This case was last updated from PACER on 09/17/2021 at 06:11:41 (UTC).

ABC Corporation I v. Partnership And Unincorporated Associations

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 ABC Corporation I filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Partnership And Unincorporated Associations. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2150

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendants

THE PARTNERSHIP AND UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATIONS IDENTIFIED ON SCHEDULE "A"

TOMOLOO OFFICIAL

TOMOLOO INE

TOMOLOO FRANCHISE

TOMOLOO-US

TOMOLOO FLAGSHIP

TOMOLOO TC

TOMOLOO DX

TOMOLOO INT

URBANMAX

GYROOR

FENGCHI-US

GYROOR US

Plaintiff / Appellees

ABC CORPORATION I

ABC CORPORATION II

Defendant / Appellant

GAODESHANGUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Adam Glenn Kelly

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb LLP

321 North Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60610

Douglas Masters

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb LLP

321 North Clark Street, Suite 2300

Chicago, IL 60654

Neil Nandi

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb LLP

321 N Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Arthur Tan-Chi Yuan

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb LLP

321 North Clark Street, Suite 2300

Chicago, IL 60654

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Tao Liu

Attorney at Glacier Law PLLC

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

He Cheng

Attorney at Glacier Law PLLC

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Tianyu Ju

Attorney at Glacier Law PLLC

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE of Appellant GaodeshangUS to Doc. No. [ # 9 ], [ # 9 ]. Service: 09/07/2021 by email. [797612] [21-2150] [Tianyu Ju] [Entered: 09/07/2021 11:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER filed Within 14 days of the date of filing of this order, GaodeshangUS is directed to file a response to this order explaining why this court has jurisdiction. Within 10 days thereafter, the appellees may file a response to that filing. The briefing schedule is stayed. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [795726] [LMS] [Entered: 08/27/2021 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docketing Statement for the Appellant GaodeshangUS. Service: 08/02/2021 by email. [790143] [21-2150] [Tianyu Ju] [Entered: 08/02/2021 11:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interest for Appellant GaodeshangUS. Service: 08/02/2021 by email. [790140] [21-2150] [Tianyu Ju] [Entered: 08/02/2021 11:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Entry of appearance for He Cheng; Tao Liu; Tianyu Ju as counsel for Appellant GaodeshangUS. Service: 08/02/2021 by email. [790139] [21-2150] [Tianyu Ju] [Entered: 08/02/2021 10:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docketing Statement for the Appellees ABC Corporation I and ABC Corporation II. Service: 08/02/2021 by email. [790036] [21-2150] [Adam Kelly] [Entered: 08/02/2021 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interest for Appellees ABC Corporation I and ABC Corporation II. Service: 08/02/2021 by email. [790034] [21-2150] [Adam Kelly] [Entered: 08/02/2021 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Entry of appearance for Adam Glenn Kelly; Arthur Tan-chi Yuan; Douglas N. Masters; Neil G. Nandi as counsel for Appellees ABC Corporation I and ABC Corporation II. Service: 08/02/2021 by email. [790032] [21-2150] [Adam Kelly] [Entered: 08/02/2021 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerk's Note to the File: Appeal transferred from U. S. Court of Appeals for the 7th Circuit, Case No. 21-1964. (Ref: caseopening document, [ # 1 ]) [787126] [CAB] [Entered: 07/19/2021 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 07/16/2021. [787124] Entry of Appearance is due on 08/02/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 08/02/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 08/02/2021. Appellant's brief is due on 09/17/2021. [CAB] [Entered: 07/19/2021 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GYROOR is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tianyu Ju