This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/28/2020 at 06:00:48 (UTC).

Abel Campos v. Steves & Sons, Incorporated

Case Summary

On 11/29/2019 Abel Campos filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Steves Sons, Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-51100

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ABEL CAMPOS

Defendant / Appellee

STEVES & SONS, INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Mark Anthony Sanchez Esq. Sr.

Attorney at Sanchez & Wilson, P.L.L.C.

6243 Ih-10, W.

San Antonio, TX 78201

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Justin James Barbour

Attorney at Schmoyer Reinhard L.L.P.

8000 Ih 10 West

San Antonio, TX 78230

Christine Elaine Reinhard

Attorney at Schmoyer Reinhard L.L.P.

8000 Ih 10 West

San Antonio, TX 78230

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Mark Anthony Sanchez, Sr., Esq. for Mr. Abel Campos for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-51100] (Mark Anthony Sanchez Sr.) [Entered: 12/16/2019 02:41 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Justin James Barbour for Steves & Sons, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-51100] (Justin James Barbour ) [Entered: 12/16/2019 12:15 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-51100] (Christine Elaine Reinhard ) [Entered: 12/16/2019 12:14 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Abel Campos advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [19-51100] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Abel Campos advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 12/10/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Barbour; Attorney for Appellant: Sanchez [19-51100] (Mark Anthony Sanchez Sr.) [Entered: 12/10/2019 05:35 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9203061-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 12/19/2019 for Appellant Abel Campos [19-51100] (CBW) [Entered: 12/04/2019 03:04 PM]

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Abel Campos [19-51100] (MFY) [Entered: 11/29/2019 01:56 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Mark Anthony Sanchez Sr. for Appellant Abel Campos in 19-51100 [19-51100] (RSM) [Entered: 12/17/2019 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Christine Elaine Reinhard for party(s) Appellee Steves & Sons, Incorporated, in case 19-51100 [19-51100] (RSM) [Entered: 12/17/2019 09:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Justin James Barbour for Appellee Steves & Sons, Incorporated in 19-51100 [19-51100] (RSM) [Entered: 12/17/2019 09:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Mark Anthony Sanchez, Sr., Esq. for Mr. Abel Campos for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-51100] (Mark Anthony Sanchez Sr.) [Entered: 12/16/2019 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Justin James Barbour for Steves & Sons, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-51100] (Justin James Barbour ) [Entered: 12/16/2019 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-51100] (Christine Elaine Reinhard ) [Entered: 12/16/2019 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Abel Campos advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [19-51100] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Abel Campos advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 12/10/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Barbour; Attorney for Appellant: Sanchez [19-51100] (Mark Anthony Sanchez Sr.) [Entered: 12/10/2019 05:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9203061-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 12/19/2019 for Appellant Abel Campos [19-51100] (CBW) [Entered: 12/04/2019 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Abel Campos [19-51100] (MFY) [Entered: 11/29/2019 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STEVES AND SONS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justin James Barbour

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christine Elaine Reinhard