This case was last updated from PACER on 12/20/2019 at 06:07:18 (UTC).

Aguilera v. City of Colorado Springs, et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2019 Aguilera filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Colorado Springs. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1398

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

ANGIE NEIVES, in her official and individual capacity

BRETT LACEY, in his official and individual capacity

CITY OF COLORADO SPRINGS, a municipality

DANIELLE MCCLARIN, in her official and individual capacity

ROGER VARGASON, in his official and individual capacity

ROBERT MITCHELL, in his official and individual capacity

Plaintiff / Appellant

CANDACE AGUILERA

Colorado Springs, CO 80909

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Anne Turner

Attorney at City Attorney's Office

30 South Nevada Avenue, Suite 501

Colorado Springs, CO 80903

Peter A. Lichtman

Attorney at El Paso County Attorney

200 South Cascade Avenue, Suite 150

Colorado Springs, CO 80903-2208

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Candace Aguilera

1850 North Academy

Colorado Springs, CO 80909

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10700251] Appellant brief filed by Mrs. Candace Aguilera. Original and 4 copies. Served on 12/04/2019 by US Mail. Required 10th Cir. R. 28.2 Attachments Included? n. Appellees brief due 01/03/2020 for City of Colorado Springs, Danielle McClarin, Angie Neives, Roger Vargason, Brett Lacey and Robert Mitchell [19-1398] [Entered: 12/05/2019 12:55 PM]

Open Document

[10700246] Entry of appearance filed by Mrs. Candace Aguilera. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/04/2019. Manner of Service: hand delivery [19-1398] [Entered: 12/05/2019 12:47 PM]

Open Document

[10692587] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Appellant's motion for permission to file electronically upon completion of the requirements set forth in the attached order. This order permits appellant to electronically file and receive documents in this appeal only. See attached order for further details. Served on 11/05/2019. [19-1398] [Entered: 11/05/2019 02:18 PM]

Open Document

[10692514] Appellant's motion filed by Candace Aguilera for permission to file electronically. Served on 11/04/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1398] [Entered: 11/05/2019 11:55 AM]

Open Document

[10692510] Notice received from Candace Aguilera that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. [19-1398] [Entered: 11/05/2019 11:53 AM]

Open Document

[10691701] Entry of appearance filed by Mrs. Anne Turner for City of Colorado Springs, Danielle McClarin, Angie Neives, Roger Vargason and Brett Lacey. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 11/01/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1398] [Entered: 11/01/2019 02:09 PM]

Open Document

[10691498] Entry of appearance filed by Peter A. Lichtman for Mr. Robert Mitchel. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 11/01/2019. Manner of Service: US mail, email. [19-1398] [Entered: 11/01/2019 09:20 AM]

Open Document

[10690567] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Volume 1-Pleadings. [19-1398] [Entered: 10/29/2019 08:49 AM]

Open Document

[10690112] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief due on 12/09/2019 for Candace Aguilera. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 11/18/2019. [19-1398] [Entered: 10/28/2019 07:13 AM]

Open Document #2

General Docketing Letter - Pro Se

Open Document #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10700251] Appellant brief filed by Mrs. Candace Aguilera. Original and 4 copies. Served on 12/04/2019 by US Mail. Required 10th Cir. R. 28.2 Attachments Included? n. Appellees brief due 01/03/2020 for City of Colorado Springs, Danielle McClarin, Angie Neives, Roger Vargason, Brett Lacey and Robert Mitchell [19-1398] [Entered: 12/05/2019 12:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10700246] Entry of appearance filed by Mrs. Candace Aguilera. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/04/2019. Manner of Service: hand delivery [19-1398] [Entered: 12/05/2019 12:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10692587] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Appellant's motion for permission to file electronically upon completion of the requirements set forth in the attached order. This order permits appellant to electronically file and receive documents in this appeal only. See attached order for further details. Served on 11/05/2019. [19-1398] [Entered: 11/05/2019 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10692514] Appellant's motion filed by Candace Aguilera for permission to file electronically. Served on 11/04/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1398] [Entered: 11/05/2019 11:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10692510] Notice received from Candace Aguilera that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. [19-1398] [Entered: 11/05/2019 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10691701] Entry of appearance filed by Mrs. Anne Turner for City of Colorado Springs, Danielle McClarin, Angie Neives, Roger Vargason and Brett Lacey. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 11/01/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1398] [Entered: 11/01/2019 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • [10691687] Entry of appearance submitted by Anne H. Turner for Appellees City of Colorado Springs, Brett Lacey, Danielle McClarin, Angie Neives and Roger Vargason for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 11/01/2019. Manner of Service: US mail.--[Edited 11/01/2019 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 11/1/2019] [19-1398] AT [Entered: 11/01/2019 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10691498] Entry of appearance filed by Peter A. Lichtman for Mr. Robert Mitchel. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 11/01/2019. Manner of Service: US mail, email. [19-1398] [Entered: 11/01/2019 09:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • [10691495] Entry of appearance submitted by Peter A. Lichtman for Appellee Mr. Robert Mitchell for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 11/01/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-1398] --[Edited 11/01/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 11/1/2019.] PAL [Entered: 11/01/2019 09:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • This entry has been removed from the docketof as counsel will refile an entry of appearance with a certificate of service indicating the appellant was served with the entry of appearance . [AT] [10691367] Entry of appearance submitted by Peter A. Lichtman for Appellee Mr. Robert Mitchell for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/31/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-1398] PAL [Entered: 10/31/2019 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10690567] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Volume 1-Pleadings. [19-1398] [Entered: 10/29/2019 08:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10690112] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief due on 12/09/2019 for Candace Aguilera. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 11/18/2019. [19-1398] [Entered: 10/28/2019 07:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • [10690111] Fee paid. Date paid in District Court on 10/21/2019. [19-1398] [Entered: 10/28/2019 07:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10688554] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 10/21/2019. Fee or ifp forms due 11/20/2019 for Candace Aguilera. Notice of appearance due on 11/20/2019 for Candace Aguilera, and Notice of appearance due on 11/04/2019 for City of Colorado Springs, Brett Lacey, Danielle McClarin, Robert Mitchell, Angie Neives and Roger Vargason. [19-1398] [Entered: 10/21/2019 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less