This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/16/2019 at 06:07:19 (UTC).

Advanced Media Networks, LLC v. AT&T Mobility LLC

Case Summary

On 04/17/2019 Advanced Media Networks, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against AT T Mobility LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1775

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ADVANCED MEDIA NETWORKS, LLC

Defendant / Appellee

AT&T MOBILITY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Brian Andrew Carpenter

Attorney at Buether Joe & Carpenter LLC

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 4750

Dallas, TX 75201

Michael Clayton Pomeroy

Attorney at Buether Joe & Carpenter LLC

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 4750

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Steven Moore

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP

Two Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

Russell Korn

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP

1100 Peachtree Street, Ne, Suite 2800

Atlanta, GA 30309

Taylor Higgins Ludlam

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP

4208 Six Forks Road

Raleigh, NC 27609

 

Court Documents

#14

13 #2

Exhibit 1

13 #1

Notice Regarding Bankruptcy

#12

#11

#10

9 #2

supporting document

9 #1

Certificate of Interest

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil case docketed

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER filed. This appeal is stayed. Advanced Media Networks is directed to file a status report every 60 days and to inform the court within 21 days after the bankruptcy proceedings are completed or the automatic stay pursuant to section 362 has been lifted. Service: 05/13/2019 by clerk. [606815] [LS] [Entered: 05/13/2019 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Notice regarding bankruptcy from Appellant Advanced Media Networks, LLC. Service: 05/10/2019 by email. [606680] [19-1775] [Brian Carpenter] [Entered: 05/10/2019 05:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Entry of appearance for Taylor Higgins Ludlam as of counsel for Appellee AT&T Mobility LLC. Service: 05/01/2019 by email. [604453] [19-1775] [Taylor Ludlam] [Entered: 05/01/2019 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Entry of appearance for Russell A. Korn as of counsel for Appellee AT&T Mobility LLC. Service: 05/01/2019 by email. [604450] [19-1775] [Russell Korn] [Entered: 05/01/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Docketing Statement for the Appellee AT&T Mobility LLC. Service: 05/01/2019 by email. [604442] [19-1775] [Steven Moore] [Entered: 05/01/2019 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee AT&T Mobility LLC. Service: 05/01/2019 by email. [604440] [19-1775] [Steven Moore] [Entered: 05/01/2019 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Entry of appearance for Steven D. Moore as principal counsel for Appellee AT&T Mobility LLC. Service: 05/01/2019 by email. [604438] [19-1775] [Steven Moore] [Entered: 05/01/2019 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellant Advanced Media Networks, LLC. Service: 05/01/2019 by email. [604340] [19-1775] [Brian Carpenter] [Entered: 05/01/2019 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Advanced Media Networks, LLC, Docketing Statement [ # 5 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 05/06/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[603573] [MMA] [Entered: 04/29/2019 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Advanced Media Networks, LLC. Service: 04/25/2019 by email. [603032] [19-1775] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 6 ] [Brian Carpenter] [Entered: 04/25/2019 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Advanced Media Networks, LLC. Service: 04/25/2019 by email. [603031] [19-1775] [Brian Carpenter] [Entered: 04/25/2019 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Entry of appearance for Michael C. Pomeroy as of counsel for Appellant Advanced Media Networks, LLC. Service: 04/25/2019 by email. [603029] [19-1775] [Michael Pomeroy] [Entered: 04/25/2019 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Brian A. Carpenter as principal counsel for Appellant Advanced Media Networks, LLC. Service: 04/25/2019 by email. [603016] [19-1775] [Brian Carpenter] [Entered: 04/25/2019 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 04/16/2019. [600892] Entry of Appearance due 05/01/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/01/2019. Docketing Statement due 05/01/2019. Appellant's brief is due 06/17/2019. [MMA] [Entered: 04/17/2019 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Advanced Media Networks, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AT&T Mobility LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Moore

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell A. Korn