This case was last updated from PACER on 10/29/2019 at 06:07:05 (UTC).

Abdikarim Karrani v. Jetblue Airways Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/30/2019 a Civil Right - Other Civil Right case was filed by Abdikarim Karrani against Jetblue Airways Corporation in the jurisdiction of U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-35739

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation

Plaintiff / Appellant

ABDIKARIM KARRANI

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Abdikarim Karrani Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/03/2019. [11419693] [19-35739] (Sheridan, John) [Entered: 09/03/2019 10:44 PM]

#1

Docketing Letter

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Assessment Conference, 10/03/2019, 1:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11422396] (LW) [Entered: 09/05/2019 02:04 PM]

1 #3

Mediation Letter

#5

(#5) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CJ) The courts records reflect that the notice of appeal was filed during the pendency of a timely filed motion listed in Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a)(4). The notice of appeal is therefore ineffective until entry of the order disposing of the last such motion outstanding. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). Accordingly, appellate proceedings other than mediation shall be held in abeyance pending the district courts resolution of the pending motion. See Leader Natl Ins. Co. v. Indus. Indem. Ins. Co., 19 F.3d 444, 445 (9th Cir. 1994). Within 7 days after the district courts ruling on the pending motion, appellant shall notify this court in writing of the ruling and shall advise whether appellant intends to prosecute this appeal. To appeal the district courts ruling on the post-judgment motion, appellant must file an amended notice of appeal within the time prescribed by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4. The Clerk shall serve this order on the district court. [11430807] (TSP) [Entered: 09/13/2019 10:55 AM]

1 #2

Counsel Case Opening Packet

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CJ) The courts records reflect that the notice of appeal was filed during the pendency of a timely filed motion listed in Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a)(4). The notice of appeal is therefore ineffective until entry of the order disposing of the last such motion outstanding. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). Accordingly, appellate proceedings other than mediation shall be held in abeyance pending the district courts resolution of the pending motion. See Leader Natl Ins. Co. v. Indus. Indem. Ins. Co., 19 F.3d 444, 445 (9th Cir. 1994). Within 7 days after the district courts ruling on the pending motion, appellant shall notify this court in writing of the ruling and shall advise whether appellant intends to prosecute this appeal. To appeal the district courts ruling on the post-judgment motion, appellant must file an amended notice of appeal within the time prescribed by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4. The Clerk shall serve this order on the district court. [11430807] (TSP) [Entered: 09/13/2019 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Assessment Conference, 10/03/2019, 1:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11422396] (LW) [Entered: 09/05/2019 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • (#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/03/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11419715][19-35739] (AD) [Entered: 09/04/2019 06:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Abdikarim Karrani Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/03/2019. [11419693] [19-35739] (Sheridan, John) [Entered: 09/03/2019 10:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/06/2019. Appellant Abdikarim Karrani opening brief due 10/28/2019. Appellee Jetblue Airways Corporation answering brief due 11/27/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11416260] (JPD) [Entered: 08/30/2019 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.