This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/19/2020 at 06:08:43 (UTC).

Adams & Boyle, P.C., et al v. Herbert Slatery, III, et al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2020 Adams Boyle, P C filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Herbert Slatery, III. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-5408

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

ADAMS & BOYLE, P.C., on behalf of itself and its patients

DR. KIMBERLY LOONEY

PLANNED PARENTHOOD GREATER MEMPHIS REGION

PLANNED PARENTHOOD OF TENNESSEE AND NORTH MISSISSIPPI, fka Planned Parenthood of Middle and East Tennessee

MEMPHIS CENTER FOR REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH, on behalf of itself and its patients

KNOXVILLE CENTER FOR REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH

Defendant / Appellants

AMY P. WEIRICH, District Attorney General of Shelby County

WILLIAM BYRON LEE, Governor

GLENN R. FUNK, District Attorney General of Nashville

HERBERT H. SLATERY, III, Attorney General of Tennessee

W. REEVES JOHNSON, JR., M.D.

BARRY P. STAUBUS, District Attorney General of Sullivan County

RENE SAUNDERS, M.D.

LISA PIERCEY

CHARME P. ALLEN

Amicus Curiae

AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS

AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE

ETHICS AND RELIGIOUS LIBERTY COMMISSION OF THE SOUTHERN BAPTIST CONVENTION

AMERICAN PUBLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION

STATES OF NEW YORK, CALIFORNIA, COLORADO, CONNECTICUT, DELAWARE, HAWAII, ILLINOIS, MAINE, MASSACHUSETTS, MINNESOTA, NEVADA, NEW MEXICO, OREGON, PENNSYLVANIA, RHODE ISLAND, VERMONT, VIRGINIA, AND WASHINGTON AND THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Autumn Chandra Katz

Attorney at Center for Reproductive Rights

199 Water Street, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10038

David W. Garrison

Attorney at Barrett, Johnston, Martin & Garrison

414 Union Street, Suite 900

Nashville, TN 37219

Genevieve Elizabeth Scott

Attorney at Center for Reproductive Rights

199 Water Street, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10038

Michelle Katz Moriarty

Attorney at Center for Reproductive Rights

199 Water Street, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10038

Scott P. Tift

Attorney at Barrett, Johnston, Martin & Garrison

414 Union Street, Suite 900

Nashville, TN 37219

Michael J. Dell

Attorney at Kramer, Levin, Naftalis & Frankel

1177 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Thomas Hauser Castelli

Attorney at ACLU Foundation of Tennessee

P.O. Box 120160

Nashville, TN 37212

Maithreyi Ratakonda

Attorney at Planned Parenthood Federation of America

123 William Street, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10038

Melissa Cohen

Attorney at Planned Parenthood Federation of America

123 William Street, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10038

Richard Muniz

Attorney at Planned Parenthood Federation of America

1110 Vermont Avenue, Suite 300

Washington, DC 20005

Julia Kaye

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union

125 Broad Street, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Sarah Campbell

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

320 Sixth Avenue, N., First Floor

Nashville, TN 37243

Alexander Stuart Rieger

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 20207

Nashville, TN 37202-0207

Steven Ashley Hart

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 20207

Nashville, TN 37202-0207

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Matthew D. Besser

Attorney at Law Office

5885 Landerbrook Drive, Suite 302

Cleveland, OH 44124

Edward Lawrence White

Attorney at American Center for Law and Justice

3001 Plymouth Road, Suite 203

Ann Arbor, MI 48105

Kevin H. Theriot

Attorney at Alliance Defending Freedom

15100 N. 90Th Street

Scottsdale, AZ 85260

Lisa T. Simpson

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe

51 W. 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

Laura Etlinger

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

The Capital

Albany, NY 12224

Other Attorneys

Stephen Chad Meredith

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

700 Capitol Avenue, Suite 118

Frankfort, KY 40601

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#60

59 #2

Cover Letter

59 #1

judge order filed

#58

57 #2

Cover Letter

57 #1

judge order filed

#56

#52

#44

9 #2

judge order filed

9 #1

Cover Letter

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#1

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) MANDATE ISSUED with no costs taxed. (MRE) [Entered: 05/22/2020 07:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) ORDER filed denying petition for en banc rehearing [ # 44 ] filed by Ms. Sarah Campbell. Karen Nelson Moore, Helene N. White, and Amul R. Thapar, Circuit Judges. (BLH) [Entered: 05/14/2020 07:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) REPLY filed by Ms. Sarah Campbell for Amy P. Weirich, Doctor Lisa Piercey, Barry P. Staubus, Glenn R. Funk, Herbert H. Slatery, III, William Byron Lee, Charme P. Allen, W. Reeves Johnson, Jr. and Rene Saunders to the appellees' response to the petition for rehearing en banc. Certificate of Service: 04/29/2020. (BLH) [Entered: 04/29/2020 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) ORDER filed: Upon consideration of the appellants motion for leave to file a reply to the appellees response to the petition for rehearing en banc, It is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED [ # 52 ]. Karen Nelson Moore, Helene N. White, and Amul R. Thapar, Circuit Judges. (BLH) [Entered: 04/29/2020 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) AMICUS BRIEF filed by Mr. Edward Lawrence White for American Center for Law and Justice in support of the petition for rehearing en banc. Certificate of Service:04/28/2020. (BLH) [Entered: 04/29/2020 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) ORDER filed: Upon consideration of the motion of American Center for Law and Justice for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae in support of the petition for rehearing en banc, It is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED [ # 49 ]. Karen Nelson Moore, Helene N. White, and Amul R. Thapar, Circuit Judges. (BLH) [Entered: 04/29/2020 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) TENDERED reply to appellees' response to the petition for rehearing en banc. Received from Attorney Ms. Sarah Campbell for Appellants Amy P. Weirich, Doctor Lisa Piercey, Barry P. Staubus, Glenn R. Funk, Herbert H. Slatery, III, William Byron Lee, Charme P. Allen, W. Reeves Johnson, Jr. and Rene Saunders. (BLH) [Entered: 04/29/2020 08:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) REPLY BRIEF filed by Attorney Ms. Sarah Campbell for Appellants Charme P. Allen, Glenn R. Funk, W. Reeves Johnson, Jr., William Byron Lee, Doctor Lisa Piercey, Rene Saunders, Herbert H. Slatery, III, Barry P. Staubus and Amy P. Weirich Certificate of Service:04/29/2020. [20-5408] (LOCKED, not accepted for filing. Motion for leave to file pendiing).--[Edited 04/29/2020 by BLH] (SC) [Entered: 04/29/2020 06:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) MOTION filed by Ms. Sarah Campbell for Charme P. Allen, Glenn R. Funk, W. Reeves Johnson, Jr., William Byron Lee, Doctor Lisa Piercey, Rene Saunders, Herbert H. Slatery, III, Barry P. Staubus and Amy P. Weirich to file supplemental brief. Certificate of Service: 04/29/2020. [20-5408] (SC) [Entered: 04/29/2020 06:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a petition, [ # 44 ]; previously filed by Ms. Sarah Campbell for Herbert H. Slatery, III, Glenn R. Funk, Amy P. Weirich, Barry P. Staubus, Charme P. Allen, Doctor Lisa Piercey, W. Reeves Johnson, Jr., William Byron Lee and Rene Saunders. Response from Attorney Ms. Genevieve Elizabeth Scott for Appellees Adams & Boyle, P.C. and Memphis Center for Reproductive Health Certificate of Service:04/28/2020. [20-5408] (GES) [Entered: 04/28/2020 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for American Center for Law and Justice, amicus curiae in support of Appellants by Edward L. White III. Certificate of Service: 04/21/2020. [20-5408] (ELW) [Entered: 04/21/2020 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER filed: The motion for a temporary administrative stay is DENIED. We will consider the merits of a stay when briefing on the stay motion is completed.. Karen Nelson Moore, Helene N. White, and Amul R. Thapar (DISSENTING), Circuit Judges. (AEG) [Entered: 04/20/2020 05:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Adams & Boyle, P.C. and Memphis Center for Reproductive Health by Genevieve Scott. Certificate of Service: 04/20/2020. [20-5408] (GES) [Entered: 04/20/2020 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Charme P. Allen, Glenn R. Funk, W. Reeves Johnson, Jr., William Byron Lee, Doctor Lisa Piercey, Herbert H. Slatery, III, Rene Saunders, Barry P. Staubus and Amy P. Weirich by Alexander S. Rieger. Certificate of Service: 04/20/2020. [20-5408] (ASR) [Entered: 04/20/2020 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Charme P. Allen, Glenn R. Funk, W. Reeves Johnson, Jr., William Byron Lee, Doctor Lisa Piercey, Rene Saunders, Herbert H. Slatery, III, Amy P. Weirich and Barry P. Staubus by Steven A. Hart. Certificate of Service: 04/20/2020. [20-5408] (SAH) [Entered: 04/20/2020 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) EMERGENCY MOTION filed by Ms. Sarah Campbell for Charme P. Allen, Glenn R. Funk, W. Reeves Johnson, Jr., William Byron Lee, Doctor Lisa Piercey, Rene Saunders, Herbert H. Slatery, III, Barry P. Staubus and Amy P. Weirich to expedite decision. Certificate of Service: 04/20/2020. [20-5408] --[Edited 04/20/2020 by JEC] (SC) [Entered: 04/20/2020 10:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) EMERGENCY MOTION filed by Ms. Sarah Campbell for Charme P. Allen, Glenn R. Funk, W. Reeves Johnson, Jr., William Byron Lee, Doctor Lisa Piercey, Rene Saunders, Herbert H. Slatery, III, Barry P. Staubus and Amy P. Weirich to stay injunction pending appeal. Certificate of Service: 04/20/2020. [20-5408] --[Edited 04/20/2020 by JEC] (SC) [Entered: 04/20/2020 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Charme P. Allen, Glenn R. Funk, W. Reeves Johnson, Jr., William Byron Lee, Doctor Lisa Piercey, Rene Saunders, Herbert H. Slatery, III, Barry P. Staubus and Amy P. Weirich by Sarah K. Campbell. Certificate of Service: 04/20/2020. [20-5408] --[Edited 04/20/2020 by JEC] (SC) [Entered: 04/20/2020 09:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Jill Colyer (JEC) [Entered: 04/20/2020 09:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Charme P. Allen, Glenn R. Funk, W. Reeves Johnson, Jr., Doctor Lisa Piercey, Herbert H. Slatery, III, Barry P. Staubus and Amy P. Weirich. Transcript needed: y. (JEC) [Entered: 04/20/2020 09:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEMPHIS CENTER FOR REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH, on behalf of itself and its patients is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE is a litigant

Latest cases where American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists is a litigant