This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:03:37 (UTC).

656 Logan Street Condominium v. Owners Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 656 Logan Street Condominium filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Owners Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1247

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff / Appellant

656 LOGAN STREET CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

John D. Mereness

Attorney at Giometti & Mereness

501 South Cherry Street, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80246

Sean Thomas Conrecode

Attorney at Giometti & Mereness

501 South Cherry Street, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80246

Gregory Giometti

Attorney at Giometti & Mereness

501 South Cherry Street, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80246

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Larry E. Bache Jr.

Attorney at Merlin Law Group

777 South Harbour Island Boulevard, Suite 950

Tampa, FL 33602

Jonathan Edward Bukowski

Attorney at Merlin Law Group

1001 17Th Street, Suite 1150

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Prelim ROA

Open Document

[10663490] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Sean Thomas, Mr. Gregory Giometti, and John D Mereness for Owners Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1247] [Entered: 07/16/2019 01:45 PM]

Open Document

[10663751] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Larry E. Bache, Jr. and Mr. Jonathan Edward Bukowski for 656 Logan Street Condominium Association, Inc. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1247] [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:43 PM]

Open Document

[10666612] Notice received from 656 Logan Street Condominium Association, Inc that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 07/29/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1247] JEB [Entered: 07/29/2019 06:03 PM]

Open Document

[10666611] Docketing statement filed by 656 Logan Street Condominium Association, Inc. Served on 07/29/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1247] JEB [Entered: 07/29/2019 05:58 PM]

Open Document

[10677401] Motion filed by Appellant 656 Logan Street Condominium Association, Inc to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 10/16/2019. Served on: 09/10/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1247] JEB [Entered: 09/10/2019 02:21 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2019
  • [10677402] Minute order filed by Clerk of the Court granting appellant's motion to extend time to file appellant's brief and appendix. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 10/16/2019 for 656 Logan Street Condominium Association, Inc. No further extensions will be granted under the clerk's authority. Served on 09/10/2019. Text only entry - no attachment. [19-1247] [Entered: 09/10/2019 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10677401] Motion filed by Appellant 656 Logan Street Condominium Association, Inc to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 10/16/2019. Served on: 09/10/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1247] JEB [Entered: 09/10/2019 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • [10668179] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 08/05/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix are due on 09/16/2019 for 656 Logan Street Condominium Association, Inc. [19-1247] [Entered: 08/05/2019 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • [10666647] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 08/06/2019 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-1247] [Entered: 07/30/2019 07:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10666612] Notice received from 656 Logan Street Condominium Association, Inc that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 07/29/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1247] JEB [Entered: 07/29/2019 06:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10666611] Docketing statement filed by 656 Logan Street Condominium Association, Inc. Served on 07/29/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1247] JEB [Entered: 07/29/2019 05:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663751] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Larry E. Bache, Jr. and Mr. Jonathan Edward Bukowski for 656 Logan Street Condominium Association, Inc. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1247] [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • [10663748] Entry of appearance submitted by Jonathan E. Bukowski; Larry E. Bache for Appellant 656 Logan Street Condominium Association, Inc for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 07/17/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [19-1247] JEB [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663490] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Sean Thomas, Mr. Gregory Giometti, and John D Mereness for Owners Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1247] [Entered: 07/16/2019 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • [10663481] Entry of appearance submitted by Gregory R. Giometti, John D. Mereness, Sean T. Conrecode for Appellee Owners Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1247] --[Edited 07/16/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 7/16/2019.] GG [Entered: 07/16/2019 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663218] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/15/2019 Docketing statement due 07/29/2019 for 656 Logan Street Condominium Association, Inc. Transcript order form due 07/29/2019 for 656 Logan Street Condominium Association, Inc. Notice of appearance due on 07/29/2019 for 656 Logan Street Condominium Association, Inc and Owners Insurance Company. [19-1247]- [Entered: 07/15/2019 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less