This case was last updated from PACER on 11/05/2019 at 06:00:19 (UTC).

Abernathy v. Anderson

Case Summary

On 09/06/2019 Abernathy filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Anderson. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1880

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

THOMAS A. GROBLEWSKI

BRUCE GELB

MICHAEL RUMERY

DARLING, a/k/a John Doe

GYLES, a/k/a John Doe

OFFICER BRIEU, a/k/a John Doe

SHELDON, a/k/a John Doe

LUIS S. SPENCER

SHAWN DEWEY

DAVID DARLING, a/k/a John Doe

GERARD BREAU, a/k/a John Doe

SHAWNN GYLES, a/k/a John Doe

SHAUN DEWEY

KYLE SHELDON, a/k/a John Doe

Defendant / Appellee

KRYSTAL ANDERSON

Plaintiff / Appellant

FRANKLIN B. ABERNATHY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

James A. Bello

Attorney at Morrison Mahoney LLP

250 Summer St

Boston, MA 02210-0000

Caroline M. Kelly

Attorney at Morrison Mahoney LLP

250 Summer St

Boston, MA 02210-0000

Richard Elkins Gordon Jr.

Attorney at MA Dept of Correction

70 Franklin St, Ste 600

Boston, MA 02110-1300

Tory A. Weigand

Attorney at Morrison Mahoney LLP

250 Summer St

Boston, MA 02210-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Margaret L. Sullivan

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

100 Northern Ave

Boston, MA 02210

Ezekiel L. Hill

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

901 New York Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20001-0000

Diana Coleman

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

901 New York Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20001-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Franklin B. Abernathy filed by Attorney Diana E. Coleman. Certificate of service dated 10/28/2019. [19-1880] (DC) [Entered: 10/28/2019 09:13 AM]

Open Document

ORDER entered: Attorney Margaret L. Sullivan has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel of record for Appellant Franklin B. Abernathy. Upon consideration, the motion is allowed, and attorney Sullvian is hereby withdrawn. Appellant Franklin B. Abernathy will continue to be represented by his remaining counsel of record. [19-1880] (GB) [Entered: 10/21/2019 03:06 PM]

Open Document

MOTION for Attorney Margaret L. Sullivan to withdraw as counsel filed by Appellant Franklin B. Abernathy. Certificate of service dated 10/21/2019. [19-1880] (MLS) [Entered: 10/21/2019 01:05 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Caroline M. Kelly for Krystal Anderson and Thomas A. Groblewski and Caroline M. Kelly for Thomas A. Groblewski. [19-1880] (GB) [Entered: 10/08/2019 08:47 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Krystal Anderson filed by Attorney Tory A. Weigand. Certificate of service dated 10/04/2019. [19-1880] (TAW) [Entered: 10/04/2019 02:48 PM]

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document

NOTICE issued. After 10/07/2019, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless she registers for an appellate ECF account: Caroline M. Kelly for Krystal Anderson and Thomas A. Groblewski. [19-1880] (GB) [Entered: 09/23/2019 08:34 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Krystal Anderson filed by Attorney James A. Bello, Esq.. Certificate of service dated 09/20/2019. [19-1880] (JAB) [Entered: 09/20/2019 11:06 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Franklin B. Abernathy filed by Attorney Ezekiel L. Hill. Certificate of service dated 09/19/2019. [19-1880] (ELH) [Entered: 09/19/2019 01:17 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Franklin B. Abernathy indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 09/19/2019. [19-1880] (MLS) [Entered: 09/19/2019 01:13 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Franklin B. Abernathy. Certificate of service dated 09/19/2019. [19-1880] (MLS) [Entered: 09/19/2019 01:12 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Franklin B. Abernathy filed by Attorney Margaret L. Sullivan. Certificate of service dated 09/19/2019. [19-1880] (MLS) [Entered: 09/19/2019 01:11 PM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Franklin B. Abernathy filed by Attorney Diana E. Coleman. Certificate of service dated 10/28/2019. [19-1880] (DC) [Entered: 10/28/2019 09:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER entered: Attorney Margaret L. Sullivan has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel of record for Appellant Franklin B. Abernathy. Upon consideration, the motion is allowed, and attorney Sullvian is hereby withdrawn. Appellant Franklin B. Abernathy will continue to be represented by his remaining counsel of record. [19-1880] (GB) [Entered: 10/21/2019 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for Attorney Margaret L. Sullivan to withdraw as counsel filed by Appellant Franklin B. Abernathy. Certificate of service dated 10/21/2019. [19-1880] (MLS) [Entered: 10/21/2019 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Caroline M. Kelly for Krystal Anderson and Thomas A. Groblewski and Caroline M. Kelly for Thomas A. Groblewski. [19-1880] (GB) [Entered: 10/08/2019 08:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Krystal Anderson filed by Attorney Tory A. Weigand. Certificate of service dated 10/04/2019. [19-1880] (TAW) [Entered: 10/04/2019 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 11/13/2019 for appellant Franklin B. Abernathy. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1880] (GB) [Entered: 10/04/2019 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE issued. After 10/07/2019, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless she registers for an appellate ECF account: Caroline M. Kelly for Krystal Anderson and Thomas A. Groblewski. [19-1880] (GB) [Entered: 09/23/2019 08:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Krystal Anderson filed by Attorney James A. Bello, Esq.. Certificate of service dated 09/20/2019. [19-1880] (JAB) [Entered: 09/20/2019 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Franklin B. Abernathy filed by Attorney Ezekiel L. Hill. Certificate of service dated 09/19/2019. [19-1880] (ELH) [Entered: 09/19/2019 01:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Franklin B. Abernathy indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 09/19/2019. [19-1880] (MLS) [Entered: 09/19/2019 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Franklin B. Abernathy. Certificate of service dated 09/19/2019. [19-1880] (MLS) [Entered: 09/19/2019 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Franklin B. Abernathy filed by Attorney Margaret L. Sullivan. Certificate of service dated 09/19/2019. [19-1880] (MLS) [Entered: 09/19/2019 01:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #258) filed by Appellant Franklin B. Abernathy. Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript Report/Order form due 09/20/2019 . [19-1880] (GB) [Entered: 09/06/2019 12:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.