This case was last updated from PACER on 08/29/2021 at 06:16:53 (UTC).

ABC Corporation I v. Partnership And Unincorporated Associations

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 ABC Corporation I filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Partnership And Unincorporated Associations. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2107

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendants

URBANMAX

TOMOLOO-US

TOMOLOO FRANCHISE

TOMOLOO DX

FENGCHI-US

TOMOLOO INT

GAODESHANGUS

GYROOR

THE PARTNERSHIP AND UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATIONS IDENTIFIED ON SCHEDULE "A"

TOMOLOO TC

TOMOLOO INE

TOMOLOO FLAGSHIP

TOMOLOO OFFICIAL

Plaintiff / Appellees

ABC CORPORATION I

ABC CORPORATION II

Defendant / Appellant

GYROOR US

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Adam Glenn Kelly

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb LLP

321 North Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60610

Douglas Masters

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb LLP

321 North Clark Street, Suite 2300

Chicago, IL 60654

Neil Nandi

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb LLP

321 N Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Arthur Tan-Chi Yuan

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb LLP

321 North Clark Street, Suite 2300

Chicago, IL 60654

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Tao Liu

Attorney at Glacier Law PLLC

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

He Cheng

Attorney at Glacier Law PLLC

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Tianyu Ju

Attorney at Glacier Law PLLC

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Notice of Correction to Doc No. [ # 14 ] for Appellees ABC Corporation I and ABC Corporation II. Service: 08/27/2021 by email. [795849] [21-2107] [Neil Nandi] [Entered: 08/27/2021 07:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION of Appellees ABC Corporation I and ABC Corporation II to terminate appeal through Dismissal pursuant to Rule 27 of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure and Federal Circuit Rule 27(f). Cases to be terminated: 21-2107. (Briefing suspended pursuant to FCR 31 pending resolution of the motion). Service: 08/27/2021 by email. [795844] [21-2107] [Neil Nandi] [Entered: 08/27/2021 06:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION of Appellees ABC Corporation I and ABC Corporation II to terminate appeal through Dismissal pursuant to Rule 27 of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure and Federal Circuit Rule 27(f). Cases to be terminated: 21-2107. (Briefing suspended pursuant to FCR 31 pending resolution of the motion). Service: 08/27/2021 by email. [795727] [21-2107] [Neil Nandi] [Entered: 08/27/2021 11:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees ABC Corporation I and ABC Corporation II, Motion to terminate appeal [ # 12 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 08/31/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [794945] [KMH] [Entered: 08/24/2021 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION of Appellees ABC Corporation I and ABC Corporation II to terminate appeal through Dismissal pursuant to Rule 27 of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure and Federal Circuit Rule 27(f).. Cases to be terminated: 21-2107. (Briefing suspended pursuant to FCR 31 pending resolution of the motion). Service: 08/20/2021 by email. [794374] [21-2107] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 13 ] [Neil Nandi] [Entered: 08/20/2021 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corrected Entry of appearance for Adam Glenn Kelly; Arthur Tan-chi Yuan; Douglas N. Masters; Neil G. Nandi as counsel for Appellees ABC Corporation I and ABC Corporation II. Service: 07/19/2021 by email. [787114] [21-2107] [Adam Kelly] [Entered: 07/19/2021 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellant GYROOR US. Service: 07/15/2021 by email. [786649] [21-2107] [Tianyu Ju] [Entered: 07/15/2021 11:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant GYROOR US, Docketing Statement [ # 7 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 07/22/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [786470] [JCW] [Entered: 07/15/2021 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees ABC Corporation I and ABC Corporation II, Entry of Appearance [ # 3 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 07/22/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [786381] [JCW] [Entered: 07/15/2021 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellant GYROOR US. Service: 07/14/2021 by email. [786322] [21-2107]. This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 9 ] [Tianyu Ju] [Entered: 07/14/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellant GYROOR US. Service: 07/14/2021 by email. [786320] [21-2107] [Tianyu Ju] [Entered: 07/14/2021 06:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docketing Statement for the Appellees ABC Corporation I and ABC Corporation II. Service: 07/14/2021 by email. [786203] [21-2107] [Adam Kelly] [Entered: 07/14/2021 01:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interest for Appellees ABC Corporation I and ABC Corporation II. Service: 07/14/2021 by email. [786202] [21-2107] [Adam Kelly] [Entered: 07/14/2021 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Entry of appearance for Adam G. Kelly; Arthur Tan-chi Yuan; Douglas N. Masters; Neil G. Nandi as counsel for Appellees ABC Corporation I and ABC Corporation II. Service: 07/14/2021 by email. [786200] [21-2107]. This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 8 ] [Adam Kelly] [Entered: 07/14/2021 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for He Cheng; Tao Liu; Tianyu Ju as counsel for Appellant GYROOR US. Service: 07/07/2021 by email. [784513] [21-2107] [Tianyu Ju] [Entered: 07/07/2021 01:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 06/23/2021. [783565] Entry of Appearance due 07/14/2021. Certificate of Interest due 07/14/2021. Docketing Statement due 07/14/2021. Appellant's brief is due 08/30/2021. [KMH] [Entered: 06/30/2021 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GYROOR is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tianyu Ju