This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:01:45 (UTC).

A.B., et al v. Pleasant Valley School Distric

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 A B filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Pleasant Valley School Distric. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2513

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

PLEASANT VALLEY SCHOOL DISTRICT

Plaintiff / Appellants

F. B.

A. B., By and Through His Parents and Natural Guardians, F.B. and N.V., of Effort, PA

N. V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Glenna M. Hazeltine Esq.

Attorney at King Spry Herman Freund & Faul

One West Broad Street, Suite 700

Bethlehem, PA 18018

John E. Freund Esq. III

Attorney at King Spry Herman Freund & Faul

One West Broad Street, Suite 700

Bethlehem, PA 18018

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Dennis C. McAndrews Esq.

Attorney at McAndrews Law Offices

30 Cassatt Avenue

Berwyn, PA 19312

John W. Goldsborough Esq.

Attorney at McAndrews Law Offices

30 Cassatt Avenue

Berwyn, PA 19312

Michael E. Gehring Esq.

Attorney at McAndrews Law Offices

30 Cassatt Avenue

Berwyn, PA 19312

Heather Hulse Esq.

Attorney at McAndrews Law Offices

30 Cassatt Avenue

Berwyn, PA 19312

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #2

Mediation Notice of Assignment Telephone

Open Restricted Document #1

Mediation Instructions

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Pleasant Valley School District, filed. [19-2513] (JEF) [Entered: 08/07/2019 09:41 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Glenna M. Hazeltine, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Pleasant Valley School District. [19-2513] (GMH) [Entered: 08/01/2019 11:52 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John E. Freund, III, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Pleasant Valley School District. [19-2513] (JEF) [Entered: 08/01/2019 11:50 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants A. B., F. B. and N. V., filed. [19-2513] (JWG) [Entered: 08/01/2019 10:02 AM]

Open Document #2

Memorandum and Order dated 6-28-19

Open Document #1

Concise Summary of the Case

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants A. B., F. B. and N. V., filed. [19-2513] (JWG) [Entered: 08/01/2019 09:56 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants A. B., F. B. and N. V. advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. Diana Gilbride. [19-2513] (JWG) [Entered: 08/01/2019 09:55 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John W. Goldsborough on behalf of Appellant(s) A,B,, et al.. [19-2513] (JWG) [Entered: 08/01/2019 09:52 AM]

Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to Glenna M. Hazeltine, Esq. for Pleasant Valley School District requesting the following documents: Appearance Form on or before 08/01/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 08/01/2019. (DW) [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:41 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Letter request for extension to file opening documents filed by Appellants A. B., F. B. and N. V.. Certificate of Service dated 07/22/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-2513] (JWG) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:15 PM]

Open Document

Appendix Citation Notice sent to Michael E. Gehring, Esq., John W. Goldsborough, Esq., Heather Hulse, Esq., Dennis C. McAndrews, Esq., Glenna M. Hazeltine, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 07/30/2019. (DW) [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:54 AM]

Open Document #6

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #5

Standing_Order_Excess_ Pagination_010912

Open Document #2

District_Court_Memorandum_062819

Open Document #1

Notice of Appeal

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 08/08/2019 08:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Pleasant Valley School District, filed. [19-2513] (JEF) [Entered: 08/07/2019 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Glenna M. Hazeltine, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Pleasant Valley School District. [19-2513] (GMH) [Entered: 08/01/2019 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John E. Freund, III, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Pleasant Valley School District. [19-2513] (JEF) [Entered: 08/01/2019 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants A. B., F. B. and N. V., filed. [19-2513] (JWG) [Entered: 08/01/2019 10:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants A. B., F. B. and N. V., received. [19-2513] (JWG) [Entered: 08/01/2019 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants A. B., F. B. and N. V., filed. [19-2513] (JWG) [Entered: 08/01/2019 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants A. B., F. B. and N. V. advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. Diana Gilbride. [19-2513] (JWG) [Entered: 08/01/2019 09:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John W. Goldsborough on behalf of Appellant(s) A,B,, et al.. [19-2513] (JWG) [Entered: 08/01/2019 09:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Glenna M. Hazeltine, Esq. for Pleasant Valley School District requesting the following documents: Appearance Form on or before 08/01/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 08/01/2019. (DW) [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) granting request filed by Appellants A. B., F. B. and N. V. for extension of time to file case opening forms. Appellants' case opening forms must be filed on or before August 1, 2019, filed. (ARR) [Entered: 07/22/2019 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Letter request for extension to file opening documents filed by Appellants A. B., F. B. and N. V.. Certificate of Service dated 07/22/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-2513] (JWG) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appendix Citation Notice sent to Michael E. Gehring, Esq., John W. Goldsborough, Esq., Heather Hulse, Esq., Dennis C. McAndrews, Esq., Glenna M. Hazeltine, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 07/30/2019. (DW) [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (DW) [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants A.B., F.B. and N.V. in District Court No. 3-17-cv-02311. (DW) [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less