This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/27/2022 at 06:06:01 (UTC).

ABS Global, Inc., et al v. Inguran, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 ABS Global, Inc , filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Inguran, LLC,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-2339

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ABS GLOBAL, INC.

Defendant / Appellant

GENUS PLC

Defendant / Appellee

INGURAN, LLC, doing business as SEXING TECHNOLOGIES

Intervenor / Appellee

XY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant and Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Steven J. Horowitz

Attorney at SIDLEY AUSTIN LLP

One S. Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603-0000

Defendant / Appellee and Intervenor / Appellee Attorneys

Pratik A. Shah

Attorney at AKIN, GUMP, STRAUSS, HAUER & FELD LLP

2001 K Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20006-1037

Z.W. Julius Chen

Attorney at AKIN, GUMP, STRAUSS, HAUER & FELD LLP

2001 K Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20006-1037

Sarah A. Zylstra

Attorney at BOARDMAN & CLARK LLP

One S. Pinckney Street, P.O Box 927

Madison, WI 53701-0927

Kirt S. O'Neill

Attorney at AKIN, GUMP, STRAUSS, HAUER & FELD, LLC

112 E. Pecan Street

San Antonio, TX 78205-0000

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#2

(#2) ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellee represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellees are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellees brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). [7251751] DW [2] [7251751] [22-2339] (CG) [Entered: 08/01/2022 04:16 PM]

#3

(#3) ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders these appeals CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition. Main appeal brief due on or before 09/07/2022 for ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC. Appellees Cross-Appellants brief due on or before 10/07/2022 for Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC. Appellants Reply Cross-Appellees brief due by 11/07/2022 for Appellants ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC. Reply Brief in Cross Appeal due by 11/28/2022 for Appellees Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC. [3] [7252006] [22-2339, 22-2346] (ER) [Entered: 08/02/2022 03:19 PM]

#4

(#4) Added Attorney(s) Pratik A. Shah for party(s) Appellant XY, LLC Appellant Inguran, LLC, in case 22-2346 Attorney(s) Pratik A. Shah for party(s) Appellee Inguran, LLC Appellee XY, LLC, in case 22-2339 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Pratik A. Shah for Appellees Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC in 22-2339, Appellants Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC in 22-2346. [4] [7252535] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2339, 22-2346]--[Edited 08/05/2022 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Shah, Pratik) [Entered: 08/04/2022 02:17 PM]

#5

(#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Steven J. Horowitz for Appellants Genus PLC and ABS Global, Inc. in 22-2339, Appellees ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC in 22-2346. [5] [7252670] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2339, 22-2346] (Horowitz, Steven) [Entered: 08/04/2022 04:24 PM]

#6

(#6) Docketing Statement filed by Appellants ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 17-1873, 17-1847, 17-2055 and 18-3317 [6] [7252674] [22-2339] (Horowitz, Steven) [Entered: 08/04/2022 04:31 PM]

#7

(#7) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Sarah A. Zylstra for Appellees Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC in 22-2339, Appellants Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC in 22-2346. [7] [7252768] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2339, 22-2346]--[Edited 08/05/2022 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Zylstra, Sarah) [Entered: 08/05/2022 10:39 AM]

#8

(#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Z.W. Julius Chen for Appellants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC and Appellees Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC in 22-2339 Appellees ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC and Appellants Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC in 22-2346. [8] [7252795] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2339, 22-2346]--[Edited 08/05/2022 by MM to correct parties represented by counsel and to reflect addition of counsel.] (Chen, Z.W.) [Entered: 08/05/2022 11:43 AM]

#9

(#9) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Thursday, August 18, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS. [9] [7252871] [22-2339, 22-2346] (ER) [Entered: 08/05/2022 02:40 PM]

#10

(#10) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Main appeal brief due on or before 09/19/2022 for ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC. Appellee Cross-Appellant brief due on or before 10/19/2022 for Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC. Appellant Reply Cross-Appellee brief due by 11/21/2022 for Appellants ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC. Reply Brief in Cross Appeal due by 12/12/2022 for Appellees Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC. JNS [7252874] [22-2339, 22-2346] (ER) [Entered: 08/05/2022 02:49 PM]

#11

(#11) Docketing Statement filed by Appellees Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 17-1847, 17-1873, 17-2055 and 18-3317 [11] [7252922] [22-2339] (Shah, Pratik) [Entered: 08/05/2022 03:47 PM]

#12

(#12) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellees Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC in 22-2339, Appellants Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC in 22-2346. [12] [7253943] [22-2339, 22-2346] (Shah, Pratik) [Entered: 08/10/2022 05:15 PM]

#13

(#13) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. [13] [7255516] [22-2339, 22-2346] (CG) [Entered: 08/19/2022 08:46 AM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Thomas W. Landers, IV for Appellants Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: https://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [14] [7258760] [22-2346] (LJ) [Entered: 09/06/2022 04:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. [13] [7255516] [22-2339, 22-2346] (CG) [Entered: 08/19/2022 08:46 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellees Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC in 22-2339, Appellants Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC in 22-2346. [12] [7253943] [22-2339, 22-2346] (Shah, Pratik) [Entered: 08/10/2022 05:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docketing Statement filed by Appellees Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 17-1847, 17-1873, 17-2055 and 18-3317 [11] [7252922] [22-2339] (Shah, Pratik) [Entered: 08/05/2022 03:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Main appeal brief due on or before 09/19/2022 for ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC. Appellee Cross-Appellant brief due on or before 10/19/2022 for Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC. Appellant Reply Cross-Appellee brief due by 11/21/2022 for Appellants ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC. Reply Brief in Cross Appeal due by 12/12/2022 for Appellees Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC. JNS [7252874] [22-2339, 22-2346] (ER) [Entered: 08/05/2022 02:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Thursday, August 18, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS. [9] [7252871] [22-2339, 22-2346] (ER) [Entered: 08/05/2022 02:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Z.W. Julius Chen for Appellants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC and Appellees Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC in 22-2339 Appellees ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC and Appellants Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC in 22-2346. [8] [7252795] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2339, 22-2346]--[Edited 08/05/2022 by MM to correct parties represented by counsel and to reflect addition of counsel.] (Chen, Z.W.) [Entered: 08/05/2022 11:43 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Sarah A. Zylstra for Appellees Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC in 22-2339, Appellants Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC in 22-2346. [7] [7252768] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2339, 22-2346]--[Edited 08/05/2022 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Zylstra, Sarah) [Entered: 08/05/2022 10:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docketing Statement filed by Appellants ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 17-1873, 17-1847, 17-2055 and 18-3317 [6] [7252674] [22-2339] (Horowitz, Steven) [Entered: 08/04/2022 04:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Steven J. Horowitz for Appellants Genus PLC and ABS Global, Inc. in 22-2339, Appellees ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC in 22-2346. [5] [7252670] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2339, 22-2346] (Horowitz, Steven) [Entered: 08/04/2022 04:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Added Attorney(s) Pratik A. Shah for party(s) Appellant XY, LLC Appellant Inguran, LLC, in case 22-2346 Attorney(s) Pratik A. Shah for party(s) Appellee Inguran, LLC Appellee XY, LLC, in case 22-2339 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Pratik A. Shah for Appellees Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC in 22-2339, Appellants Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC in 22-2346. [4] [7252535] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2339, 22-2346]--[Edited 08/05/2022 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Shah, Pratik) [Entered: 08/04/2022 02:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders these appeals CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition. Main appeal brief due on or before 09/07/2022 for ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC. Appellees Cross-Appellants brief due on or before 10/07/2022 for Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC. Appellants Reply Cross-Appellees brief due by 11/07/2022 for Appellants ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC. Reply Brief in Cross Appeal due by 11/28/2022 for Appellees Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC. [3] [7252006] [22-2339, 22-2346] (ER) [Entered: 08/02/2022 03:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellee represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellees are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellees brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). [7251751] DW [2] [7251751] [22-2339] (CG) [Entered: 08/01/2022 04:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC by 08/04/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 08/12/2022. Appellants' brief due on or before 09/07/2022 for ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC. [1] [7251393] [22-2339] (CG) [Entered: 07/29/2022 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Genus PLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ABS Global, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Inguran, LLC d/b/a Sexing Technologies is a litigant