This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/07/2020 at 06:05:58 (UTC).

A. Philip Randolph Inst. of OH, et al v. Frank LaRose

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 A Philip Randolph Inst of OH filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against Frank LaRose. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-4063

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

 

Party Details

Intervenors

OHIO REPUBLICAN PARTY

NATIONAL REPUBLICAN CONGRESSIONAL COMMITTEE

REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE

DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellees

SOLI COLLINS

C. ELLEN CONNALLY

SARAH RIKLEEN

BEATRICE GRIFFIN

MARCUS GERMANY

LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF OHIO

RYLLIE JESIONOWSKI

MATTHEW NOWLING

A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE OF OHIO

OHIO STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP

Amicus Curiae

CITY OF COLUMBUS, OH

CITY OF CINCINNATI, OH

CITY OF AKRON, OH

CITY OF DAYTON, OH

Defendant / Appellants

FRANK LAROSE, in his official capacity as Secreatary of State of Ohio

FRANK LAROSE, in his official capacity as Secretary of State of Ohio

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Ezra D. Rosenberg

Attorney at Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

1500 K. Street, N.W., Suite 900

Washington, DC 20005

David Joseph Carey

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union of Ohio Foundation

1108 City Park Avenue, Suite 203

Columbus, OH 43206

Subodh Chandra

Attorney at Law Office

1265 W. Sixth Street, Suite 400

Cleveland, OH 44113

James V. Schuster

Attorney at Law Office

2355 Bellfield Avenue

Cleveland Heights, OH 44106

Freda Levenson

Attorney at ACLU of Ohio

4506 Chester Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44103

Jon M. Greenbaum

Attorney at Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

900 15Th Street, N.W., Ninth Floor

Washington, DC 20005

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Richard N. Coglianese

Attorney at City Attorney's Office

77 N. Front Street, Fourth Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Alana Valle Tanoury

Attorney at Columbus City Attorney

77 N. Front Street, Fourth Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Andrew W. Garth

801 Plum Street, Room 214

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Erica Faaborg

Attorney at City of Cincinnati Law Department

801 Plum Street, Suite 214

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Eve V. Belfance

Attorney at Belfance & Belfance

1 Cascade Plaza, 20Th Floor

Akron, OH 44308-1100

John C. Musto

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

P.O. Box 22

Dayton, OH 45402

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Charles M. Miller

Attorney at Ohio Attorney General's Office

30 E. Broad Street, 17Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Bridget Carty Coontz

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

30 E. Broad Street, 16Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Benjamin Michael Flowers

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

30 E. Broad Street, 14Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Other Attorneys

Barbara A. Langhenry

Attorney at City of Cleveland

601 Lakeside Avenue, E., Room 106

Cleveland, OH 44114

Fritz Byers

Attorney at Law Office

414 N. Erie Street, Second Floor

Toledo, OH 43604

Dale Emch

Attorney at City of Toledo

One Government Center, 22Nd Floor

Toledo, OH 43604

 

Court Documents

36 #2

Judge Order

36 #1

Cover Letter

#34

#33

RESTRICTED

#32

#17

#16

#15

#14

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#1

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER GRANTING Ohio Secretary of State Frank LaRose's unopposed motion to dismiss for mootness [ # 34 ] filed by Mr. Benjamin Michael Flowers. Richard Allen Griffin, Circuit Judge; Helene N. White, Circuit Judge and Amul R. Thapar, Circuit Judge. [20-4063, 20-4068] (LAJ) [Entered: 10/28/2020 12:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MOTION filed by Mr. Benjamin Michael Flowers for Frank LaRose in 20-4063 to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction. Certificate of Service: 10/27/2020. [20-4063, 20-4068] (BMF) [Entered: 10/27/2020 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) *LOCKED* MOTION filed by Mr. Benjamin Michael Flowers for Frank LaRose in 20-4063 to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction. Certificate of Service: 10/26/2020. [20-4063, 20-4068] *COUNSEL to include both case numbers on motion.* --[Edited 10/27/2020 by AEG] (BMF) [Entered: 10/26/2020 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) APPEARANCE filed for Amicus Curiae City of Dayton, OH in 20-4063 by John C. Musto. Certificate of Service: 10/19/2020. [20-4063, 20-4068] (JCM) [Entered: 10/19/2020 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for Amicus Curiae Board of Lucas County, OH in 20-4063 Board of Lucas County Commissioners by Fritz Byers. Certificate of Service: 10/16/2020. [20-4063, 20-4068] (FB) [Entered: 10/16/2020 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) APPEARANCE filed for Amicus Curiae City of Cincinnati, OH in 20-4063 by Erica E. Faaborg. Certificate of Service: 10/16/2020. [20-4063, 20-4068] (EF) [Entered: 10/16/2020 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) APPEARANCE filed for Amicus Curiae City of Cincinnati, OH in 20-4063 by Andrew W. Garth. Certificate of Service: 10/16/2020. [20-4063, 20-4068] (AWG) [Entered: 10/16/2020 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Soli Collins, C. Ellen Connally, Marcus Germany, Beatrice Griffin, Ryllie Jesionowski, League of Women Voters of Ohio, Matthew Nowling, Ohio State Conference of the NAACP and Sarah Rikleen in 20-4068, Appellee A. Philip Randolph Institute of Ohio in 20-4063 by James Schuster. Certificate of Service: 10/15/2020. [20-4068, 20-4063] (JVS) [Entered: 10/15/2020 05:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for Amicus Curiae City of Cleveland, OH in 20-4063 City of Cleveland by Barbara A. Langhenry. Certificate of Service: 10/15/2020. [20-4063, 20-4068] (BAL) [Entered: 10/15/2020 05:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ***DOCUMENT LOCKED - Counsel has refiled a corrected form at #27*** APPEARANCE filed for Amicus Curiae City of Cleveland, OH in 20-4063 by Barbara A. Langhenry. Certificate of Service: 10/15/2020. [20-4063, 20-4068]--[Edited 10/16/2020 by LAJ] (BAL) [Entered: 10/15/2020 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees A. Philip Randolph Institute of Ohio, Soli Collins, C. Ellen Connally, Marcus Germany, Beatrice Griffin, Ryllie Jesionowski, League of Women Voters of Ohio, Matthew Nowling, Ohio State Conference of the NAACP and Sarah Rikleen by David J. Carey. Certificate of Service: 10/09/2020. [20-4063] (DJC) [Entered: 10/09/2020 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees A. Philip Randolph Institute of Ohio, Soli Collins, C. Ellen Connally, Marcus Germany, Beatrice Griffin, Ryllie Jesionowski, League of Women Voters of Ohio, Matthew Nowling, Ohio State Conference of the NAACP and Sarah Rikleen by Freda J. Levenson. Certificate of Service: 10/09/2020. [20-4063] (FL) [Entered: 10/09/2020 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees A. Philip Randolph Institute of Ohio, Soli Collins, C. Ellen Connally, Marcus Germany, Beatrice Griffin, Ryllie Jesionowski, League of Women Voters of Ohio, Matthew Nowling, Ohio State Conference of the NAACP and Sarah Rikleen by Subodh Chandra. Certificate of Service: 10/09/2020. [20-4063] (SC) [Entered: 10/09/2020 10:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees A. Philip Randolph Institute of Ohio, Soli Collins, C. Ellen Connally, Marcus Germany, Beatrice Griffin, Ryllie Jesionowski, League of Women Voters of Ohio, Matthew Nowling, Ohio State Conference of the NAACP and Sarah Rikleen by Jon M. Greenbaum. Certificate of Service: 10/09/2020. [20-4063] (JMG) [Entered: 10/09/2020 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees A. Philip Randolph Institute of Ohio, Soli Collins, C. Ellen Connally, Matthew Nowling, Sarah Rikleen, Beatrice Griffin, Ryllie Jesionowski, League of Women Voters of Ohio, Ohio State Conference of the NAACP and Marcus Germany by James Schuster. Certificate of Service: 10/09/2020. [20-4063] (JVS) [Entered: 10/09/2020 09:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Benjamin Michael Flowers for Appellant Frank LaRose.. Certificate of Service: 10/09/2020. [20-4063] (BMF) [Entered: 10/09/2020 08:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) EMERGENCY MOTION filed by Mr. Benjamin Michael Flowers for Frank LaRose for an administrative stay and a stay pending appeal. Certificate of Service: 10/09/2020. [20-4063]--[Edited 10/09/2020 by LAJ] (BMF) [Entered: 10/09/2020 08:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Frank LaRose by Benjamin M. Flowers. Certificate of Service: 10/09/2020. [20-4063] (BMF) [Entered: 10/09/2020 08:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is now: Laura A. Jones (RB) [Entered: 10/08/2020 08:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Frank LaRose. Transcript needed: y. (RB) [Entered: 10/08/2020 08:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A. Philip Randolph Institute is a litigant

Latest cases where League of Women Voters of Ohio is a litigant

Latest cases where Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barbara A. Langhenry