This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2019 at 06:09:40 (UTC).

AEGIS Electric & Gas v. ECI Management LLC

Case Summary

On 03/26/2019 AEGIS Electric Gas filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ECI Management LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11114

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

ECI MANAGEMENT LLC

Plaintiff / Appellee

AEGIS ELECTRIC & GAS INTERNATIONAL SERVICES LIMITED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

David Baird Carpenter

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP

1201 W Peachtree St Nw Ste 4900

Atlanta, GA 30309

Kristin Ramsay

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP

1201 W Peachtree St Nw Ste 4900

Atlanta, GA 30309

Daniel F. Diffley

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP

1201 W Peachtree St Nw Ste 4900

Atlanta, GA 30309

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Paul Lindsey Fields Jr.

Attorney at Fields Howell, LLP

1180 W Peachtree St Ste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30309

Crighton Thomas Allen

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith, PC

191 Peachtree St Ne Ste 2900

Atlanta, GA 30303

Jocelyn DeMars

Attorney at Fields Howell, LLP

1180 W Peachtree St Ste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30309

Jocelyn C. DeMars

Attorney at Fields Howell, LLP

1180 W Peachtree St Ste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Crighton Thomas Allen for AEGIS Electric & Gas International Services Limited. [19-11114] (ECF: Crighton Allen) [Entered: 04/05/2019 12:50 PM]

Open Document

Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney David Baird Carpenter for Appellant ECI Management LLC. Appellants brief due on 05/20/2019 as to Appellant ECI Management LLC. Appendix due on 05/28/2019 as to Appellant ECI Management LLC. [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:09 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David Baird Carpenter for ECI Management LLC. [19-11114] (ECF: David Carpenter) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:38 PM]

Open Document

Appellate fee was paid on 03/26/2019 as to Appellant ECI Management LLC. [Entered: 03/27/2019 02:41 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Paul Lindsey Fields, Jr. for Appellee AEGIS Electric & Gas International Services Limited. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11114] (ECF: Paul Fields) [Entered: 04/08/2019 02:54 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney David Baird Carpenter for Appellant ECI Management LLC. No hearings. [19-11114] (ECF: David Carpenter) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:51 PM]

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Paul Lindsey Fields, Jr. for AEGIS Electric & Gas International Services Limited. [19-11114] (ECF: Paul Fields) [Entered: 04/03/2019 03:12 PM]

Open Document

Appellant's brief filed by ECI Management LLC. [19-11114] (ECF: Kristin Ramsay) [Entered: 05/20/2019 03:35 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Daniel F. Diffley for ECI Management LLC. [19-11114] (ECF: David Carpenter) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:40 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney David Baird Carpenter for Appellant ECI Management LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11114] (ECF: David Carpenter) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:47 PM]

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jocelyn C. DeMars for AEGIS Electric & Gas International Services Limited. [19-11114] (ECF: Jocelyn DeMars) [Entered: 04/29/2019 11:39 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kristin Ramsay for ECI Management LLC. [19-11114] (ECF: Kristin Ramsay) [Entered: 05/13/2019 01:59 PM]

Open Document #3

USDC Judgment- Doc #67

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney David Baird Carpenter for Appellant ECI Management LLC. [19-11114] (ECF: David Carpenter) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:55 PM]

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant ECI Management LLC. [Entered: 05/23/2019 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's brief filed by ECI Management LLC. [19-11114] (ECF: Kristin Ramsay) [Entered: 05/20/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kristin Ramsay for ECI Management LLC. [19-11114] (ECF: Kristin Ramsay) [Entered: 05/13/2019 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jocelyn C. DeMars for AEGIS Electric & Gas International Services Limited. [19-11114] (ECF: Jocelyn DeMars) [Entered: 04/29/2019 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Paul Lindsey Fields, Jr. for AEGIS Electric & Gas International Services Limited. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 04/09/2019 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney David Baird Carpenter for Appellant ECI Management LLC. Appellants brief due on 05/20/2019 as to Appellant ECI Management LLC. Appendix due on 05/28/2019 as to Appellant ECI Management LLC. [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney David Baird Carpenter for Appellant ECI Management LLC. [19-11114] (ECF: David Carpenter) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney David Baird Carpenter for Appellant ECI Management LLC. No hearings. [19-11114] (ECF: David Carpenter) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney David Baird Carpenter for Appellant ECI Management LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11114] (ECF: David Carpenter) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Daniel F. Diffley for ECI Management LLC. [19-11114] (ECF: David Carpenter) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David Baird Carpenter for ECI Management LLC. [19-11114] (ECF: David Carpenter) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Paul Lindsey Fields, Jr. for Appellee AEGIS Electric & Gas International Services Limited. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11114] (ECF: Paul Fields) [Entered: 04/08/2019 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Crighton Thomas Allen for AEGIS Electric & Gas International Services Limited. [19-11114] (ECF: Crighton Allen) [Entered: 04/05/2019 12:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Paul Lindsey Fields, Jr. for AEGIS Electric & Gas International Services Limited. [19-11114] (ECF: Paul Fields) [Entered: 04/03/2019 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellate fee was paid on 03/26/2019 as to Appellant ECI Management LLC. [Entered: 03/27/2019 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant ECI Management LLC on 03/26/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/06/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/09/2019 as to Appellant ECI Management LLC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/23/2019 as to Appellee AEGIS Electric & Gas International Services Limited [Entered: 03/27/2019 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.