This case was last updated from PACER on 04/01/2019 at 06:04:57 (UTC).

Airbnb, Inc. v. The City of New York

Case Summary

On 01/31/2019 Airbnb, Inc filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against The City of New York. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-288

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

City of New York

Plaintiff / Appellees

HomeAway.com, Inc.

Airbnb, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Kathy Chang Park Esq.

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Mylan L. Denerstein Esq.

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Roberta Kaplan

Attorney at Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP

350 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10118

John Charles Quinn Esq.

Attorney at Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP

350 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10118

 

Court Documents

3 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#25

(#25) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant City of New York Brief due date as 05/16/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 05/16/2019, FILED.[2500079] [19-288] [Entered: 02/20/2019 09:05 AM]

1 #2

Case FILED

3 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#12

(#12) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant City of New York, FILED. Service date 02/14/2019 by CM/ECF.[2497327] [19-288] [Entered: 02/14/2019 05:03 PM]

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

#17

(#17) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Airbnb, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/15/2019 by CM/ECF. [2498484] [19-288] [Entered: 02/15/2019 05:20 PM]

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant City of New York, FILED. Service date 02/14/2019 by CM/ECF. [2496978] [19-288] [Entered: 02/14/2019 01:31 PM]

#11

(#11) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant City of New York, FILED. Service date 02/14/2019 by CM/ECF.[2497178] [19-288] [Entered: 02/14/2019 03:50 PM]

#10

(#10) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant City of New York, FILED. Service date 02/14/2019 by CM/ECF.[2497118] [19-288] [Entered: 02/14/2019 03:22 PM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 01/03/2019, RECEIVED.[2487406] [19-288] [Entered: 02/01/2019 12:15 PM]

#13

(#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee HomeAway.com, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/14/2019 by CM/ECF.[2497370] [19-288] [Entered: 02/14/2019 07:09 PM]

#16

(#16) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant City of New York, informing Court of proposed due date 05/16/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 02/15/2019 by CM/ECF.[2498087] [19-288] [Entered: 02/15/2019 01:14 PM]

#22

(#22) NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[2499174] [19-288] [Entered: 02/19/2019 12:53 PM]

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant City of New York Brief due date as 05/16/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 05/16/2019, FILED.[2500079] [19-288] [Entered: 02/20/2019 09:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[2499174] [19-288] [Entered: 02/19/2019 12:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ATTORNEY, John Charles Quinn for Airbnb, Inc., in case 19-288, [ # 17 ], ADDED.[2498623] [19-288] [Entered: 02/19/2019 09:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Airbnb, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/15/2019 by CM/ECF. [2498484] [19-288] [Entered: 02/15/2019 05:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant City of New York, informing Court of proposed due date 05/16/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 02/15/2019 by CM/ECF.[2498087] [19-288] [Entered: 02/15/2019 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee HomeAway.com, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/14/2019 by CM/ECF.[2497370] [19-288] [Entered: 02/14/2019 07:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant City of New York, FILED. Service date 02/14/2019 by CM/ECF.[2497327] [19-288] [Entered: 02/14/2019 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant City of New York, FILED. Service date 02/14/2019 by CM/ECF.[2497178] [19-288] [Entered: 02/14/2019 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant City of New York, FILED. Service date 02/14/2019 by CM/ECF.[2497118] [19-288] [Entered: 02/14/2019 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • (#9) NEW PARTY, Appellee HomeAway.com, Inc., ADDED.[2497096] [19-288] [Entered: 02/14/2019 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY, Kathy Chang Park, [ # 7 ], in place of attorney Zachary W, Carter, SUBSTITUTED.[2497083] [19-288] [Entered: 02/14/2019 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant City of New York, FILED. Service date 02/14/2019 by CM/ECF. [2496978] [19-288] [Entered: 02/14/2019 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • (#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant City of New York, district court receipt # 465401228068, FILED.[2488799] [19-288] [Entered: 02/04/2019 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2487425] [19-288] [Entered: 02/01/2019 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 01/03/2019, RECEIVED.[2487406] [19-288] [Entered: 02/01/2019 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant City of New York, FILED. [2487394] [19-288] [Entered: 02/01/2019 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.