This case was last updated from PACER on 11/13/2020 at 06:11:57 (UTC).

Adam Lee v. Dane Field

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 Adam Lee filed an Other lawsuit against Dane Field. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1225

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

ADAM LEE

Honolulu, CA 96816

Debtor

In re: ADAM LEE

Appellee

DANE S. FIELD, Trustee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Adam Lee

4348 Waialae Ave.

Honolulu, CA 96816

Appellee Attorney

Enver W. Painter Esquire Jr.

Attorney at Law Office of Enver W. Painter, JR

1188 Bishop Street

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

5 #3

exhibit list

5 #2

order

5 #1

brief

#4

(#4) Received from Bankruptcy Court copy of COR filed in Bk. Ct. 10/19/2020. (PI) [Entered: 10/26/2020 09:54 AM]

#2

Bankruptcy Court Notice Form

2 #1

Opening Letter

#3

(#3) Sent BRIEFING ORDER & NOTICE to appellant Adam Lee . Copies to all parties. Appellant Adam Lee's opening brief due 11/02/2020 [20-1224, 20-1225] (VJ) [Entered: 09/17/2020 11:05 AM]

#1

(#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 09/08/2020, notice of referral, transmittal form. (VJ) [Entered: 09/14/2020 09:34 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Received Adam Lee briefs with order and list of exhibits. no pos. (PI) [Entered: 11/12/2020 12:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Received from Bankruptcy Court copy of COR filed in Bk. Ct. 10/19/2020. (PI) [Entered: 10/26/2020 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Sent BRIEFING ORDER & NOTICE to appellant Adam Lee . Copies to all parties. Appellant Adam Lee's opening brief due 11/02/2020 [20-1224, 20-1225] (VJ) [Entered: 09/17/2020 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice to all parties and Bankruptcy Court RE: BAP Case number assigned:HI- 20-1225. Sent Bankruptcy Record Request Form to Bankruptcy Court. (VJ) [Entered: 09/17/2020 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 09/08/2020, notice of referral, transmittal form. (VJ) [Entered: 09/14/2020 09:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DANE S. FIELD, Chapter 7 Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Enver W. Painter Jr.