This case was last updated from PACER on 05/18/2019 at 06:11:38 (UTC).

Adria MM Productions, Ltd. v. Worldwide Entertainment Group

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 Adria MM Productions, Ltd filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Worldwide Entertainment Group. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11052

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

WORLDWIDE ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC., a Florida corporation

Plaintiff / Appellee

ADRIA MM PRODUCTIONS, LTD., a Croatian company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Peter Francis Valori

Attorney at Damian & Valori, LLP

1000 Brickell Ave Ste 1020

Miami, FL 33131

Russell M. Landy

Attorney at Damian & Valori, LLP

1000 Brickell Ave Ste 1020

Miami, FL 33131

Amanda L. Fernandez

Attorney at Damian & Valori, LLP

1000 Brickell Ave Ste 1020

Miami, FL 33131

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Javier Asis Lopez

Attorney at Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton, PA

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd Fl 9

Coral Gables, FL 33134-6037

Gail A. McQuilkin

Attorney at Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton, PA

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd Fl 9

Coral Gables, FL 33134-6037

Phillip Seltzer

Attorney at Rubinstein Law

660 4Th St #302

San Francisco, CA 94107

Yano L. Rubinstein

Attorney at Rubinstein Law

660 4Th St #302

San Francisco, CA 94107

Carolyn Shields

Attorney at Liu & Shields, LLP

41-60 Main St Ste 208A

Flushing, NY 11355

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Court Reporter Acknowledgment filed. Transcript Order: Carl Schanzleh, 05/01/2019, Worldwide Entertainment Group, Inc., Other Hearings 10/10/2017 , Other Hearings 08/10/2018. [Entered: 05/06/2019 10:49 AM]

Open Document #1

Financial Arrangements Not Made

Open Document #2

DIS-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

Court Reporter Acknowledgment filed. Transcript Order: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 04/03/2019, Worldwide Entertainment Group, Inc., Pre-Trial Proceedings 09/24/2018 , Trial 09/17/2018 - 09/21/2018. [Entered: 05/01/2019 11:43 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Carolyn Shields for Appellee Adria MM Productions, Ltd.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11052] (ECF: Carolyn Shields) [Entered: 04/15/2019 07:10 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Carolyn Shields for Adria MM Productions, Ltd [19-11052] (ECF: Carolyn Shields) [Entered: 04/09/2019 03:07 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Peter Francis Valori for Appellant Worldwide Entertainment Group, Inc.. [19-11052] (ECF: Peter Valori) [Entered: 04/08/2019 05:27 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Peter Francis Valori for Appellant Worldwide Entertainment Group, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11052] (ECF: Peter Valori) [Entered: 04/08/2019 05:25 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Peter Francis Valori for Appellant Worldwide Entertainment Group, Inc.. Transcript(s) ordered. [19-11052] (ECF: Peter Valori) [Entered: 04/02/2019 04:57 PM]

Open Document

Appellate fee was paid on 03/19/2019 as to Appellant Worldwide Entertainment Group, Inc.. [Entered: 03/26/2019 11:26 AM]

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #4

Omnibus Order doc#159

Open Document #5

Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law doc#231

Open Document #9

Judgment by Worldwide Entertainment doc#189

Open Document #3

Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief doc#230

Open Document #6

Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment doc#156

Open Document #7

DC Order Denying Worldwide Entertainment Group doc#196

Open Document #2

Judgment doc#190

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Court Reporter Acknowledgment filed. Transcript Order: Carl Schanzleh, 05/01/2019, Worldwide Entertainment Group, Inc., Other Hearings 10/10/2017 , Other Hearings 08/10/2018. [Entered: 05/06/2019 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Worldwide Entertainment Group, Inc. has NOT made satisfactory financial arrangements for transcripts as to court reporter Carl Schanzleh. Financial Arrangements due to be made with the Court Reporter within 14 days from the date of this deficiency letter. [Entered: 05/02/2019 12:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Worldwide Entertainment Group, Inc., Court Reporter: Carl Schanzleh, Proceeding Type and Date: Other Hearings 10/10/2017 , Other Hearings 08/10/2018. [Entered: 05/01/2019 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Court Reporter Acknowledgment filed. Transcript Order: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 04/03/2019, Worldwide Entertainment Group, Inc., Pre-Trial Proceedings 09/24/2018 , Trial 09/17/2018 - 09/21/2018. [Entered: 05/01/2019 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Carolyn Shields for Appellee Adria MM Productions, Ltd.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11052] (ECF: Carolyn Shields) [Entered: 04/15/2019 07:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Carolyn Shields for Adria MM Productions, Ltd [19-11052] (ECF: Carolyn Shields) [Entered: 04/09/2019 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Peter Francis Valori for Appellant Worldwide Entertainment Group, Inc.. [19-11052] (ECF: Peter Valori) [Entered: 04/08/2019 05:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Peter Francis Valori for Appellant Worldwide Entertainment Group, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11052] (ECF: Peter Valori) [Entered: 04/08/2019 05:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Worldwide Entertainment Group, Inc., Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 10/10/2017 , Pre-Trial Proceedings 08/10/2018 , Pre-Trial Proceedings 09/24/2018 , Trial 09/17/2018 - 09/21/2018. [Entered: 04/03/2019 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Peter Francis Valori for Appellant Worldwide Entertainment Group, Inc.. Transcript(s) ordered. [19-11052] (ECF: Peter Valori) [Entered: 04/02/2019 04:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellate fee was paid on 03/19/2019 as to Appellant Worldwide Entertainment Group, Inc.. [Entered: 03/26/2019 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Worldwide Entertainment Group, Inc. on 03/19/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/02/2019 as to Appellant Worldwide Entertainment Group, Inc.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/16/2019 as to Appellee Adria MM Productions, Ltd. [Entered: 03/26/2019 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.