This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/11/2021 at 06:01:45 (UTC).

Adel Ghanem v. Warden Essex County Correction

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 Adel Ghanem filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Warden Essex County Correction. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1908

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

WARDEN ESSEX COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY

Plaintiff / Appellant

ADEL SULTAN MOHAMMED GHANEM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Erik R. Quick Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Enes Hajdarpasic Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

970 Broad Street, Room 700

Newark, NJ 07102

Sarah S. Wilson Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Eric M. Mark Esq.

201 Washington Street

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case Docketed

1 #2

District Court Opinion

1 #3

District Court Order

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

8 #1

Standing Order Excess Pagination

8 #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

#9

#10

#11

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant Adel Sultan Mohammed Ghanem. Certificate of service dated 07/06/2021 by ECF. [21-1908] (EMM) [Entered: 07/06/2021 02:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellant Adel Sultan Mohammed Ghanem. Certificate of Service dated 07/06/2021 by ECF. [21-1908] (EMM) [Entered: 07/06/2021 01:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sarah Wilson on behalf of Appellee(s) Warden Essex County Correction. [21-1908] (SSW) [Entered: 06/08/2021 03:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Adel Sultan Mohammed Ghanem due on or before 07/06/2021. Appendix due on or before 07/06/2021. (AMR) [Entered: 05/24/2021 02:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Adel Sultan Mohammed Ghanem. [21-1908] (EMM) [Entered: 05/22/2021 12:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Adel Sultan Mohammed Ghanem advising this court that no transcripts are available. [21-1908] (EMM) [Entered: 05/22/2021 12:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Adel Sultan Mohammed Ghanem. [21-1908] (EMM) [Entered: 05/22/2021 12:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Adel Sultan Mohammed Ghanem. [21-1908] (EMM) [Entered: 05/22/2021 12:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Eric M. Mark on behalf of Appellant(s) Adel Sultan Mohammed Ghanem. [21-1908] (EMM) [Entered: 05/22/2021 12:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 05/12/2021 05:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Adel Sultan Mohammed Ghanem in District Court No. 2-19-cv-13512. (JK) [Entered: 05/12/2021 05:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WARDEN ESSEX COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ERIC M. MARK