This case was last updated from PACER on 01/23/2021 at 05:10:34 (UTC).

Adeyanju v. Wilkinson

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 Adeyanju filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Wilkinson. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1045

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ADEKUNLE OLUWABUMWI ADEYANJU

Respondent

JEFFREY ROSEN, Acting Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

SangYeob Kim

Attorney at ACLU of New Hampshire

18 Low Ave

Concord, NH 03301-0000

White Assunta Emily

Attorney at Shaheen & Gordon PA

180 Bridge St

Manchester, NH 03104

Gilles R. Bissonnette

Attorney at ACLU of New Hampshire

18 Low Ave

Concord, NH 03301-0000

Ronald L. Abramson

Attorney at Shaheen & Gordon PA

180 Bridge St

Manchester, NH 03104

Respondent Attorneys

Rebecca Hoffberg Phillips

Attorney at US Dept of Justice

Po Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0878

Bernard Joseph

Attorney at US Dept of Justice

Po Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0878

OIL OIL

Attorney at US Dept of Justice

450 5Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Anthony Paul Nicastro

Attorney at US Dept of Justice

Po Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0878

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Restricted Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Restricted Document #1

Petition for Review

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Respondent Jeffrey Rosen filed by Attorney Rebecca Hoffberg Phillips. Certificate of service dated 01/15/2021. [21-1045] (RHP) [Entered: 01/15/2021 07:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Petitioner Adekunle Oluwabumwi Adeyanju filed by Attorney Gilles Bissonnette. Certificate of service dated 01/14/2021. [21-1045] (GRB) [Entered: 01/14/2021 05:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Petitioner Adekunle Oluwabumwi Adeyanju filed by Attorney SangYeob Kim. Certificate of service dated 01/14/2021. [21-1045] (SK) [Entered: 01/14/2021 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE regarding application of Local Rule 18.0. [21-1045] (GB) [Entered: 01/14/2021 04:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketFiling fee was paid by Petitioner Adekunle Oluwabumwi Adeyanju. Receipt number: A01-36872-968. [21-1045] (GB) [Entered: 01/14/2021 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGENCY CASE docketed. Petition for review filed by Petitioner Adekunle Oluwabumwi Adeyanju. Appearance form due 01/28/2021 . Administrative record due 02/23/2021 . Copy of petition served on respondent(s) pursuant to FRAP 15(c). [21-1045] (GB) [Entered: 01/14/2021 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bernard Joseph

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca Hoffberg Phillips

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OIL OIL