This case was last updated from PACER on 04/14/2019 at 06:09:57 (UTC).

Acclaim Systems Inc v. Northrop Grumman Corp, et al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2019 Acclaim Systems Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Northrop Grumman Corp. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1355

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORP

TASC TECHNICAL SERVICES LLC

GEOMETRIC RESULTS INC

Plaintiff / Appellant

ACCLAIM SYSTEMS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Adam A. DeSipio Esq.

Attorney at DLA Piper

1650 Market Street, One Liberty Place, 49Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Nancy S. Rappaport Esq.

Attorney at DLA Piper

1650 Market Street, One Liberty Place, 49Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Matthew A. Glazer Esq.

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1650 Market Street, One Liberty Place, Suite 2800

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Pamela E. Dorian Esq.

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1650 Market Street, One Liberty Place, Suite 2800

Philadelphia, PA 19103

David J. Truelove Esq.

Attorney at Hill Wallack

777 Township Line Road, Suite 250

Yardley, PA 19067

Denise M. Bowman Esq.

Attorney at Antheil Maslow & MacMinn

131 West State Street, P.O. Box 50

Doylestown, PA 18901

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Scott M. Rothman Esq.

Attorney at Curley & Rothman

1100 East Hector Street, Suite 425

Conshohocken, PA 19428

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Acclaim Systems Inc, filed. [19-1355] (SR) [Entered: 02/25/2019 01:34 PM]

Open Document #6

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #3

District Court Memorandum dated 013019

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Northrop Grumman Corp, filed. [19-1355] (AAD) [Entered: 02/27/2019 08:34 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Denise M. Bowman on behalf of Appellee(s) Geometric Results, Inc.. [19-1355] (DMB) [Entered: 02/25/2019 03:39 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Acclaim Systems Inc advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [19-1355] (SR) [Entered: 02/25/2019 01:28 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Nancy Shane Rappaport on behalf of Appellee(s) Northrop Grumman Corporation. [19-1355] (AAD) [Entered: 02/27/2019 08:30 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Adam A. DeSipio on behalf of Appellee(s) Northrop Grumman Corporation. [19-1355] (AAD) [Entered: 02/27/2019 08:31 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Acclaim Systems Inc, filed. [19-1355] (SR) [Entered: 02/25/2019 01:31 PM]

Open Document #2

District Court Order dated 013019

Open Document #4

Case Caption

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Matthew A. Glazer on behalf of Appellee(s) TASC Technical Services, LLC. [19-1355] (MAG) [Entered: 02/26/2019 03:58 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee TASC Technical Services LLC, filed. [19-1355] (MAG) [Entered: 02/28/2019 01:18 PM]

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

Open Document #5

Standing Order

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Scott M. Rothman on behalf of Appellant(s) Acclaim Systems, Inc.. [19-1355] (SR) [Entered: 02/25/2019 01:09 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Geometric Results Inc, filed. [19-1355] (DMB) [Entered: 02/28/2019 03:58 PM]

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Geometric Results Inc, filed. [19-1355] (DMB) [Entered: 02/28/2019 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee TASC Technical Services LLC, filed. [19-1355] (MAG) [Entered: 02/28/2019 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Northrop Grumman Corp, filed. [19-1355] (AAD) [Entered: 02/27/2019 08:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Adam A. DeSipio on behalf of Appellee(s) Northrop Grumman Corporation. [19-1355] (AAD) [Entered: 02/27/2019 08:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Nancy Shane Rappaport on behalf of Appellee(s) Northrop Grumman Corporation. [19-1355] (AAD) [Entered: 02/27/2019 08:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Matthew A. Glazer on behalf of Appellee(s) TASC Technical Services, LLC. [19-1355] (MAG) [Entered: 02/26/2019 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Denise M. Bowman on behalf of Appellee(s) Geometric Results, Inc.. [19-1355] (DMB) [Entered: 02/25/2019 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Acclaim Systems Inc, filed. [19-1355] (SR) [Entered: 02/25/2019 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Acclaim Systems Inc, filed. [19-1355] (SR) [Entered: 02/25/2019 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Acclaim Systems Inc advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [19-1355] (SR) [Entered: 02/25/2019 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Scott M. Rothman on behalf of Appellant(s) Acclaim Systems, Inc.. [19-1355] (SR) [Entered: 02/25/2019 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 02/13/2019 10:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Acclaim Systems Inc in District Court No. 2-17-cv-05607. (PDB) [Entered: 02/13/2019 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less