This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:01:10 (UTC).

Ajaj v. Federal Bureau of Prisons

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Ajaj filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Federal Bureau of Prisons. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1250

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

D. PARRY, Officer, in his official capacity

KENNETH CRANK, Inmate Trust Fund Supervisor, in his official capacity

D. PARRY, in his individual capacity

BILL TRUE, Warden, in his official capacity

GEORGE KNOX, Religious Counselor, in his individual capacity

MICHAEL CASTLE, Chaplain, in his official capacity

CALVIN JOHNSON, Associate Warden, in his individual capacity

JOHN OLIVER, Warden, in his individual capacity

SAMANTHA MCCOIC, Medical Staff, in her individual capacity

JASON HENDERSON, Chaplain, in his official capacity

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

ROGER HUDDLESTON, Nurse, in his official capacity

RONALD CAMACHO, Physician Assistant, in his individual capacity

TARA HALL, Associate Warden, in her individual capacity

K. MORROW, Medical Staff, in her official capacity

CHRIS LAMB, Associate Warden, in his official capacity

DAVID B. BERKEBILE, Warden, in his individual capacity

Defendant / Appellee

FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS

Plaintiff / Appellant

AHMAD AJAJ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Susan Begesse Prose

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

1801 California Street, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80202

Lowell Sturgill Jr.

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Kevin T. Traskos

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

1801 California Street, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80202

Lauren Marie Dickey

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

1801 California Street, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80202

Clay C. Cook

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

1801 California Street, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80202

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Laura Rovner

Attorney at University of Denver

2255 East Evans Avenue

Denver, CO 80208-0000

Danielle C. Jefferis

Attorney at University of Denver

2255 East Evans Avenue, Room 335

Denver, CO 80208

Nicole Brianne Godfrey

Attorney at University of Denver Sturm College of Law

2255 East Evans Avenue

Denver, CO 80205

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

New General Dkt Letter With Counsel

Open Document

[10667050] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Ahmad Ajaj. Transcript ordered: Served on: 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1250] NBG [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:53 PM]

Open Document

[10663785] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Lowell Sturgill, Jr. for United States of America, Bill True, D. Parry, John Oliver, K. Morrow, Samantha McCoic, Mr. Chris Lamb, George Knox, Calvin Johnson, Roger Huddleston, Jason Henderson, Tara Hall, Kenneth Crank, Michael Castle, Mr. Ronald Camacho, Mr. David B. Berkebile and Federal Bureau of Prisons. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/17/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1250] [Entered: 07/17/2019 02:50 PM]

Open Document

[10667033] Docketing statement filed by Ahmad Ajaj. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1250] NBG [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:38 PM]

Open Document #1

Prelim ROA

Open Document

[10667032] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Nicole Brianne Godfrey, Ms. Danielle C. Jefferis, and Ms. Laura Rovner for Ahmad Ajaj. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1250] [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:35 PM]

Open Document

[10669529] Motion filed by Appellant Ahmad Ajaj to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 10/09/2019. Served on: 08/08/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1250] DCJ [Entered: 08/08/2019 06:38 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2019
  • [10669549] Minute order filed by Clerk of the Court- granting appellant's motion to extend time to file appellant's brief and appendix. Appellant's brief and appendix now due on 10/09/2019 for Ahmad Ajaj. No further extensions will be granted under the clerk's auithority. Text only entry - no attachment. [19-1250]--[Edited 08/09/2019 by LG to correct date due] [Entered: 08/09/2019 08:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10669529] Motion filed by Appellant Ahmad Ajaj to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 10/09/2019. Served on: 08/08/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1250] DCJ [Entered: 08/08/2019 06:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • [10667245] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 07/31/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 09/09/2019 for Ahmad Ajaj. [text only entry - no document attached] [19-1250] [Entered: 07/31/2019 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • [10667057] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 08/06/2019 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-1250] [Entered: 07/30/2019 05:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10667050] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Ahmad Ajaj. Transcript ordered: Served on: 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1250] NBG [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10667033] Docketing statement filed by Ahmad Ajaj. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1250] NBG [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10667032] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Nicole Brianne Godfrey, Ms. Danielle C. Jefferis, and Ms. Laura Rovner for Ahmad Ajaj. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1250] [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • [10667029] Entry of appearance submitted by Nicole B. Godfrey, Danielle C. Jefferis, Laura Rovner for Appellant Ahmad Ajaj for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 07/30/2019 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 7/30/2019.] [19-1250] NBG [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663785] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Lowell Sturgill, Jr. for United States of America, Bill True, D. Parry, John Oliver, K. Morrow, Samantha McCoic, Mr. Chris Lamb, George Knox, Calvin Johnson, Roger Huddleston, Jason Henderson, Tara Hall, Kenneth Crank, Michael Castle, Mr. Ronald Camacho, Mr. David B. Berkebile and Federal Bureau of Prisons. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/17/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1250] [Entered: 07/17/2019 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • [10663760] Entry of appearance submitted by Lowell V. Sturgill Jr. for Not Parties Mr. David B. Berkebile, Mr. Ronald Camacho, Michael Castle, Kenneth Crank, Tara Hall, Jason Henderson, Roger Huddleston, Calvin Johnson, George Knox, Mr. Chris Lamb, Samantha McCoic, K. Morrow, John Oliver, D. Parry, D. Parry, Bill True, United States of America and Appellee Federal Bureau of Prisons for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1250]--[Edited 07/17/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 7/17/19] LS [Entered: 07/17/2019 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663470] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/16/2019. Docketing statement due 07/30/2019 for Ahmad Ajaj. Transcript order form due 07/30/2019 for Ahmad Ajaj. Notice of appearance due on 07/30/2019 for Ahmad Ajaj and Federal Bureau of Prisons. [19-1250] [Entered: 07/16/2019 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.