This case was last updated from PACER on 03/10/2019 at 06:10:05 (UTC).

Abigail Bacon, et al v. Avis Budget Group, et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 Abigail Bacon filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Avis Budget Group. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1065

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

ABIGAIL BACON

GEORGE DAVIDSON, and on behalf of themselves and the putative class

YVONNE WHEELER

ARCADIA LEE

JEANNINE DEVRIES

RICHARD ALEXANDER

LISA GEARY

Defendant / Appellees

PAYLESS CAR RENTAL

AVIS BUDGET GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

David J. DiSabato Esq.

Attorney at The Wolf Law Firm

1520 U.S. Highway 130, Suite 101

North Brunswick, NJ 08902

Greg M. Kohn Esq.

Attorney at Nagel Rice

103 Eisenhower Parkway

Roseland, NJ 07068

Bruce H. Nagel Esq.

Attorney at Nagel Rice

103 Eisenhower Parkway

Roseland, NJ 07068

Lisa R. Bouckenooghe Esq.

Attorney at The Wolf Law Firm

1520 U.S. Highway 130, Suite 101

North Brunswick, NJ 08902

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Patrick M. Emery Esq.

Attorney at Reed Smith

225 Fifth Avenue, Suite 1200

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Laura K. Conroy Esq.

Attorney at Reed Smith

136 Main Street, Princeton Forrestal Village, Suite 250

Princeton, NJ 08540

M. Patrick Yingling

Attorney at Reed Smith

10 South Wacker Drive, 40Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Kim M. Watterson Esq.

Attorney at Reed Smith

225 Fifth Avenue, Suite 1200

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Kellie A. Lavery Esq.

Attorney at Reed Smith

136 Main Street, Princeton Forrestal Village, Suite 250

Princeton, NJ 08540

Siobhan A. Nolan Esq.

Attorney at Reed Smith

136 Main Street, Princeton Forrestal Village, Suite 250

Princeton, NJ 08540

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellants Richard Alexander, Abigail Bacon, George Davidson, Jeannine Devries, Lisa Geary, Arcadia Lee and Yvonne Wheeler in 19-1065 for Extension of Time to file Opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss cross-appeal until/for 4/5/19. Certificate of Service dated 02/25/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1065, 18-3780] (GMK) [Entered: 02/25/2019 10:31 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Motion filed by Avis Budget Group and Payless Car Rental Appellants in No. 18-3780/Appellees in No. 19-1065 to Dismiss Cross Appeal. Certificate of Service dated 02/15/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1065, 18-3780]--[Edited 02/19/2019 by CJG] (KMW) [Entered: 02/15/2019 02:26 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Patrick M. Emery on behalf of Appellee(s) Avis Budget Group, Inc. and Payless Car Rental, Inc.. [19-1065] (PME) [Entered: 01/28/2019 05:39 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Payless Car Rental, filed. [19-1065] (KMW) [Entered: 01/28/2019 05:17 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Avis Budget Group, filed. [19-1065] (KMW) [Entered: 01/28/2019 05:16 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Greg M. Kohn on behalf of Appellant(s) Abigail Bacon, Arcadia Lee, Jeannine Devries, Lisa Geary, Richard Alexander, Yvonne Wheeler, George Davidson. [19-1065]--[Edited 01/23/2019 by JK] (GMK) [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:28 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Richard Alexander, Abigail Bacon, George Davidson, Jeannine Devries, Lisa Geary, Arcadia Lee and Yvonne Wheeler, received. [19-1065] (DJD) [Entered: 01/23/2019 02:18 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Richard Alexander, Abigail Bacon, George Davidson, Jeannine Devries, Lisa Geary, Arcadia Lee and Yvonne Wheeler, filed. [19-1065] (DJD) [Entered: 01/23/2019 02:17 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from M. Patrick Yingling on behalf of Appellee(s) Avis Budget Group, Inc. and Payless Car Rental, Inc.. [19-1065] (MPY) [Entered: 01/16/2019 07:12 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kim M. Watterson on behalf of Appellee(s) Avis Budget Group, Inc. and Payless Car Rental, Inc.. [19-1065] (KMW) [Entered: 01/16/2019 07:09 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Avis Budget Group and Payless Car Rental in 18-3780 advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [18-3780, 19-1065] (KMW) [Entered: 01/16/2019 06:09 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lisa R. Bouckenooghe on behalf of Appellant(s) ABIGAIL BACON, ARCADIA LEE, JEANNINE DEVRIES, LISA GEARY, RICHARD ALEXANDER, YVONNE WHEELER, and GEORGE DAVIDSON. [19-1065] (LRB) [Entered: 01/14/2019 02:48 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David J. DiSabato on behalf of Appellant(s) ABIGAIL BACON, ARCADIA LEE, JEANNINE DEVRIES, LISA GEARY, RICHARD ALEXANDER, YVONNE WHEELER, and GEORGE DAVIDSON. [19-1065] (DJD) [Entered: 01/14/2019 02:44 PM]

Open Document #6

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #5

Standing Order Excess Pagination

Open Document #4

Case Caption

Open Document #3

District Court Order

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) granting unopposed motion for extension of time filed by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Abigail Bacon, Arcadia Lee, Jeannine Devries, Lisa Geary, Richard Alexander, Yvonne Wheeler and George Davidson for extension of time until April 5, 2019 to file their response to motion to dismiss cross-appeal. No further extensions of time will be granted. [18-3780, 19-1065] (NR) [Entered: 03/01/2019 08:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellants Richard Alexander, Abigail Bacon, George Davidson, Jeannine Devries, Lisa Geary, Arcadia Lee and Yvonne Wheeler in 19-1065 for Extension of Time to file Opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss cross-appeal until/for 4/5/19. Certificate of Service dated 02/25/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1065, 18-3780] (GMK) [Entered: 02/25/2019 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Motion filed by Avis Budget Group and Payless Car Rental Appellants in No. 18-3780/Appellees in No. 19-1065 to Dismiss Cross Appeal. Certificate of Service dated 02/15/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1065, 18-3780]--[Edited 02/19/2019 by CJG] (KMW) [Entered: 02/15/2019 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Patrick M. Emery on behalf of Appellee(s) Avis Budget Group, Inc. and Payless Car Rental, Inc.. [19-1065] (PME) [Entered: 01/28/2019 05:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Payless Car Rental, filed. [19-1065] (KMW) [Entered: 01/28/2019 05:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Avis Budget Group, filed. [19-1065] (KMW) [Entered: 01/28/2019 05:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Greg M. Kohn on behalf of Appellant(s) Abigail Bacon, Arcadia Lee, Jeannine Devries, Lisa Geary, Richard Alexander, Yvonne Wheeler, George Davidson. [19-1065]--[Edited 01/23/2019 by JK] (GMK) [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Richard Alexander, Abigail Bacon, George Davidson, Jeannine Devries, Lisa Geary, Arcadia Lee and Yvonne Wheeler, received. [19-1065] (DJD) [Entered: 01/23/2019 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Richard Alexander, Abigail Bacon, George Davidson, Jeannine Devries, Lisa Geary, Arcadia Lee and Yvonne Wheeler, filed. [19-1065] (DJD) [Entered: 01/23/2019 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from M. Patrick Yingling on behalf of Appellee(s) Avis Budget Group, Inc. and Payless Car Rental, Inc.. [19-1065] (MPY) [Entered: 01/16/2019 07:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kim M. Watterson on behalf of Appellee(s) Avis Budget Group, Inc. and Payless Car Rental, Inc.. [19-1065] (KMW) [Entered: 01/16/2019 07:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Avis Budget Group and Payless Car Rental in 18-3780 advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [18-3780, 19-1065] (KMW) [Entered: 01/16/2019 06:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lisa R. Bouckenooghe on behalf of Appellant(s) ABIGAIL BACON, ARCADIA LEE, JEANNINE DEVRIES, LISA GEARY, RICHARD ALEXANDER, YVONNE WHEELER, and GEORGE DAVIDSON. [19-1065] (LRB) [Entered: 01/14/2019 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David J. DiSabato on behalf of Appellant(s) ABIGAIL BACON, ARCADIA LEE, JEANNINE DEVRIES, LISA GEARY, RICHARD ALEXANDER, YVONNE WHEELER, and GEORGE DAVIDSON. [19-1065] (DJD) [Entered: 01/14/2019 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 01/09/2019 01:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Richard Alexander, Abigail Bacon, George Davidson, Jeannine Devries, Lisa Geary, Arcadia Lee and Yvonne Wheeler in District Court No. 2-16-cv-05939. (JK) [Entered: 01/09/2019 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less