This case was last updated from PACER on 04/12/2020 at 06:06:23 (UTC).

A. B., et al v. City of Santa Ana, et al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 A B filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Santa Ana. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-55149

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

IVAN BRITO

JUAN MOLINA

LLUVIA BRITO

Defendants

IVAN VERA

DOES, 1 through 10, inclusive

Plaintiff / Appellants

L. B., a minor, by and through her guardian ad litem, Carmela Lucero Ortega

A. B., a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Yaneli Alonso

J. M., a minor, by and through her guardian ad litem Rosa Brito

DANIEL BRITO SAAVEDRA

J. A., a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Yaneli Alonso

I. B., a minor, by and through her guardian ad litem, Carmela Lucero Ortega

CARMELA LUCERO ORTEGA

JENNIFER AVALOS

YARUMI BRITO

JOEL BRITO

ROSA BRITO

Defendant / Appellees

CITY OF SANTA ANA

TYLER LIGGETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Dale Kristopher Galipo Esquire

Attorney at Law Offices of Dale K. Galipo

21800 Burbank Blvd.

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Eric Valenzuela

Attorney at Law Offices of Dale K. Galipo

21800 Burbank Blvd.

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Marcel Ferrar Sincich

Attorney at Law Offices of Dale K. Galipo

21800 Burbank Blvd.

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Mark Denis Rutter

Attorney at Carpenter, Rothans & Dumont

500 S. Grand Avenue, Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jill Williams Esquire

Attorney at Carpenter, Rothans & Dumont

500 S. Grand Avenue, Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Danielle Christine Foster

Attorney at Carpenter, Rothans & Dumont

500 S. Grand Avenue, Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Filed order MEDIATION (SMC): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellants' opening brief is due June 22, 2020; appellees' answering brief is due July 22, 2020; appellants' optional reply brief is due within 21 days from the service date of the answering brief. This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions. [11655092] (OC) [Entered: 04/08/2020 09:43 AM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 04/07/2020, 1:30 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11619302] (BLS) [Entered: 03/05/2020 11:45 AM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants J. A., Jennifer Avalos, A. B., L. B., I. B., Joel Brito, Rosa Brito, Yarumi Brito, J. M., Carmela Lucero Ortega and Daniel Brito Saavedra Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/24/2020. [11607079] [20-55149] (Valenzuela, Eric) [Entered: 02/24/2020 03:21 PM]

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed order MEDIATION (SMC): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellants' opening brief is due June 22, 2020; appellees' answering brief is due July 22, 2020; appellants' optional reply brief is due within 21 days from the service date of the answering brief. This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions. [11655092] (OC) [Entered: 04/08/2020 09:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 04/07/2020, 1:30 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11619302] (BLS) [Entered: 03/05/2020 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/24/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11607488]. [20-55149] (AD) [Entered: 02/24/2020 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants J. A., Jennifer Avalos, A. B., L. B., I. B., Joel Brito, Rosa Brito, Yarumi Brito, J. M., Carmela Lucero Ortega and Daniel Brito Saavedra Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/24/2020. [11607079] [20-55149] (Valenzuela, Eric) [Entered: 02/24/2020 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants J. A., Jennifer Avalos, A. B., I. B., L. B., Joel Brito, Rosa Brito, Yarumi Brito, J. M., Carmela Lucero Ortega and Daniel Brito Saavedra Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/19/2020. Transcript ordered by 03/12/2020. Transcript due 04/10/2020. Appellants J. A., Jennifer Avalos, A. B., I. B., L. B., Joel Brito, Rosa Brito, Yarumi Brito, J. M., Carmela Lucero Ortega and Daniel Brito Saavedra opening brief due 05/20/2020. Appellees City of Santa Ana and Tyler Liggett answering brief due 06/22/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11595491] (RT) [Entered: 02/12/2020 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.