This case was last updated from PACER on 01/16/2021 at 06:01:13 (UTC).

A Community Voice, et al v. USEPA, et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 A Community Voice filed an Other lawsuit against USEPA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-70080

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioners

UNITED PARENTS AGAINST LEAD NATIONAL

NEW YORK CITY COALITION TO END LEAD POISONING

CALIFORNIA COMMUNITIES AGAINST TOXICS

HEALTHY HOMES COLLABORATIVE

NEW JERSEY CITIZEN ACTION

A COMMUNITY VOICE

WE ACT FOR ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE

SIERRA CLUB

Respondents

ANDREW WHEELER, Administrator, United States Environmental Protection Agency

U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Eve Carol Gartner Esquire

Attorney at Earthjustice

48 Wall Street, 15Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Jonathan James Smith

Attorney at Earthjustice

48 Wall Street, 15Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Sophia Jayanty

Attorney at Earthjustice

48 Wall Street, 15Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Respondent Attorney

Jessica O'Donnell

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 7611, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-7611

 

Court Documents

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Petition for Review

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILED PETITION FOR REVIEW. DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. NOTIFIED RESPONDENTS OF FILING. SEND MQ: Yes. Petitioners A Community Voice, California Communities Against Toxics, Healthy Homes Collaborative, New Jersey Citizen Action, New York City Coalition to End Lead Poisoning, Sierra Club, United Parents Against Lead National and We Act For Environmental Justice Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/21/2021. Petitioner brief due 04/05/2021 for A Community Voice, California Communities Against Toxics, Healthy Homes Collaborative, New Jersey Citizen Action, New York City Coalition to End Lead Poisoning, Sierra Club, United Parents Against Lead National and We Act For Environmental Justice. Respondent brief due 05/04/2021 for U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and Andrew Wheeler. Petitioner's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11963582] (JMR) [Entered: 01/14/2021 10:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA COMMUNITIES AGAINST TOXICS is a litigant