This case was last updated from PACER on 11/17/2019 at 06:05:27 (UTC).

Adam Lee v. Dane Field

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 Adam Lee filed an Other lawsuit against Dane Field. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1227

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellant

ADAM LEE

Honolulu, CA 96816

Debtor

In re: ADAM LEE

Appellee

DANE S. FIELD, Chapter 7 Trustee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Adam Lee

4348 Waialae Ave.

Honolulu, CA 96816

Appellee Attorney

Enver W. Painter Esquire Jr.

1188 Bishop Street

Honolulu, CA 96813

 

Court Documents

5 #3

Election to District Court

5 #2

Notice of Appeal

5 #1

District Court Notice Sent

4 #2

Election to District Court

4 #1

Notice of Appeal

3 #2

Appellee Election to District Court

3 #1

Notice of Appeal

#2

(#2) Notice to Bankruptcy Court RE: BAP Case number assigned: HI-19-1227. Sent Bankruptcy Record Request Form to Bankruptcy Court. (VJ) [Entered: 09/20/2019 09:42 AM]

#1

(#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 09/16/2019, notice of referral, transmittal form. (VJ) [Entered: 09/19/2019 01:39 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2019
  • (#6) CLOSED: Case closed: Election without judicial action; 09/20/2019 19-1227 Transferred by election. (VJ) [Entered: 09/20/2019 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice sent 09/20/2019 to District Court transferring appeal per objection. (VJ) [Entered: 09/20/2019 01:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTRY UPDATED. : Docketing Error Notice sent 09/20/2019 to District Court transferring appeal per objection. --[Edited 09/20/2019 by VJ] (VJ) [Entered: 09/20/2019 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed Attorney Enver W. Painter, Jr., Esquire for Appellee Dane S. Field copy of an Objection to BAP jurisdiction; served on 09/17/2019. Objection is timely filed. (VJ) [Entered: 09/20/2019 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice to Bankruptcy Court RE: BAP Case number assigned: HI-19-1227. Sent Bankruptcy Record Request Form to Bankruptcy Court. (VJ) [Entered: 09/20/2019 09:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 09/16/2019, notice of referral, transmittal form. (VJ) [Entered: 09/19/2019 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DANE S. FIELD, Chapter 7 Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Enver W. Painter Jr.