This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/01/2019 at 06:08:36 (UTC).

640 Octavia, LLC v. Karl Heinz-Pieper

Case Summary

On 05/02/2019 640 Octavia, LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Karl Heinz-Pieper. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-15935

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

640 OCTAVIA, LLC

Defendant / Appellee

KARL HEINZ-PIEPER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Gregory S. Walston

Attorney at Walston & Associates

315 Montgomery St.

San Francisco, CA 94104

Stephen John Mackey Esquire

Attorney at Donahue Davies LLP

1 Natoma Street

Folsom, CA 95630

Alexander David Marks

Attorney at Burke, Warren, MacKay & Serritella, P.C.

330 North Wabash Avenue, Suite 2100

Chicago, IL 60611-3607

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Yosef Peretz Esquire

Attorney at Peretz & Associates

22 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter

1 #2

Mediation Letter

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

#2

#4

#7

#9

#12

#13

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Further Conference, 07/09/2019, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time, w/ counsel for appellee only. See order for details. [11339245] (CL) [Entered: 06/20/2019 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Further Conference, 07/03/2019, 1:30 p.m. Pacific Time, w/ counsel for appellant only. See order for details. [11339240] (CL) [Entered: 06/20/2019 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Docket(#11) Added attorney Alexander David Marks for 640 Octavia, LLC, in case 19-15935. [11325783] (JFF) [Entered: 06/10/2019 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Alexander David Marks for Appellant 640 Octavia, LLC. Date of service: 06/10/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11325293] [19-15935] (Marks, Alexander) [Entered: 06/10/2019 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 06/19/2019, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11308112] (CL) [Entered: 05/23/2019 05:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Docket(#8) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/20/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11303656] (AD) [Entered: 05/20/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant 640 Octavia, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/20/2019. [11303012] [19-15935] (Mackey, Stephen) [Entered: 05/20/2019 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Docket(#6) Attorney Gregory S. Walston in 19-15935 substituted by Attorney Stephen John Mackey in 19-15935 [11302985] (JFF) [Entered: 05/20/2019 01:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Stephen J. Mackey for Appellant 640 Octavia, LLC. Substitution for Attorney Mr. Gregory S. Walston for Appellant 640 Octavia, LLC. Date of service: 05/20/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11302933] [19-15935] (Mackey, Stephen) [Entered: 05/20/2019 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal pursuant to Ninth Cir. R. 42-1. [11296469] (LW) [Entered: 05/14/2019 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/09/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11292844] (AD) [Entered: 05/09/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellee Karl Heinz-Pieper Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/09/2019. [11292730] [19-15935] (Peretz, Yosef) [Entered: 05/09/2019 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/09/2019. Transcript ordered by 05/31/2019. Transcript due 07/01/2019. Appellant 640 Octavia, LLC opening brief due 08/09/2019. Appellee Karl Heinz-Pieper answering brief due 09/09/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11284386] (JBS) [Entered: 05/02/2019 09:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 640 Octavia, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yosef Peretz