This case was last updated from PACER on 05/13/2019 at 06:24:31 (UTC).

Adam Hill v. Stephen Williams, et al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 Adam Hill filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Stephen Williams. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1525

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

Dale Reed, Chief Deputy Director, ADC

Sarah Brewer, Nurse, Correctional Care Solutions (Originally named as Sara Brewer)

Susan Hutson, Director of Nursing, Correctional Care Solutions (Originally named as Hudson and Hutson)

Defendant / Appellees

Russell Hicks, Corporal, ADC (Originally named as Hicks)

Kimberly Riley, Lieutenant, Tucker Unit, ADC

Telly Gray, Captain, Tucker Unit, ADC (Originally named as Gray)

Carol Johnson

Correctional Care Solutions

Dexter Payne, Deputy Director, Arkansas Department of Correction

Jesse Jackson, III, Lieutenant, ADC (Originally named as Jackson)

James Gibson, Warden, Varner Unit, ADC (Originally named as Gibson)

Esther Mendez, Corporal, North Central Unit, ADC (Originally named as Mendez)

DeAngelo Earl, Warden, Grimes Unit, ADC (Originally named as Earl)

Peter Amplo, Sergeant, Grimes Unit, ADC (Originally named as Amplo)

Marjorie Hall, Health Administrator, Correctional Care Solutions (Originally named as Margie Hall)

Stephen Williams, Warden

Wendy Kelley, Director, Arkansas Department of Correction

Rodney Ford, Building Major, Tucker Unit, ADC (Originally named as Ford)

Billy Inman, Assistant Warden

Plaintiff / Appellant

Adam Hill

Texarkana, TX 75501-0000

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christine Ann Cryer

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

200 Catlett-Prien Building, 323 Center Street

Little Rock, AR 72201-0000

Patricia Van Ausdall Bell

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

200 Catlett-Prien Building, 323 Center Street

Little Rock, AR 72201-0000

Brent J. Eubanks

Attorney at HUMPHRIES & ODUM

1901 Broadway Street

Little Rock, AR 72206

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Adam Hill

Attorney at BOWIE COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY

105 W. Front Street

Texarkana, TX 75501-0000

Other Attorneys

Sarah Crawford

Attorney at Address Under Seal

Sealed

Sealed, AR

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Cover Letter

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Denying [ # 4772699-2 ] motion for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Mr. Adam Hill. The motion for appointment of counsel is denied without prejudice to renewal after entire case is disposed in the district court and a new notice of appeal is filed. [4772731] [19-1525] (CMD) [Entered: 04/01/2019 02:11 PM]

Open Document #1

Judgment: Judge Directed

Open Document

Prisoner case docketed. [4766807] [19-1525] (TMF) [Entered: 03/14/2019 02:09 PM]

Open Document #1

Motion to add evidence

Open Document #1

Check in the amount of $30.16

Open Document #2

Letter From Clerk's Office

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4766861] [19-1525] (TMF) [Entered: 03/14/2019 02:55 PM]

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Denying [ # 4778224-2 ] motion for District Court record copy filed by Appellant Mr. Adam Hill. [4778315] [19-1525]--[Edited 04/16/2019 by LMT] (LMT) [Entered: 04/16/2019 02:31 PM]

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document

MANDATE ISSUED. [4776101] [19-1525] (LMT) [Entered: 04/10/2019 10:29 AM]

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to add evidence, filed by Appellant Mr. Adam Hill w/service by USCA-8 on 04/23/2019. [4780251] [19-1525] No action taken - motion filed and denied - District Court - the appeal is closed.--[Edited 04/23/2019 by LMT] (LMT) [Entered: 04/23/2019 09:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK LETTER sent regarding Check received in the amount of $30.16. [4779270] [19-1525] (TMF) [Entered: 04/18/2019 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:Denying [ # 4778224-2 ] motion for District Court record copy filed by Appellant Mr. Adam Hill. [4778315] [19-1525]--[Edited 04/16/2019 by LMT] (LMT) [Entered: 04/16/2019 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION regarding copy of District Court record, filed by Appellant Mr. Adam Hill w/service by USCA-8 on 04/16/2019. [4778224] [19-1525] (LMT) [Entered: 04/16/2019 12:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MANDATE ISSUED. [4776101] [19-1525] (LMT) [Entered: 04/10/2019 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:Denying [ # 4772699-2 ] motion for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Mr. Adam Hill. The motion for appointment of counsel is denied without prejudice to renewal after entire case is disposed in the district court and a new notice of appeal is filed. [4772731] [19-1525] (CMD) [Entered: 04/01/2019 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for appointment of counsel, filed by Appellant Mr. Adam Hill w/service by USCA8 04/01/2019. [4772699] [19-1525] (CMD) [Entered: 04/01/2019 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED - Case dismissed for lack of jurisdiction, as no final appealable order has been entered. STEVEN M. COLLOTON, ROGER L. WOLLMAN and DUANE BENTON Adp Mar 2019 [4767378] [19-1525] (LMT) [Entered: 03/15/2019 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER: If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4766861] [19-1525] (TMF) [Entered: 03/14/2019 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal 2/11/19, docket entries, Order 12/19/18, Finding and Recommendation 1/22/19, Order 2/04/19, Order 3/12/19. [4766845] [19-1525] (TMF) [Entered: 03/14/2019 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Prisoner case docketed. [4766807] [19-1525] (TMF) [Entered: 03/14/2019 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.