This case was last updated from PACER on 04/05/2019 at 06:09:14 (UTC).

20/20 Vision Center, LLC v. Vision Precision Holdings

Case Summary

On 02/04/2019 20/20 Vision Center, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Vision Precision Holdings. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1504

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

VISION PRECISION HOLDINGS, LLC

M&D OPTICAL FRANCHISE, LLC

THOMAS CAMPEN MD & ASSOCIATES, PLLC

STANTON OPTICAL FLORIDA, LLC, dba Stanton Optical & My Eyelab

Plaintiff / Appellant

20/20 VISION CENTER, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Joseph W. Bain

Attorney at Shutts & Bowen LLP

525 Okeechobee Boulevard

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Robyn Kramer

Attorney at King, Blackwell, Zehnder & Wermuth, P.A.

25 East Pine Street

Orlando, FL 32801

Alexander David Walden

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

1290 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10104

Joseph J. Richetti

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

1290 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10104

K. Lee Marshall Esq.

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 7Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Taylor Ford

Attorney at King, Blackwell, Zehnder & Wermuth, P.A.

25 East Pine Street

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) MOTION of Appellant 20/20 Vision Center, LLC to extend the time to 04/19/2019 to file the Appellant's Opening Brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/27/2019 by email. [595962] [19-1504] [Joseph Richetti] [Entered: 03/27/2019 03:46 PM]

#14

(#14) Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellees Vision Precision Holdings, LLC, Thomas Campen MD & Associates, PLLC, Stanton Optical Florida, LLC and M&D Optical Franchise, LLC. Service: 02/21/2019 by clerk, email. [587676] [19-1504] [Joseph Bain] [Entered: 02/21/2019 02:00 PM]

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees M&D Optical Franchise, LLC, Stanton Optical Florida, LLC, Thomas Campen MD & Associates, PLLC and Vision Precision Holdings, LLC, Docketing Statement [ # 4 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 02/27/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[587489] [TAM] [Entered: 02/20/2019 03:03 PM]

#11

(#11) Entry of appearance for Robyn M. Kramer as of counsel for Appellant 20/20 Vision Center, LLC. Service: 02/19/2019 by email. [587221] [19-1504] [Joseph Richetti] [Entered: 02/19/2019 06:09 PM]

#10

(#10) Entry of appearance for Taylor F. Ford as of counsel for Appellant 20/20 Vision Center, LLC. Service: 02/19/2019 by email. [587220] [19-1504] [Joseph Richetti] [Entered: 02/19/2019 06:07 PM]

#9

(#9) Entry of appearance for K. Lee Marshall as of counsel for Appellant 20/20 Vision Center, LLC. Service: 02/19/2019 by email. [587219] [19-1504] [Joseph Richetti] [Entered: 02/19/2019 06:06 PM]

#8

(#8) Entry of appearance for Alexander D. Walden as of counsel for Appellant 20/20 Vision Center, LLC. Service: 02/19/2019 by email. [587218] [19-1504] [Joseph Richetti] [Entered: 02/19/2019 06:05 PM]

#7

(#7) Entry of appearance for Joseph J. Richetti as principal counsel for Appellant 20/20 Vision Center, LLC. Service: 02/19/2019 by email. [587217] [19-1504] [Joseph Richetti] [Entered: 02/19/2019 06:04 PM]

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant 20/20 Vision Center, LLC. Service: 02/19/2019 by email. [587216] [19-1504] [Joseph Richetti] [Entered: 02/19/2019 06:03 PM]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellees M&D Optical Franchise, LLC, Stanton Optical Florida, LLC, Thomas Campen MD & Associates, PLLC and Vision Precision Holdings, LLC. Service: 02/19/2019 by clerk, email. [587148] [19-1504] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 13 ] [Joseph Bain] [Entered: 02/19/2019 04:10 PM]

3 #4

supporting document

#3

supporting document

3 #2

supporting document

3 #1

Certificate of Interest

2 #4

supporting document

2 #3

supporting document

#2

supporting document

2 #1

Entry of Appearance

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: motion to extend time to file brief Docket No. [ # 15 ], ERROR: The motion did not contain the proper party designations in the caption. CORRECTION: For future filings, please ensure the proper party designations are used. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [596627] [TAM] [Entered: 03/29/2019 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file Appellant's opening brief [ # 15 ] filed by Appellant 20/20 Vision Center, LLC. Brief is due 04/19/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [596621] [TAM] [Entered: 03/29/2019 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION of Appellant 20/20 Vision Center, LLC to extend the time to 04/19/2019 to file the Appellant's Opening Brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/27/2019 by email. [595962] [19-1504] [Joseph Richetti] [Entered: 03/27/2019 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellees Vision Precision Holdings, LLC, Thomas Campen MD & Associates, PLLC, Stanton Optical Florida, LLC and M&D Optical Franchise, LLC. Service: 02/21/2019 by clerk, email. [587676] [19-1504] [Joseph Bain] [Entered: 02/21/2019 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees M&D Optical Franchise, LLC, Stanton Optical Florida, LLC, Thomas Campen MD & Associates, PLLC and Vision Precision Holdings, LLC, Docketing Statement [ # 4 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 02/27/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[587489] [TAM] [Entered: 02/20/2019 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re:attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 2 ], certificate of interest Docket No. [ # 3 ], ERROR: Multiple entry of appearances and certificate of interests were filed for attorney Joseph W. Bain. CORRECTION: For future filings if an attorney represents multiple parties in an appeal, counsel should only file one entry of appearance, certificate of interest, and docketing statement which lists all parties represented. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [587488] [TAM] [Entered: 02/20/2019 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Entry of appearance for Robyn M. Kramer as of counsel for Appellant 20/20 Vision Center, LLC. Service: 02/19/2019 by email. [587221] [19-1504] [Joseph Richetti] [Entered: 02/19/2019 06:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Entry of appearance for Taylor F. Ford as of counsel for Appellant 20/20 Vision Center, LLC. Service: 02/19/2019 by email. [587220] [19-1504] [Joseph Richetti] [Entered: 02/19/2019 06:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Entry of appearance for K. Lee Marshall as of counsel for Appellant 20/20 Vision Center, LLC. Service: 02/19/2019 by email. [587219] [19-1504] [Joseph Richetti] [Entered: 02/19/2019 06:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Entry of appearance for Alexander D. Walden as of counsel for Appellant 20/20 Vision Center, LLC. Service: 02/19/2019 by email. [587218] [19-1504] [Joseph Richetti] [Entered: 02/19/2019 06:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Entry of appearance for Joseph J. Richetti as principal counsel for Appellant 20/20 Vision Center, LLC. Service: 02/19/2019 by email. [587217] [19-1504] [Joseph Richetti] [Entered: 02/19/2019 06:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant 20/20 Vision Center, LLC. Service: 02/19/2019 by email. [587216] [19-1504] [Joseph Richetti] [Entered: 02/19/2019 06:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Docketing Statement for the Appellant 20/20 Vision Center, LLC. Service: 02/19/2019 by email. [587215] [19-1504] [Joseph Richetti] [Entered: 02/19/2019 06:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellees M&D Optical Franchise, LLC, Stanton Optical Florida, LLC, Thomas Campen MD & Associates, PLLC and Vision Precision Holdings, LLC. Service: 02/19/2019 by clerk, email. [587148] [19-1504] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 13 ] [Joseph Bain] [Entered: 02/19/2019 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interest for the Appellees M&D Optical Franchise, LLC, Stanton Optical Florida, LLC, Thomas Campen MD & Associates, PLLC and Vision Precision Holdings, LLC. Service: 02/19/2019 by clerk, email. [587146] [19-1504] [Joseph Bain] [Entered: 02/19/2019 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Joseph W. Bain as principal counsel for Appellees M&D Optical Franchise, LLC, Stanton Optical Florida, LLC, Thomas Campen MD & Associates, PLLC and Vision Precision Holdings, LLC. Service: 02/19/2019 by clerk, email. [587143] [19-1504] [Joseph Bain] [Entered: 02/19/2019 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 01/29/2019. [583012] Entry of Appearance due 02/19/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 02/19/2019. Docketing Statement due 02/19/2019. Appellant's brief is due 04/05/2019. [TAM] [Entered: 02/04/2019 09:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.