This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:00:37 (UTC).

Addison Thompson, Jr. v. United States

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Addison Thompson, Jr filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against United States. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2470

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

Addison Thompson, Jr.

Pine Knot, KY 42635-0000

Respondent / Appellee

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Addison Thompson Jr.

Attorney at U.S. PENITENTIARY

P.O. Box 3000

Pine Knot, KY 42635-0000

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Thomas More Hollenhorst

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

600 U.S. Courthouse, 300 S. Fourth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55415-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Thomas More Hollenhorst for Appellee United States of America w/service 07/22/2019 [4810352] [19-2470] (TMH) [Entered: 07/22/2019 12:20 PM]

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4808061] [19-2470] (CYZ) [Entered: 07/15/2019 12:21 PM]

Open Document #1

Letter

Open Document #1

COA Docketing Letter

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order of 6/20/19, judgment of 6/21/19 [4808059] [19-2470] (CYZ) [Entered: 07/15/2019 12:20 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • RECORD FILED - SEALED PSI REPORT, 1 volumes, Location STL, Comments: 1 volume, 3 copies of Sealed PSI Report, addendums, and Statement of Reasons, Source Location: USDC / MN [4813053] [19-2470] (STL) [Entered: 07/29/2019 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Thomas More Hollenhorst for Appellee United States of America w/service 07/22/2019 [4810352] [19-2470] (TMH) [Entered: 07/22/2019 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER from Appellant Mr. Addison Thompson, Jr. dated July 3, 2019 requesting a certificate of appealability. [4809070] [19-2470] (CYZ) [Entered: 07/17/2019 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Tendered Letter regarding COA received from Appellant Mr. Addison Thompson, Jr. w/service 07/16/2019. [4808702] [19-2470] (TMF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4808061] [19-2470] (CYZ) [Entered: 07/15/2019 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order of 6/20/19, judgment of 6/21/19 [4808059] [19-2470] (CYZ) [Entered: 07/15/2019 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Prisoner case docketed. [4808053] [19-2470] (CYZ) [Entered: 07/15/2019 12:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less