This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/26/2022 at 06:11:04 (UTC).

5019 Partners, LLC v. UST/LA

Case Summary

On 12/28/2021 5019 Partners, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against UST/LA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1282

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

5019 PARTNERS, LLC

Debtor

In re: 5019 PARTNERS, LLC

Appellee

UST- UNITED STATES TRUSTEE, LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Nancy Korompis

Attorney at Korompis Law Offices

Po Box 60011

Pasadena, CA 91116

Appellee Attorneys

Russell Clementson

Attorney at DOJ-Ust

915 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Kelly L. Morrison

Attorney at DOJ-Ust

441 G Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

8 #10

BAP General Docket

8 #9

Notice of Appearance

#8

Notice of Deficiency

8 #7

Briefing Order

8 #6

Opening Letter

8 #5

Notcie of Referral

8 #4

Notice of Appeal

8 #3

Statement of Election

8 #2

Bankruptcy Request Form

8 #1

District Court Notice Sent

#7

(#7) Filed (ECF) Attorney Russell Clementson for Appellee UST/LA's Objection to BAP jurisdiction; served on 01/11/2022 email - Attorney for Appellees: Clementson, Morrison; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Korompis. [21-1282] (RC) [Entered: 01/11/2022 09:43 AM]

#5

(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Russell Clementson for United States Trustee for Region 16; served on 01/11/2022 US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Korompis; email - Attorney for Appellee: Morrison. [21-1282] (RC) [Entered: 01/11/2022 09:11 AM]

#4

(#4) Notice of Deficiency sent to Appellant RE: DOR, SOI and Transcript Notice for lack of prosecution. Re: Response Due: 01/24/2022. cc: All parties. (CLS) [Entered: 01/10/2022 03:04 PM]

#3

(#3) Received from Bankruptcy Court copy of the notice of referral filed in Bk. Ct. 01/03/2022. (CLS) [Entered: 01/03/2022 05:16 PM]

2 #5

E-filing Administration Order

2 #4

BAP Rules

2 #3

Banktruptcy Record Request Form

#2

Briefing Order

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2022
  • Docket(#9) CLOSED: Case closed: Election without judicial action; 01/11/2022; 21-1282; Transferred by election. (CLS) [Entered: 01/11/2022 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice sent 01/11/2022 to District Court transferring appeal per objection. (CLS) [Entered: 01/11/2022 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Attorney Russell Clementson for Appellee UST/LA's Objection to BAP jurisdiction; served on 01/11/2022 email - Attorney for Appellees: Clementson, Morrison; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Korompis. [21-1282] (RC) [Entered: 01/11/2022 09:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • Docket(#6) Party: Add Attorney(s) Russell Clementson for party(s) Appellee UST/LA, in case 21-1282. (CLS) [Entered: 01/11/2022 09:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Russell Clementson for United States Trustee for Region 16; served on 01/11/2022 US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Korompis; email - Attorney for Appellee: Morrison. [21-1282] (RC) [Entered: 01/11/2022 09:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Deficiency sent to Appellant RE: DOR, SOI and Transcript Notice for lack of prosecution. Re: Response Due: 01/24/2022. cc: All parties. (CLS) [Entered: 01/10/2022 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Received from Bankruptcy Court copy of the notice of referral filed in Bk. Ct. 01/03/2022. (CLS) [Entered: 01/03/2022 05:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Sent BRIEFING ORDER & NOTICE to appellant. Copies to all parties. Sent Bankruptcy Record Request Form to Bankruptcy Court. Appellant 5019 Partners, LLC's opening brief due 02/11/2022. (CLS) [Entered: 12/28/2021 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 12/23/2021. (CLS) [Entered: 12/28/2021 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 5019 PARTNERS LLC A CALIFORNIA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelly L Morrison

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell Clementson