This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/08/2022 at 06:06:47 (UTC).

Abdul Underwood v. Moss, et al

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 Abdul Underwood filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Moss. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-15185

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ABDUL MAHADDIE UNDERWOOD

Tucson, AZ 85734-4401

Defendant / Appellees

MOSS, named as Chaplain Moss

TRINITY SERVICES GROUP INCORPORATED

DAVID SHINN, Director

BONORAND, Named as Mr. Bonorand

HERMAN, named as Chaplain Herman

MILLHOFF, Named as COIV K Millhoff

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Abdul Mahaddie Underwood

Attorney at ASPC - ARIZONA STATE PRISON COMPLEX - TUCSON

P.O. Box 24401

Tucson, AZ 85734-4401

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Bradley Dunn

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

2375 E Camelback Road, Suite 750

Phoenix, AZ 85016

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #3

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed original and 0 copies of Appellant Abdul Mahaddie Underwood opening brief of 17 pages (Informal: No). Served on 02/16/2022. [12379035] (SML) [Entered: 02/24/2022 12:00 PM]

#3

(#3) Filed order (WILLIAM C. CANBY, MARSHA S. BERZON and MARK J. BENNETT) : A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the January 22, 2022 order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b); Chacon v. Babcock, 640 F.2d 221, 222 (9th Cir. 1981) (order disposing of fewer than all claims against all parties not immediately appealable unless district court directs entry of judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b)); see also Medhekar v. United States Dist. Court, 99 F.3d 325, 326 (9th Cir. 1996) (discovery orders not immediately appealable). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. DISMISSED. [12379424] (RT) [Entered: 02/24/2022 03:19 PM]

#4

(#4) MANDATE ISSUED. (WCC, MSB and MJB) [12398625] (NAC) [Entered: 03/18/2022 07:26 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MANDATE ISSUED. (WCC, MSB and MJB) [12398625] (NAC) [Entered: 03/18/2022 07:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed order (WILLIAM C. CANBY, MARSHA S. BERZON and MARK J. BENNETT) : A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the January 22, 2022 order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b); Chacon v. Babcock, 640 F.2d 221, 222 (9th Cir. 1981) (order disposing of fewer than all claims against all parties not immediately appealable unless district court directs entry of judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b)); see also Medhekar v. United States Dist. Court, 99 F.3d 325, 326 (9th Cir. 1996) (discovery orders not immediately appealable). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. DISMISSED. [12379424] (RT) [Entered: 02/24/2022 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed original and 0 copies of Appellant Abdul Mahaddie Underwood opening brief of 17 pages (Informal: No). Served on 02/16/2022. [12379035] (SML) [Entered: 02/24/2022 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Abdul Mahaddie Underwood opening brief due 04/05/2022. Appellees Bonorand, Herman, Millhoff, Moss, David Shinn, Director and Trinity Services Group Incorporated answering brief due 05/05/2022. [12363201] (JMR) [Entered: 02/07/2022 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRINITY SERVICES GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradley Dunn