This case was last updated from PACER on 09/04/2021 at 05:48:26 (UTC).

ABC Corporation I v. Partnership And Unincorporated Associations

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 ABC Corporation I filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Partnership And Unincorporated Associations. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2277

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EBAY, INC.

Defendants

THE PARTNERSHIP AND UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATIONS IDENTIFIED ON SCHEDULE "A"

TOMOLOO OFFICIAL

TOMOLOO INE

TOMOLOO FRANCHISE

TOMOLOO-US

TOMOLOO FLAGSHIP

TOMOLOO TC

TOMOLOO DX

TOMOLOO INT

URBANMAX

GAODESHANGUS

GYROOR

FENGCHI-US

CARTSTACK

DIDEN WU

HUSNAL-COLLECTIONS

Plaintiff / Appellees

ABC CORPORATION I

ABC CORPORATION II

Defendant / Appellant

GYROOR US

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Adam Glenn Kelly

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb LLP

321 North Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60610

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Tao Liu

Attorney at Glacier Law PLLC

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 08/31/2021. [796877] Entry of Appearance is due on 09/16/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/16/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 09/16/2021. Appellant's brief is due on 11/01/2021. [JCW] [Entered: 09/02/2021 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GYROOR is a litigant

Latest cases where EBAY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant