This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/20/2022 at 06:07:06 (UTC).

Aaron Ogletree v. Cleveland State University, et al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2022 Aaron Ogletree filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Cleveland State University,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-3795

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

AARON M. OGLETREE

Defendant / Appellants

CLEVELAND STATE UNIVERSITY

CLEVELAND STATE UNIVERSITY BOARD OF TRUSTEES

LAURA BLOOMBERG, President of Cleveland State University

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Cathleen M. Bolek

Attorney at Law Office

5885 Landerbrook Drive, Suite 302

Cleveland, OH 44124

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Benjamin Michael Flowers

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

30 E. Broad Street, 14Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Todd R. Marti

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

30 E. Broad Street, 16Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Mathura Jaya Sridharan

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

30 E. Broad Street, 17Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Laura Bloomberg, Cleveland State University and Cleveland State University Board of Trustees. Transcript needed: n. (JAS) [Entered: 09/21/2022 11:29 AM]

#3

(#3) MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 11/03/2022 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Catherine Geyer. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 09/22/2022 11:39 AM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Laura Bloomberg, Cleveland State University and Cleveland State University Board of Trustees by Benjamin M. Flowers. Certificate of Service: 09/22/2022. [22-3795] (BMF) [Entered: 09/22/2022 12:18 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Laura Bloomberg, Cleveland State University and Cleveland State University Board of Trustees by Mathura J. Sridharan. Certificate of Service: 09/22/2022. [22-3795] (MJS) [Entered: 09/22/2022 12:21 PM]

#6

(#6) MOTION filed by Mr. Benjamin Michael Flowers for Laura Bloomberg, Cleveland State University and Cleveland State University Board of Trustees to hold case in abeyance. Certificate of Service: 09/22/2022. [22-3795] (BMF) [Entered: 09/22/2022 04:10 PM]

7 #1

Cover Letter

7 #2

#8

(#8) Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 11/03/2022 is hereby canceled and may be rescheduled at a future date. [Please open letter for important details.] (LMR) [Entered: 09/26/2022 01:23 PM]

#9

(#9) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Benjamin Michael Flowers for Appellants Laura Bloomberg, Cleveland State University and Cleveland State University Board of Trustees.. Certificate of Service: 09/27/2022. [22-3795] (BMF) [Entered: 09/27/2022 04:28 PM]

#10

(#10) 4a4 Notice filed. Case held in abeyance pending a ruling on the motion to alter, amend, or correct opinion and order filed on 10/13/22 at RE #42. (JAS) [Entered: 10/20/2022 09:04 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 4a4 Notice filed. Case held in abeyance pending a ruling on the motion to alter, amend, or correct opinion and order filed on 10/13/22 at RE #42. (JAS) [Entered: 10/20/2022 09:04 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Benjamin Michael Flowers for Appellants Laura Bloomberg, Cleveland State University and Cleveland State University Board of Trustees.. Certificate of Service: 09/27/2022. [22-3795] (BMF) [Entered: 09/27/2022 04:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 11/03/2022 is hereby canceled and may be rescheduled at a future date. [Please open letter for important details.] (LMR) [Entered: 09/26/2022 01:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER filed granting motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 6 ] filed by Mr. Benjamin Michael Flowers., to require appellant to file status report every 60 days. Status report due 11/28/2022. (JAS) [Entered: 09/26/2022 11:58 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION filed by Mr. Benjamin Michael Flowers for Laura Bloomberg, Cleveland State University and Cleveland State University Board of Trustees to hold case in abeyance. Certificate of Service: 09/22/2022. [22-3795] (BMF) [Entered: 09/22/2022 04:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Laura Bloomberg, Cleveland State University and Cleveland State University Board of Trustees by Mathura J. Sridharan. Certificate of Service: 09/22/2022. [22-3795] (MJS) [Entered: 09/22/2022 12:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Laura Bloomberg, Cleveland State University and Cleveland State University Board of Trustees by Benjamin M. Flowers. Certificate of Service: 09/22/2022. [22-3795] (BMF) [Entered: 09/22/2022 12:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 11/03/2022 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Catherine Geyer. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 09/22/2022 11:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Jennifer Strobel (JAS) [Entered: 09/21/2022 11:37 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Laura Bloomberg, Cleveland State University and Cleveland State University Board of Trustees. Transcript needed: n. (JAS) [Entered: 09/21/2022 11:29 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cleveland State University is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Todd Robert Marti

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Michael Flowers