This case was last updated from PACER on 02/25/2020 at 06:01:39 (UTC).

Ajay Kajla v. Wells Fargo Bank NA, et al

Case Summary

On 12/27/2019 Ajay Kajla filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank NA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3979

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

PHELAN HALLINAN DIAMOND & JONES PC

US BANK NA AS TRUSTEE FOR CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON MBS ARMT 2005-8

US BANK NA AS TRUSTEE FOR ADJUSTABLE RATE MORTGAGE TRUST 2005-8 ADJUSTABLE RATE MORTGAGE BACKED PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-8

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Plaintiff / Appellant

AJAY KAJLA

Eatontown, NJ 07724

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Sherri J. Smith Esq.

Attorney at Phelan Hallinan Diamond & Jones

1617 John F. Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Craig S. Keiser Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of New Jersey

25 Market Street, Richard J. Hughes Justice Complex

Trenton, NJ 08625

Lauren S. Zabel Esq.

Attorney at Reed Smith

1717 Arch Street, Three Logan Square, Suite 3100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Henry F. Reichner Esq.

Attorney at Reed Smith

1717 Arch Street, Three Logan Square, Suite 3100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Ajay Kajla

170B Eatoncrest Drive

Eatontown, NJ 07724

 

Court Documents

Open Document #6

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #3

DC Memorandum 11/30/19

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Wells Fargo Bank NA. [19-3979] (HFR) [Entered: 02/14/2020 01:16 PM]

#3

(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Henry F. Reichner on behalf of Appellee(s) Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee. [20-1120, 19-3979] (HFR) [Entered: 02/14/2020 11:32 AM]

#6

(#6) NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Appellees US Bank NA as Trustee for Adjustable Rate Mortgage Trust 2005-8 Adjustable Rate Mortgage Backed Pass Through Certificates Series 2005-8, US Bank NA as Trustee for Credit Suisse First Boston MBS Armt 2005-8 and Wells Fargo Bank NA requesting Compliance due 02/18/2020. (SB) [Entered: 02/14/2020 03:12 PM]

Open Document #5

Standing Order

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees US Bank NA as Trustee for Adjustable Rate Mortgage Trust 2005-8 Adjustable Rate Mortgage Backed Pass Through Certificates Series 2005-8 and US Bank NA as Trustee for Credit Suisse First Boston MBS Armt 2005-8. [19-3979] (HFR) [Entered: 02/14/2020 01:18 PM]

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

Open Document #4

caption

Open Document #2

DC Order 11/30/19

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Henry F. Reichner on behalf of Appellee(s) Wells Fargo Bank, U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for Credit Suisse First Boston MBS ARMT 2005-8 and U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Adjustable Rate Mortgage Trust 2005-8, Adjustable Rate Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-8.. [19-3979] (HFR) [Entered: 02/17/2020 09:56 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Henry F. Reichner on behalf of Appellee(s) Wells Fargo Bank, U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for Credit Suisse First Boston MBS ARMT 2005-8 and U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Adjustable Rate Mortgage Trust 2005-8, Adjustable Rate Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-8.. [19-3979] (HFR) [Entered: 02/17/2020 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Appellees US Bank NA as Trustee for Adjustable Rate Mortgage Trust 2005-8 Adjustable Rate Mortgage Backed Pass Through Certificates Series 2005-8, US Bank NA as Trustee for Credit Suisse First Boston MBS Armt 2005-8 and Wells Fargo Bank NA requesting Compliance due 02/18/2020. (SB) [Entered: 02/14/2020 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees US Bank NA as Trustee for Adjustable Rate Mortgage Trust 2005-8 Adjustable Rate Mortgage Backed Pass Through Certificates Series 2005-8 and US Bank NA as Trustee for Credit Suisse First Boston MBS Armt 2005-8. [19-3979] (HFR) [Entered: 02/14/2020 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Wells Fargo Bank NA. [19-3979] (HFR) [Entered: 02/14/2020 01:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Henry F. Reichner on behalf of Appellee(s) Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee. [20-1120, 19-3979] (HFR) [Entered: 02/14/2020 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) [Entered: 12/27/2019 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Ajay Kajla in District Court No. 3-18-cv-16818. (TMM) [Entered: 12/27/2019 11:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.