Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/10/2021 at 05:41:32 (UTC).

2950 Summer Swan Land Trust v. Deutsche Bank National Trust

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 2950 Summer Swan Land Trust filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Deutsche Bank National Trust. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-11133

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST CO.

Plaintiff / Appellant

2950 SUMMER SWAN LAND TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jason Henry Okleshen

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, PA

777 S Flagler Dr Ste 300E

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Beth Ann Norrow

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, PA

450 S Orange Ave Ste 650

Orlando, FL 32801

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Lior Segal

Attorney at Segal & Schuh Law Group, PL

18167 Us Hwy 19 N Ste 100

Clearwater, FL 33764

 

Court Documents

Open Document #3

Order, DE#31

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant 2950 Summer Swan Land Trust on 04/06/2021. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/20/2021 as to Appellant 2950 Summer Swan Land Trust. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/04/2021 as to Appellee Deutsche Bank National Trust Co. [Entered: 04/08/2021 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant