This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:01:16 (UTC).

Acosta v. Paragon Contractors, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Acosta filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Paragon Contractors. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-4097

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

JAMES JESSOP

Intervenor Defendant

PAR 2 CONTRACTORS, LLC

Plaintiff / Appellee

R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA, Secretary of Labor, United States Department of Labor

Defendant / Appellants

PARAGON CONTRACTORS CORPORATION

BRIAN JESSOP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Heath H. Snow

Attorney at Bingham, Snow & Caldwell

253 West St. George Boulevard, Suite 100

St. George, UT 84770

Rick James Sutherland

Attorney at Jackson Lewis

215 S. State St., Ste. 760

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Kenneth A. Okazaki

Attorney at Jones Waldo Holbrook & McDonough

170 South Main Street, Suite 1500

Salt Lake City, UT 84101-1644

Deborah Rae Chandler

Attorney at Miller Toone

165 Regent Street

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

M. Christopher Moon

Attorney at Jackson Lewis

215 S. State St., Ste. 760

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

R. Blake Hamilton

Attorney at Durham Jones & Pinegar

111 South Main Street, Suite 2400, P O Box 4050

Salt Lake City, UT 84110-4050

Melissa J. England

Attorney at Barrett & Matura

8925 East Pima Center Parkway, Suite 100

Scottsdale, AZ 85258

Jeffrey C. Matura

Attorney at Barrett & Matura

8925 East Pima Center Parkway, Suite 100

Scottsdale, AZ 85258

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Karen E. Bobela

Attorney at United States Department of Labor

1244 Speer Boulevard, Suite 515

Denver, CO 80204

Alicia Truman

Attorney at United States Department of Labor

1244 Speer Boulevard, Suite 515

Denver, CO 80204

John K. Mangum Jr.

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

111 South Main Street, Suite 1800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Jeffrey E. Nelson

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

111 South Main Street, Suite 1800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Amanda A. Berndt

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

111 South Main Street, Suite 1800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Lydia A. Tzagoloff

Attorney at United States Department of Labor

1244 Speer Boulevard, Suite 515

Denver, CO 80204

Erin M. Mohan

Attorney at US Department of Labor Office of the Solicitor

200 Constitution Ave, Nw

Washington, DC 20210-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10667052] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by Brian Jessop and Paragon Contractors Corporation. Served on: 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4097] RJS [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:53 PM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Transmittal letter and preliminary record

Open Document

[10667048] Docketing statement filed by Paragon Contractors Corporation and Brian Jessop. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4097] RJS [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:52 PM]

Open Document

[10664222] Entry of appearance filed by Erin M. Mohan for R. Alexander Acosta. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 07/18/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4097] [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:35 PM]

Open Document

[10664266] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Mr. Jeffrey E. Nelson's motion to withdraw as appellee's counsel. Served on 07/18/2019. [19-4097] [Entered: 07/18/2019 03:28 PM]

Open Document

[10668027] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 08/02/2019. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 09/11/2019 for Brian Jessop and Paragon Contractors Corporation. [19-4097] [Entered: 08/02/2019 05:04 PM]

Open Document

[10664223] Motion filed by Appellee Mr. R. Alexander Acosta for attorney Jeffrey E. Nelson to withdraw as counsel. Served on: 07/18/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-4097] JEN [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:36 PM]

Open Document

[10676402] Motion filed by Appellants Brian Jessop and Paragon Contractors Corporation to extend time to file a reply brief until 10/11/2019. Served on: 09/05/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-4097] RJS [Entered: 09/05/2019 03:11 PM]

Open Document

[10667076] Entry of appearance filed by M. Christopher Moon and Rick James Sutherland for Paragon Contractors Corporation and Brian Jessop. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-4097] [Entered: 07/31/2019 06:48 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • [10676408] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Appellants' unopposed motion for a 30-day extension of time to file appellants' brief. Appellants' brief and appendix are now due on or before October 11, 2019. No further extensions of time will be granted on the clerk's authority. Served on 09/05/2019. Text only entry - no attachment. [19-4097] [Entered: 09/05/2019 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10676402] Motion filed by Appellants Brian Jessop and Paragon Contractors Corporation to extend time to file a reply brief until 10/11/2019. Served on: 09/05/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-4097] RJS [Entered: 09/05/2019 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10668027] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 08/02/2019. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 09/11/2019 for Brian Jessop and Paragon Contractors Corporation. [19-4097] [Entered: 08/02/2019 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • [10667099] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 08/07/2019 for D. Mark Jones, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-4097] [Entered: 07/31/2019 08:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10667076] Entry of appearance filed by M. Christopher Moon and Rick James Sutherland for Paragon Contractors Corporation and Brian Jessop. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-4097] [Entered: 07/31/2019 06:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10667052] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by Brian Jessop and Paragon Contractors Corporation. Served on: 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4097] RJS [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10667048] Docketing statement filed by Paragon Contractors Corporation and Brian Jessop. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4097] RJS [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • [10667046] Entry of appearance submitted by Rick J. Sutherland, M. Christopher Moon for Appellants Paragon Contractors Corporation and Brian Jessop for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4097] --[Edited 07/31/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 7/31/19] RJS [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10664266] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Mr. Jeffrey E. Nelson's motion to withdraw as appellee's counsel. Served on 07/18/2019. [19-4097] [Entered: 07/18/2019 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10664223] Motion filed by Appellee Mr. R. Alexander Acosta for attorney Jeffrey E. Nelson to withdraw as counsel. Served on: 07/18/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-4097] JEN [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10664222] Entry of appearance filed by Erin M. Mohan for R. Alexander Acosta. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 07/18/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4097] [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • [10664051] Entry of appearance submitted by Erin Mohan for Appellee Mr. R. Alexander Acosta for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/18/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4097] --[Edited 07/18/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] EMM [Entered: 07/18/2019 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663319] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/16/2019. Docketing statement due 07/30/2019 for Brian Jessop and Paragon Contractors Corporation. Transcript order form due 07/30/2019 for Brian Jessop and Paragon Contractors Corporation. Notice of appearance due on 07/30/2019 for R. Alexander Acosta, Brian Jessop and Paragon Contractors Corporation. [19-4097] [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.