This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/28/2023 at 06:38:47 (UTC).

68th Street Site Work Group v. Alban Tractor Co., Incorporated

Case Summary

On 02/10/2023 68th Street Site Work Group filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Alban Tractor Co , Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-1155

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

 

Party Details

Defendants

7-ELEVEN, INC.

A&M (2015) LLC

ABACUS CORPORATION

AIRGAS, INCORPORATED

ALLY FINANCIAL INCORPORATED

AMERICAN EXPRESS COMPANY

AMERICAN PREMIER UNDERWRITERS, INCORPORATED

AMERICAN SUGAR REFINING, INC.

AMTOTE INTERNATIONAL, INCORPORATED

APPLIED INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

ARMACELL, LLC

ASARCO LLC

ASCENSION ST. AGNES HOSPITAL

Plaintiff / Appellant

68TH STREET SITE WORK GROUP

Defendant / Appellees

ALBAN TRACTOR CO., INCORPORATED

C & I LEASING INCORPORATED

RUKERT TERMINALS CORPORATION

SOLO CUP COMPANY

VORNADO REALTY TR

140 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Gary Dean Justis

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Gregory Waterworth

Thomas K. Prevas

Stephen E. Fitzgerald

Jennifer Conron Jackson

Margaret Witherup

Steven K. Fedder

Andrew Gordon May

Collette Alison Woghiren

Lisa S. Zebovitz

William Andrew Baker

Daniel Thomas McKillop

Other Attorneys

David Andrew Rockman

 

Court Documents

#49

(#49) ORDER filed granting Motion to withdraw/relieve/substitute counsel [ # 48 ]. Copies to all parties. [1001478531] [23-1155] TB [Entered: 11/22/2023 03:33 PM]

#48

(#48) MOTION by C & I Leasing Incorporated to withdraw/relieve/substitute counsel.Attorney or client motion? Attorney. Was a copy of the motion served on the defendant? Y. If under L.R. 46(d), was client advised of right to file response within 7 days? N/A. Date and method of service: 11/22/2023 ecf. [1001478363] [23-1155] Sean Radomski [Entered: 11/22/2023 12:58 PM]

#47

(#47) CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 1/23/2024 - 1/26/2024, argument session. No additional paper copies of briefs and appendices are required from counsel. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 11/13/2023. [1001467260] [23-1155] SCC [Entered: 11/03/2023 09:26 AM]

#46

(#46) CASE CONTINUED FROM TENTATIVE CALENDAR. [1001456091] [23-1155] JLC [Entered: 10/16/2023 01:26 PM]

#41

(#41) CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 12/5/2023 - 12/8/2023, argument session. Counsel shall file 4 paper copies of their briefs and appendices within 7 days. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 09/20/2023. [1001438765] [23-1155] SCC [Entered: 09/13/2023 08:26 PM]

#40

(#40) BRIEF by 68th Street Site Work Group. Type of Brief: REPLY. [1001423758] [23-1155] Gary Justis [Entered: 08/18/2023 06:36 PM]

#38

(#38) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 37 ]. Number of days granted: 21. Reply brief due 08/18/2023. No paper copies required unless case has been tentatively calendared or copies otherwise ordered. Copies to all parties. [1001405813] [23-1155] TB [Entered: 07/20/2023 01:47 PM]

#37

(#37) CONSENT/STIPULATION by 68th Street Site Work Group to extend filing time for reply brief until August 18, 2023. [1001405219] [23-1155] Gary Justis [Entered: 07/19/2023 06:32 PM]

#36

(#36) BRIEF by Alban Tractor Co., Incorporated, C & I Leasing Incorporated, Rukert Terminals Corporation, Solo Cup Company, ViacomCBS Inc. and Vornado Realty TR. Type of Brief: RESPONSE/REPLY. [1001397925] [23-1155] Stephen Fitzgerald [Entered: 07/07/2023 03:20 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Stephen Fitzgerald for C & I Leasing Incorporated. [1001322960] [23-1155] Stephen Fitzgerald [Entered: 02/27/2023 11:13 AM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Sean Radomski for C & I Leasing Incorporated. [1001322364] [23-1155] Sean Radomski [Entered: 02/24/2023 03:07 PM]

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Solo Cup Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001322328] [23-1155] Steven Fedder [Entered: 02/24/2023 02:34 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Steven K. Fedder for Solo Cup Company. [1001322327] [23-1155] Steven Fedder [Entered: 02/24/2023 02:33 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William A. Baker for Vornado Realty TR. [1001321724] [23-1155] William Baker [Entered: 02/23/2023 04:26 PM]

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vornado Realty TR. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001321694] [23-1155] Daniel McKillop [Entered: 02/23/2023 04:03 PM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Daniel T. McKillop for Vornado Realty TR. [1001321651] [23-1155] Daniel McKillop [Entered: 02/23/2023 03:42 PM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-03385-SAG. Mailed to: Jennifer Conron Jackson and Gregory Lee Waterworth. [1001315060] [23-1155] TB [Entered: 02/13/2023 12:19 PM]

#1

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-03385-SAG. Mailed to: Jennifer Conron Jackson and Gregory Lee Waterworth. [1001315060] [23-1155] TB [Entered: 02/13/2023 12:19 PM]

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/22/2023

Docket(#50) Attorney Sean J. Radomski for C & I Leasing Incorporated in 23-1155 terminated from case. Reason for termination: Order granting withdrawal. [1001478538] [23-1155] TB [Entered: 11/22/2023 03:35 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#49) ORDER filed granting Motion to withdraw/relieve/substitute counsel [ # 48 ]. Copies to all parties. [1001478531] [23-1155] TB [Entered: 11/22/2023 03:33 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#48) MOTION by C & I Leasing Incorporated to withdraw/relieve/substitute counsel.Attorney or client motion? Attorney. Was a copy of the motion served on the defendant? Y. If under L.R. 46(d), was client advised of right to file response within 7 days? N/A. Date and method of service: 11/22/2023 ecf. [1001478363] [23-1155] Sean Radomski [Entered: 11/22/2023 12:58 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#47) CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 1/23/2024 - 1/26/2024, argument session. No additional paper copies of briefs and appendices are required from counsel. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 11/13/2023. [1001467260] [23-1155] SCC [Entered: 11/03/2023 09:26 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#46) CASE CONTINUED FROM TENTATIVE CALENDAR. [1001456091] [23-1155] JLC [Entered: 10/16/2023 01:26 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#41) CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 12/5/2023 - 12/8/2023, argument session. Counsel shall file 4 paper copies of their briefs and appendices within 7 days. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 09/20/2023. [1001438765] [23-1155] SCC [Entered: 09/13/2023 08:26 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#40) BRIEF by 68th Street Site Work Group. Type of Brief: REPLY. [1001423758] [23-1155] Gary Justis [Entered: 08/18/2023 06:36 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#38) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 37 ]. Number of days granted: 21. Reply brief due 08/18/2023. No paper copies required unless case has been tentatively calendared or copies otherwise ordered. Copies to all parties. [1001405813] [23-1155] TB [Entered: 07/20/2023 01:47 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#37) CONSENT/STIPULATION by 68th Street Site Work Group to extend filing time for reply brief until August 18, 2023. [1001405219] [23-1155] Gary Justis [Entered: 07/19/2023 06:32 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#36) BRIEF by Alban Tractor Co., Incorporated, C & I Leasing Incorporated, Rukert Terminals Corporation, Solo Cup Company, ViacomCBS Inc. and Vornado Realty TR. Type of Brief: RESPONSE/REPLY. [1001397925] [23-1155] Stephen Fitzgerald [Entered: 07/07/2023 03:20 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
02/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Margaret M. Witherup for Rukert Terminals Corporation. [1001323093] [23-1155] Margaret Witherup [Entered: 02/27/2023 12:50 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Stephen Fitzgerald for C & I Leasing Incorporated. [1001322960] [23-1155] Stephen Fitzgerald [Entered: 02/27/2023 11:13 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Sean Radomski for C & I Leasing Incorporated. [1001322364] [23-1155] Sean Radomski [Entered: 02/24/2023 03:07 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Solo Cup Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001322328] [23-1155] Steven Fedder [Entered: 02/24/2023 02:34 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Steven K. Fedder for Solo Cup Company. [1001322327] [23-1155] Steven Fedder [Entered: 02/24/2023 02:33 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William A. Baker for Vornado Realty TR. [1001321724] [23-1155] William Baker [Entered: 02/23/2023 04:26 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vornado Realty TR. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001321694] [23-1155] Daniel McKillop [Entered: 02/23/2023 04:03 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Daniel T. McKillop for Vornado Realty TR. [1001321651] [23-1155] Daniel McKillop [Entered: 02/23/2023 03:42 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-03385-SAG. Mailed to: Jennifer Conron Jackson and Gregory Lee Waterworth. [1001315060] [23-1155] TB [Entered: 02/13/2023 12:19 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-03385-SAG. Case manager: TBarton. [1001314965] [23-1155] TB [Entered: 02/13/2023 11:13 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less