This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/23/2021 at 06:14:23 (UTC).

15 OZ FRESH & HEALTHY FOODS LL v. Underwriters at Lloyd's London

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 15 OZ FRESH HEALTHY FOODS LL filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Underwriters at Lloyd's London. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-10949

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

15 OZ FRESH & HEALTHY FOODS LLC

Defendant / Appellee

UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON KNOWN AS SYNDICATES AML 2001, WBC 5886, MMX 2010 AND SKD 1897

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Matthew P. Weinshall

1 Se 3Rd Ave Ste 2300

Miami, FL 33130

Aaron S. Podhurst

1 Se 3Rd Ave Ste 2300

Miami, FL 33130

Steven Craig Marks

1 Se 3Rd Ave Ste 2300

Miami, FL 33130

Pablo Rojas

1 Se 3Rd Ave Ste 2300

Miami, FL 33130

Stephen F. Rosenthal

1 Se 3Rd Ave Ste 2300

Miami, FL 33130

Kristina Marie Infante

1 Se 3Rd Ave Ste 2300

Miami, FL 33130

Lea Pilar Bucciero

1 Se 3Rd Ave Ste 2300

Miami, FL 33130

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Armando Pedro Rubio

Attorney at Fields Howell, LLP

9155 S Dadeland Blvd Ste 1012

Miami, FL 33156

Paul Lindsey Fields Jr.

Attorney at Fields Howell, LLP

1180 W Peachtree St Ste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30309

Gregory L. Mast

Attorney at Fields Howell, LLP

1180 W Peachtree St Ste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30309

David E. Walker

Attorney at Walker Wilcox Matousek, LLP

1 N Franklin St Ste 3200

Chicago, IL 60606

Freddy L. Alvarez

Attorney at Walker Wilcox Matousek, LLP

1 N Franklin St Ste 3200

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

USDC Order- doc #23

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Open Document #1

JQ Issued

Open Document #2

JUR-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to 15 OZ FRESH & HEALTHY FOODS LLC. [Entered: 05/12/2021 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Armando Pedro Rubio for Appellee Underwriters at Lloyd's London Known as Syndicates AML 2001, WBC 5886, MMX 2010 and SKD 1897. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10949] (ECF: Armando Rubio) [Entered: 04/21/2021 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 04/12/2021 11:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Stephen F. Rosenthal for Appellant 15 OZ FRESH & HEALTHY FOODS LLC. [21-10949] (ECF: Stephen Rosenthal) [Entered: 04/08/2021 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Stephen F. Rosenthal for Appellant 15 OZ FRESH & HEALTHY FOODS LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10949] (ECF: Stephen Rosenthal) [Entered: 04/07/2021 06:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David E. Walker for Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Known as Syndicates AML 2001, WBT 5886, MMX 2010, and SKD 1897 [21-10949] (ECF: David Walker) [Entered: 04/07/2021 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Fred L. Alvarez for Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Known as Syndicates AML 2001, WBT 5886, MMX 2010, and SKD 1897 [21-10949] (ECF: Freddy Alvarez) [Entered: 04/07/2021 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Paul L. Fields, Jr. for Underwriters at Lloyd's, London known as Syndicates AML 2001, WBC 5886, MMX 2010, and SXD 1897 [21-10949] (ECF: Paul Fields) [Entered: 04/07/2021 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Gregory L. Mast for Underwriters at Lloyd's, London known as Syndicates AML 2001, WBC 5886, MMX 2010 and 1897 [21-10949] (ECF: Gregory Mast) [Entered: 04/07/2021 09:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephen F. Rosenthal for 15 OZ FRESH & HEALTHY FOODS LLC. [21-10949] (ECF: Stephen Rosenthal) [Entered: 04/02/2021 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate fee was paid on 03/22/2021 as to Appellant 15 OZ FRESH & HEALTHY FOODS LLC. [Entered: 03/25/2021 07:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant 15 OZ FRESH & HEALTHY FOODS LLC on 03/22/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/03/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/07/2021 as to Appellant 15 OZ FRESH & HEALTHY FOODS LLC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/21/2021 as to Appellee Underwriters at Lloyd's London Known as Syndicates AML 2001, WBC 5886, MMX 2010 and SKD 1897 [Entered: 03/25/2021 07:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Freddy L. Alvarez

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David E. Walker

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Armando Pedro Rubio

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul L. Fields, Jr.