This case was last updated from PACER on 03/30/2020 at 06:00:32 (UTC).

A. J., et al v. Lancaster County, et al

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 A J filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Lancaster County. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1154

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant and Defendant / Appellee

CHRISTINE SEBASTIAN-BAIR

Defendant / Appellees

ESQ. COURTNEY J. RESTEMAYER

ROBIN BOYER

ESQ. DAVID J. NATAN

ALEXIS PALMER

CRYSTAL A. NATAN, Exec Director

COUNTY OF LANCASTER

CHRISTOPHER HORNBERGER

CHRISTINE SEBASTIAN-BAIR

Plaintiff / Appellants

K. J.

A. J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant Attorneys

Corey S.D. Norcross Esq.

Attorney at Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young

2005 Market Street, Suite 2600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Joseph J. McHale Esq.

Attorney at Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young

2005 Market Street, Suite 2600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

John P. Gonzales Esq.

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

2000 Market Street, Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Monica L. Simmons Esq.

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

2000 Market Street, Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Shane Haselbarth Esq.

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

2000 Market Street, Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Mark D. Freeman Esq.

2 North Orange Street, Suite 215

Media, PA 19063

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Volume I of Appendix attached on behalf of Appellants A. J. and K. J.. Certificate of Service dated 03/24/2020 by ECF. [20-1154] (MDF) [Entered: 03/24/2020 01:32 PM]

22 #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

22 #1

Standing Order

#21

(#21) ORDER (MATEY, Circuit Judge) The motion by Appellants to proceed under pseudonym is granted, filed. Panel No.: CCO-047. Matey, Authoring Judge. (PDB) [Entered: 02/25/2020 02:50 PM]

20 #2

Mediation Notice of Assignment

20 #1

Mediation Instructions

19 #3

District Court Opinion

19 #2

District Court Order

19 #1

Concise Summary of the Case

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of A.J. & K.J.. on behalf of Appellants A. J. and K. J.. [20-1154] (MDF) [Entered: 02/03/2020 12:59 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants A. J. and K. J.. [20-1154] (MDF) [Entered: 02/03/2020 12:57 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mark Dennis Freeman on behalf of Appellant(s) A.J. & K.J.. [20-1154] (MDF) [Entered: 02/03/2020 12:36 PM]

#3

(#3) ORDER (Clerk) Although Appellants were identified only by their initials during the District Court proceedings, it does not appear that Appellants were ever granted permission to conceal their full names. This appeal has been provisionally docketed using only the Appellants' initials. If Appellants wish to continue using only their initials, they must file a motion asking this Court for that relief within thirty (30) days of this order. While Appellants are proceeding under their initials, the parties' filings and CM/ECF docket entries should not use Appellants' full names. If the parties need to file documents containing the Appellants' full names or other personally identifiable information, they should consider seeking the Court's permission to file those documents under seal. Additionally, the parties are advised that all individuals must be added to the appeal for recusal purposes. Accordingly, Appellants' counsel is directed to file under seal the full names of Appellants within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, filed. (PDB) [Entered: 01/30/2020 11:43 AM]

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #3

District Court Opinion dated 122419

1 #2

District Court Order dated 122419

#1

Civil Case Docketed

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Volume I of Appendix attached on behalf of Appellants A. J. and K. J.. Certificate of Service dated 03/24/2020 by ECF. [20-1154] (MDF) [Entered: 03/24/2020 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants A. J. and K. J. due on or before 04/13/2020. Appendix due on or before 04/13/2020. (PDB) [Entered: 03/04/2020 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER (MATEY, Circuit Judge) The motion by Appellants to proceed under pseudonym is granted, filed. Panel No.: CCO-047. Matey, Authoring Judge. (PDB) [Entered: 02/25/2020 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 02/24/2020 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants A. J. and K. J.. [20-1154] (MDF) [Entered: 02/23/2020 07:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Mark D. Freeman, Esq. for A. J. and K. J. requesting the following document(s): Concise Summary on or before 03/03/2020. (PDB) [Entered: 02/18/2020 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER (Clerk) The foregoing motion is referred to a motions panel. Appellants will be referred to by their initials only until such time that the Court rules on the motion, filed. (PDB) [Entered: 02/18/2020 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Corey S.D. Norcross, Esq. for Appellee Christine Sebastian-Bair Letter advising defendant Christine Sebastian-Bair does not intend to participate in Plaintiff's appeal.. Certificate of Service dated 02/13/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-1154] (CSN) [Entered: 02/13/2020 12:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants A. J. and K. J. to accept The Second Amended Complaint filed in the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. that is Plaintiffs are identified in the complaint only using their initials to protect the identity of their two children, one of which is the primary subject of the complaint.. Certificate of Service dated 02/07/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-1154] (MDF) [Entered: 02/07/2020 11:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John P. Gonzales on behalf of Appellee(s) Courtney Restemayer and David Natan. [20-1154] (JPG) [Entered: 02/04/2020 09:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees County of Lancaster, Crystal A. Natan, Alexis Palmer, Christopher Hornberger and Robin Boyer. [20-1154] (SH) [Entered: 02/03/2020 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Shane Haselbarth on behalf of Appellee(s) Lancaster County, Crystal Natan, Robin Boyer, Alexis Palmer and Christopher Hornberger. [20-1154] (SH) [Entered: 02/03/2020 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: SEALED LETTER from Attorney Mark D. Freeman, Esq. for Appellants A. J. and K. J.. Certificate of Service dated 02/03/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-1154] (MDF) [Entered: 02/03/2020 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants A. J. and K. J. advising this court that no transcripts are available. [20-1154] (MDF) [Entered: 02/03/2020 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of A.J. & K.J.. on behalf of Appellants A. J. and K. J.. [20-1154] (MDF) [Entered: 02/03/2020 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants A. J. and K. J.. [20-1154] (MDF) [Entered: 02/03/2020 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mark Dennis Freeman on behalf of Appellant(s) A.J. & K.J.. [20-1154] (MDF) [Entered: 02/03/2020 12:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER (Clerk) Although Appellants were identified only by their initials during the District Court proceedings, it does not appear that Appellants were ever granted permission to conceal their full names. This appeal has been provisionally docketed using only the Appellants' initials. If Appellants wish to continue using only their initials, they must file a motion asking this Court for that relief within thirty (30) days of this order. While Appellants are proceeding under their initials, the parties' filings and CM/ECF docket entries should not use Appellants' full names. If the parties need to file documents containing the Appellants' full names or other personally identifiable information, they should consider seeking the Court's permission to file those documents under seal. Additionally, the parties are advised that all individuals must be added to the appeal for recusal purposes. Accordingly, Appellants' counsel is directed to file under seal the full names of Appellants within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, filed. (PDB) [Entered: 01/30/2020 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 01/30/2020 11:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants A. J. and k. J. in District Court No. 5-19-cv-01768. (PDB) [Entered: 01/30/2020 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less