This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/03/2019 at 06:06:45 (UTC).

3D/International, Incorporated, et al v. Joseph Romano

Case Summary

On 09/04/2019 3D/International, Incorporated filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against Joseph Romano. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-20620

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

JOSEPH F. ROMANO

Plaintiff / Appellants

PARSONS INGENIERIA, S. DE R.L. DE C.V.

PARSONS INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

3D/INTERNATIONAL, INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Allison Sarah Hartry

Attorney at Morales Law Firm, P.C.

6243 Ih-10, W.

San Antonio, TX 78201-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jeffrey A. Hiller

Attorney at Cacheaux, Cavazos & Newton

333 Convent Street, Convent Plaza

San Antonio, TX 78205-1348

Gavin Samuel Martinson

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

8117 Preston Road, Preston Commons, W.

Dallas, TX 75225

 

Court Documents

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/28/2019 for Appellants 3D/International, Incorporated, Parsons Ingenieria, S. de R.L. de C.V. and Parsons International Limited. [19-20620] (DDL) [Entered: 09/18/2019 11:19 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [19-20620] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants 3D/International, Incorporated, Parsons Ingenieria, S. de R.L. de C.V. and Parsons International Limited advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 09/13/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Hartry; Attorney for Appellant: Martinson; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Hiller [19-20620] (Gavin Samuel Martinson ) [Entered: 09/13/2019 11:42 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20620] (Gavin Samuel Martinson ) [Entered: 09/11/2019 04:43 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Allison Sarah Hartry for Mr. Joseph F. Romano for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20620] (Allison Sarah Hartry ) [Entered: 09/09/2019 03:39 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9140326-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 09/24/2019 for Appellants 3D/International, Incorporated, Parsons Ingenieria, S. de R.L. de C.V. and Parsons International Limited [19-20620] (JMW) [Entered: 09/09/2019 03:19 PM]

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants 3D/International, Incorporated, Parsons Ingenieria, S. de R.L. de C.V. and Parsons International Limited [19-20620] (NFD) [Entered: 09/04/2019 02:22 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants 3D/International, Incorporated, Parsons Ingenieria, S. de R.L. de C.V. and Parsons International Limited. Extension Granted to and including 11/27/2019. Reason: No Opposition Stated. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 11/27/2019 for Appellants 3D/International, Incorporated, Parsons Ingenieria, S. de R.L. de C.V. and Parsons International Limited [19-20620] (VC) [Entered: 10/03/2019 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/28/2019 for Appellants 3D/International, Incorporated, Parsons Ingenieria, S. de R.L. de C.V. and Parsons International Limited. [19-20620] (DDL) [Entered: 09/18/2019 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-20620] (DDL) [Entered: 09/18/2019 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:18-CV-2432. Electronic ROA due on 10/01/2019. [19-20620] (CAG) [Entered: 09/16/2019 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [19-20620] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants 3D/International, Incorporated, Parsons Ingenieria, S. de R.L. de C.V. and Parsons International Limited advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 09/13/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Hartry; Attorney for Appellant: Martinson; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Hiller [19-20620] (Gavin Samuel Martinson ) [Entered: 09/13/2019 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Gavin Samuel Martinson for party(s) Appellant 3D/International, Incorporated Appellant Parsons International Limited Appellant Parsons Ingenieria, S. de R.L. de C.V., in case 19-20620 [19-20620] (DMS) [Entered: 09/12/2019 09:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20620] (Gavin Samuel Martinson ) [Entered: 09/11/2019 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Allison Sarah Hartry for Appellee Joseph F. Romano in 19-20620 [19-20620] (CAG) [Entered: 09/10/2019 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Allison Sarah Hartry for Mr. Joseph F. Romano for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20620] (Allison Sarah Hartry ) [Entered: 09/09/2019 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9140326-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 09/24/2019 for Appellants 3D/International, Incorporated, Parsons Ingenieria, S. de R.L. de C.V. and Parsons International Limited [19-20620] (JMW) [Entered: 09/09/2019 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants 3D/International, Incorporated, Parsons Ingenieria, S. de R.L. de C.V. and Parsons International Limited [19-20620] (NFD) [Entered: 09/04/2019 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 3D/International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gavin S Martinson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey A. Hiller