Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/29/2020 at 06:03:32 (UTC).

A. J. J. T., et al v. USA

Case Summary

On 03/30/2020 A J J T filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-5328

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Plaintiff / Appellee

DELVIN D. TAVAREZ

Plaintiff / Appellees

A. J. J. T., individual minor

DELVIN D. TAVAREZ

KELLY D. WILSON

A. J. J. T., individual minor by and through his mother and next friend

Defendant / Appellant

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Kenneth Suggs

Attorney at Janet, Janet & Suggs

500 Taylor Street, Suite 301

Columbia, SC 29201

Donald Capparella

Attorney at Dodson, Parker, Behm & Capparella

1310 Sixth Avenue, N.

Nashville, TN 37208

Gerald Jowers Jr.

Attorney at Janet, Janet & Suggs

500 Taylor Street, Suite 301

Columbia, SC 29201

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Michael L. Roden

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney

110 Ninth Avenue, S., Suite A-961

Nashville, TN 37203

Lindsey Powell

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

Mark B. Stern

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

21 #2

Stipulation to Dismiss

21 #1

Mediator letter sent

#20

(#20) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 06/26/2020. appellee brief now due 07/27/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 04/29/2020 01:58 PM]

#19

(#19) A STATUS REPORT is due TO THE MEDIATION OFFICE 05/13/2020. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 04/29/2020 01:57 PM]

#18

(#18) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 05/27/2020; appellee brief due 06/26/2020. (MMP) [Entered: 04/17/2020 10:50 AM]

16 #2

miscellaneous letter sent

16 #1

Letter

#13

(#13) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 12 ], filed by Mr. Mark B. Stern for USA is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. (MMP) [Entered: 04/13/2020 03:15 PM]

#12

(#12) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant USA by Mark B. Stern. Certificate of Service: 04/13/2020. [20-5328] (MBS) [Entered: 04/13/2020 01:51 PM]

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant USA by Lindsey Powell. Certificate of Service: 04/13/2020. [20-5328] (LP) [Entered: 04/13/2020 12:26 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees A. J. J. T. and Kelly D. Wilson by Gerald D. Jowers, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 04/06/2020. [20-5328] (GJ) [Entered: 04/06/2020 02:09 PM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees A. J. J. T. and Kelly D. Wilson by Kenneth M. Suggs. Certificate of Service: 04/03/2020. [20-5328] (KS) [Entered: 04/03/2020 12:55 PM]

#7

RESTRICTED

6 #2

Additional Document

6 #1

corporate disclosure

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees A. J. J. T. and Kelly D. Wilson by Donald Capparella. Certificate of Service: 04/02/2020. [20-5328] (DC) [Entered: 04/02/2020 01:33 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 04/29/2020 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Kathryn Wollenburg. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 03/31/2020 12:23 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant USA. Transcript needed: y. (MMP) [Entered: 03/30/2020 02:09 PM]

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STATUS REPORT filed. Letter sent by Mediation Office notifying that a brief or stipulation to dismiss is due 06/26/2020. [Failure to file correctly as instructed in our letter will cause your document to be locked and you will be asked to refile.]. (LMR) [Entered: 05/13/2020 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 06/26/2020. appellee brief now due 07/27/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 04/29/2020 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) A STATUS REPORT is due TO THE MEDIATION OFFICE 05/13/2020. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 04/29/2020 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 05/27/2020; appellee brief due 06/26/2020. (MMP) [Entered: 04/17/2020 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Miscellaneous letter sent. (MMP) [Entered: 04/17/2020 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • Docket(#15) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Ms. Lindsey Powell for USA. Certificate of Service: 04/16/2020. [20-5328] (LP) [Entered: 04/16/2020 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE: The initial transcript order has not been completed. If not completed by 04/20/2020 further action will be taken. (MMP) [Entered: 04/16/2020 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 12 ], filed by Mr. Mark B. Stern for USA is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. (MMP) [Entered: 04/13/2020 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant USA by Mark B. Stern. Certificate of Service: 04/13/2020. [20-5328] (MBS) [Entered: 04/13/2020 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Lindsey Powell for Appellant USA. Certificate of Service:04/13/2020. [20-5328] (LP) [Entered: 04/13/2020 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant USA by Lindsey Powell. Certificate of Service: 04/13/2020. [20-5328] (LP) [Entered: 04/13/2020 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees A. J. J. T. and Kelly D. Wilson by Gerald D. Jowers, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 04/06/2020. [20-5328] (GJ) [Entered: 04/06/2020 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees A. J. J. T. and Kelly D. Wilson by Kenneth M. Suggs. Certificate of Service: 04/03/2020. [20-5328] (KS) [Entered: 04/03/2020 12:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ***LOCKED - COUNSEL IS FILING A CORRECTED APPEARANCE BECAUSE DELVIN D. TAVAREZ IS NOT A PARTY IN THE APPEAL*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees A. J. J. T., Delvin D. Tavarez and Kelly D. Wilson by Kenneth M. Suggs. Certificate of Service: 04/02/2020. [20-5328]--[Edited 04/03/2020 by MMP] (KS) [Entered: 04/02/2020 05:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Donald Capparella for Appellees A. J. J. T., Delvin D. Tavarez and Kelly D. Wilson Certificate of Service: 04/02/2020. [20-5328] (DC) [Entered: 04/02/2020 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees A. J. J. T. and Kelly D. Wilson by Donald Capparella. Certificate of Service: 04/02/2020. [20-5328] (DC) [Entered: 04/02/2020 01:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 04/29/2020 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Kathryn Wollenburg. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 03/31/2020 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • Docket(#3) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 03/31/2020 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Monica M. Page (MMP) [Entered: 03/30/2020 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant USA. Transcript needed: y. (MMP) [Entered: 03/30/2020 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael L. Roden

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lindsey Powell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark B. Stern