett, Alisha Dean, Tom Isaacs, Pat Pare and Warren County, OH Educational Service Center Certificate of Service: 03/22/2022. [22-3228] (BWW) [Entered: 03/22/2022 12:23 PM]

#10

(#10) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 7 ], filed by Mr. Bernard William Wharton for Warren County, OH Educational Service Center, Tom Isaacs, Pat Pare, Alisha Dean and Wiley Collett is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. Deficiency to be corrected by 03/29/2022. (RLB) [Entered: 03/22/2022 01:14 PM]

#11

(#11) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Wiley Collett, Alisha Dean, Tom Isaacs, Pat Pare and Warren County, OH Educational Service Center by Bernard W. Wharton. Certificate of Service: 03/22/2022. [22-3228] (BWW) [Entered: 03/22/2022 01:45 PM]

#12

RESTRICTED

#15

(#15) BRIEFING LETTER SENT: appellant brief due 05/16/2022; appellee brief due 06/14/2022. (PJE) [Entered: 04/05/2022 07:29 AM]

#16

(#16) VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Follow-up Mediation conference has been scheduled for 05/11/2022 at 9:30 AM (ET) with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details.] (LMR) [Entered: 04/12/2022 11:25 AM]

#17

(#17) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 06/30/2022. appellee brief now due 08/01/2022. (LMR) [Entered: 04/12/2022 11:26 AM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 06/30/2022. appellee brief now due 08/01/2022. (LMR) [Entered: 04/12/2022 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Follow-up Mediation conference has been scheduled for 05/11/2022 at 9:30 AM (ET) with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details.] (LMR) [Entered: 04/12/2022 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) BRIEFING LETTER SENT: appellant brief due 05/16/2022; appellee brief due 06/14/2022. (PJE) [Entered: 04/05/2022 07:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • Docket(#14) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Mr. Bernard William Wharton for Wiley Collett, Alisha Dean, Tom Isaacs, Pat Pare and Warren County, OH Educational Service Center. fCertificate of Service: 04/04/2022. [22-3228] (BWW) [Entered: 04/04/2022 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE: The initial transcript order has not been completed. If not completed by 04/04/2022 further action will be taken. (RLB) [Entered: 03/31/2022 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ***DOCUMENT LOCKED - SEE CORRECTED FILING MADE AT #11*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Wiley Collett, Alisha Dean, Tom Isaacs, Pat Pare and Warren County, OH Educational Service Center by Bernard W. Wharton. Certificate of Service: 03/22/2022. [22-3228]--[Edited 03/22/2022 by RLB] (BWW) [Entered: 03/22/2022 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Wiley Collett, Alisha Dean, Tom Isaacs, Pat Pare and Warren County, OH Educational Service Center by Bernard W. Wharton. Certificate of Service: 03/22/2022. [22-3228] (BWW) [Entered: 03/22/2022 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 7 ], filed by Mr. Bernard William Wharton for Warren County, OH Educational Service Center, Tom Isaacs, Pat Pare, Alisha Dean and Wiley Collett is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. Deficiency to be corrected by 03/29/2022. (RLB) [Entered: 03/22/2022 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Bernard William Wharton for Appellants Wiley Collett, Alisha Dean, Tom Isaacs, Pat Pare and Warren County, OH Educational Service Center Certificate of Service: 03/22/2022. [22-3228] (BWW) [Entered: 03/22/2022 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Bernard William Wharton for Appellants Wiley Collett, Alisha Dean, Tom Isaacs, Pat Pare and Warren County, OH Educational Service Center.. Certificate of Service: 03/22/2022. [22-3228] (BWW) [Entered: 03/22/2022 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ***DOCUMENT LOCKED - INCORRECT FORMAT - COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AS A NON-MODIFIABLE .pdf DOCUMENT*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Wiley Collett, Alisha Dean, Tom Isaacs, Pat Pare and Warren County, OH Educational Service Center by Bernard W. Wharton. Certificate of Service: 03/22/2022. [22-3228]--[Edited 03/22/2022 by RLB] (BWW) [Entered: 03/22/2022 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 04/12/2022 at 9:30 AM (ET) with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 03/17/2022 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Nick Evans, Akeem Fuller and Mark Linquist by Brian J. Butler. Certificate of Service: 03/16/2022. [22-3228] (BJB) [Entered: 03/16/2022 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Marc D. Mezibov for Appellees Nick Evans, Akeem Fuller and Mark Linquist Certificate of Service: 03/16/2022. [22-3228] (MDM) [Entered: 03/16/2022 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Nick Evans, Akeem Fuller and Mark Linquist by Marc D. Mezibov. Certificate of Service: 03/16/2022. [22-3228] (MDM) [Entered: 03/16/2022 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Robin L. Baker (RLB) [Entered: 03/16/2022 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Wiley Collett, Alisha Dean, Tom Isaacs, Pat Pare and Warren County, OH Educational Service Center. Transcript needed: y. (RLB) [Entered: 03/16/2022 09:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less